EP2235218 - METHOD, PROCESS, AND KIT FOR DIAGNOSIS OR PROGNOSIS OF COLORECTAL CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Assistance Publique Hôpitaux De Paris 3 Avenue Victoria 75001 Paris / FR | For all designated states Université Paris-Est Créteil Val de Marne 61 avenue du Général de Gaulle 94010 Creteil Cedex / FR | [2012/24] |
Former [2010/40] | For all designated states Assistance Publique Hôpitaux De Paris 3 Avenue Victoria 75001 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOBHANI, Iradj 13 Avenue du Nord 94100 Saint Maur / FR | 02 /
MANSOUR, Hicham 25 rue du général Facq 92350 Le Plessis Robinson / FR | [2014/27] |
Former [2010/40] | 01 /
SOBHANI, Iradj 13 Avenue du Nord F-94100 Saint Maur / FR | ||
02 /
MANSOUR, Hicham 25 rue du général Facq F92350 Le Plessis Robinson / FR | Representative(s) | Wagret, Frédéric Cabinet Wagret 6, Avenue Daniel Lesueur 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/47] | Wagret, Frédéric Cabinet Wagret 19, rue de Milan 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2010/40] | Wagret, Frédéric Cabinet Wagret 19, rue de Milan 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 09706518.9 | 23.01.2009 | [2010/40] | WO2009FR50101 | Priority number, date | FR20080000543 | 31.01.2008 Original published format: FR 0800543 | [2010/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009095596 | Date: | 06.08.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2235218 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2235218 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2010/40] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/154 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/40] | Title | German: | METHODE, VERFAHREN UND KIT ZUR DIAGNOSE ODER PROGNOSE VON KOLOREKTALKARZINOM | [2010/40] | English: | METHOD, PROCESS, AND KIT FOR DIAGNOSIS OR PROGNOSIS OF COLORECTAL CANCER | [2010/40] | French: | METHODE, PROCEDE, ET KIT DE DIAGNOSTIC, PRONOSTIC DU CANCER COLORECTAL | [2010/40] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/40] | 15.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 13.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/44] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 18.10.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 18.10.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.11.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.01.2009 | AT | 19.11.2014 | BG | 19.11.2014 | CY | 19.11.2014 | CZ | 19.11.2014 | DK | 19.11.2014 | EE | 19.11.2014 | ES | 19.11.2014 | FI | 19.11.2014 | HR | 19.11.2014 | IT | 19.11.2014 | LT | 19.11.2014 | LV | 19.11.2014 | MC | 19.11.2014 | MK | 19.11.2014 | MT | 19.11.2014 | NL | 19.11.2014 | PL | 19.11.2014 | RO | 19.11.2014 | SE | 19.11.2014 | SI | 19.11.2014 | SK | 19.11.2014 | TR | 19.11.2014 | IE | 23.01.2015 | LU | 23.01.2015 | BE | 31.01.2015 | CH | 31.01.2015 | LI | 31.01.2015 | FR | 02.02.2015 | GB | 19.02.2015 | NO | 19.02.2015 | GR | 20.02.2015 | IS | 19.03.2015 | PT | 19.03.2015 | DE | 01.08.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 23.01.2009 | |
AT | 19.11.2014 | ||
BG | 19.11.2014 | ||
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
IT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
MT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
TR | 19.11.2014 | ||
IE | 23.01.2015 | ||
LU | 23.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
FR | 02.02.2015 | ||
GB | 19.02.2015 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
DE | 01.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
IT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
MT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
IE | 23.01.2015 | ||
LU | 23.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
FR | 02.02.2015 | ||
GB | 19.02.2015 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
DE | 01.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
IT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
IE | 23.01.2015 | ||
LU | 23.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
FR | 02.02.2015 | ||
GB | 19.02.2015 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
DE | 01.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
IT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
IE | 23.01.2015 | ||
LU | 23.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
FR | 02.02.2015 | ||
GB | 19.02.2015 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
DE | 01.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
IT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
LU | 23.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
FR | 02.02.2015 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
DE | 01.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
LU | 23.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
FR | 02.02.2015 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
DE | 01.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
LU | 23.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
DE | 01.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/43] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
LU | 23.01.2015 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
LU | 23.01.2015 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 19.11.2014 | |
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 19.11.2014 | |
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 19.11.2014 | |
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 19.11.2014 | |
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 19.11.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2005288226 (YOU LIANG [US], et al) [A] 1-10* page 2, [10] - [19] ; exemples *; | [X] - "Neisseria species ORF cloning PCR primer #263.", Geneseq, (20000321), Database accession no. AAZ54878, URL: EBI, XP002485842 [X] 6-8,10 * Sequence * | [X] - "Human soft tissue sarcoma-upregulated DNA - SEQ ID 4235.", Geneseq, (20040826), Database accession no. ADQ21415, URL: EBI, XP002485843 [X] 6-8,10 * Sequence * | [Y] - NOSHO KATSUHIKO ET AL, "Genetic and epigenetic profiling in early colorectal tumors and prediction of invasive potential in pT1 (early invasive) colorectal cancers", CARCINOGENESIS, IRL PRESS, LONDON, GB, (20070601), vol. 28, no. 6, ISSN 0143-3334, pages 1364 - 1370, XP002458487 [Y] 1-5,9 * page 1365, colonne de droite ; page 1367, colonne gauche * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/carcin/bgl246 | [Y] - URAKAMI SHINJI ET AL, "Wnt antagonist family genes as biomarkers for diagnosis, staging, and prognosis of renal cell carcinoma using tumor and serum DNA.", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH : AN OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH 1 DEC 2006, (20061201), vol. 12, no. 23, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 6989 - 6997, XP002547094 [Y] 1-5,9 * pages 6990-6991, "Materials and methods"; page 6992, figure 1; page 6993, colonne gauche; page 6997 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.ccr-06-1194 | [Y] - URAKAMI S ET AL, "COMBINATION ANALYSIS OF HYPERMETHYLATED WNT-ANTAGONIST FAMILY GENES AS A NOVEL EPIGENETIC BIOMARKER PANEL FOR BLADDER CANCER DETECTION", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20060401), vol. 12, no. 7, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 2109 - 2116, XP003015934 [Y] 1-5,9 * page 2111, tableau 1; pages 2113-2116, "Discussion" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-05-2468 | [Y] - LENHARD ET AL, "Analysis of promoter methylation in stool: A novel method for the detection of colorectal cancer", CLINICAL GASTROENTEROLOGY AND HEPATOLOGY, AMERICAN GASTROENTEROLOGICAL ASSOCIATION, US, (20050201), vol. 3, no. 2, ISSN 1542-3565, pages 142 - 149, XP005120680 [Y] 1-5,9 * pages 143 - 146, "Materials and methods" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1542-3565(04)00624-X | [A] - EBERT ET AL, "Aristaless-like Homeobox-4 Gene Methylation Is a Potential Marker for Colorectal Adenocarcinomas", GASTROENTEROLOGY, ELSEVIER, PHILADELPHIA, PA, (20061111), vol. 131, no. 5, ISSN 0016-5085, pages 1418 - 1430, XP005725528 [A] 1-4 * page 1418, dernier paragraphe ; page 1419, colonne droite * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/j.gastro.2006.08.034 | [X] - KOHONEN-CORISH M R J ET AL, "Promoter methylation of the mutated in colorectal cancer gene is a frequent early event in colorectal cancer", ONCOGENE, BASINGSTOKE, HANTS, GB, vol. 26, no. 30, ISSN 0950-9232, (20070601), pages 4435 - 4441, (20070129), XP002477017 [X] 1-4 * page 4440, colonne gauche ; pages 4436-4437 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1210210 | [A] - ZOU HONGZHI ET AL, "Highly methylated genes in colorectal neoplasia: implications for screening.", CANCER EPIDEMIOLOGY, BIOMARKERS & PREVENTION : A PUBLICATION OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, COSPONSORED BY THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PREVENTIVE ONCOLOGY DEC 2007, (200712), vol. 16, no. 12, ISSN 1055-9965, pages 2686 - 2696, XP002485840 [A] 1-4 * page 2687, colonne gauche ; page 2688, tableau 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1055-9965.EPI-07-0518 | [A] - TANIGUCHI HIROAKI ET AL, "Frequent epigenetic inactivation of Wnt inhibitory factor-1 in human gastrointestinal cancers", ONCOGENE, (200511), vol. 24, no. 53, ISSN 0950-9232, pages 7946 - 7952, XP002485841 [A] 1-10 * Introduction ; page 7949, colonne gauche * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1208910 |