01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
12.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2020 [2020/29] |
01.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
20.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
27.09.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44] |
30.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
26.04.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
22.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
01.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
18.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
14.12.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
16.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] |
09.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
02.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] |
19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
18.05.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
16.05.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
29.01.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.01.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
22.01.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.01.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.01.2018 |
Change - English title |
published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] |
12.01.2018 |
Change - French title |
published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] |
18.12.2017 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
17.08.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.08.2017 |
Change - English title |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
11.08.2017 |
Change - French title |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
14.07.2017 |
Change - English title |
published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] |
14.07.2017 |
Change - French title |
published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] |
20.01.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.01.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.01.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.04.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 18.05.2011 [2011/20] |
20.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.09.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] |
03.09.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] |
26.07.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.07.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
11.06.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.08.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.08.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|