EP2252543 - WATER DISPENSER WITH A RESERVOIR SYSTEM AND FAUCET MANIFOLD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2014 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cardomon Holdings Limited Room 610 Winfield Commercial Building 6-8A Prat Avenue Tsimshatsui Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | [2010/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALGORA, German 806 chemin du Lac Saint-Sauveur Québec J0R 1R2 / CA | 02 /
NICKERSON, Tyler Box 118 Strome Alberta T0B 4H0 / CA | 03 /
LIU, Shusheng E7-301 Residence Community Chiwan Shekow Nashan District Shenzen City Guangdong Province / CN | 04 /
ZENG, Bohong Room 602 Building 2 Haizhao community Chiwan, Shekou, Nashan District Shenzen City Guangdong Province / CN | [2013/25] |
Former [2010/47] | 01 /
ALGORA, German 806 chemin du Lac Saint-Sauveur Québec J0R 1R2 / CA | ||
02 /
NICKERSON, Tyler Box 118 Strome Alberta T0B 4H0 / CA | |||
03 /
LIU, Shusheng E7-301 Residence Community Chiwan Shekow Nashan District Shenzen City Guangdong Province / CH | |||
04 /
ZENG, Bohong Room 602 Building 2 Haizhao community Chiwan Shekou Nashan District Shenzen City Guangdong Province / CH | Representative(s) | Lahrtz, Fritz Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Prinzregentenstraße 68 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/38] | Lahrtz, Fritz Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 68 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/47] | Lahrtz, Fritz Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 68 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09707079.1 | 28.01.2009 | [2010/47] | WO2009CA00069 | Priority number, date | US20080006694 | 28.01.2008 Original published format: US 6694 | [2010/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009094754 | Date: | 06.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2252543 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2252543 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 06.08.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B67D3/00, B67D7/36, B67D7/78, B67D7/80 | [2011/36] | CPC: |
B67D3/0009 (EP,US);
B67D3/0022 (EP,US);
B67D3/0029 (EP,US);
B67D3/0038 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/47] | B67D3/00, B67D5/34, B67D5/60, B67D5/62 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/47] | Title | German: | WASSERSPENDER MIT EINEM RESERVOIRSYSTEM UND ARMATURVERTEILER DAFÜR | [2010/47] | English: | WATER DISPENSER WITH A RESERVOIR SYSTEM AND FAUCET MANIFOLD THEREFOR | [2010/47] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR D'EAU À SYSTÈME DE RÉSERVOIR ET COLLECTEUR DE ROBINET DUDIT DISTRIBUTEUR D'EAU | [2010/47] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2010 | Search fee paid | 19.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/47] | 02.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.01.2009 | AT | 18.09.2013 | BE | 18.09.2013 | BG | 18.09.2013 | CY | 18.09.2013 | CZ | 18.09.2013 | DK | 18.09.2013 | EE | 18.09.2013 | ES | 18.09.2013 | FI | 18.09.2013 | HR | 18.09.2013 | LT | 18.09.2013 | LV | 18.09.2013 | MC | 18.09.2013 | MK | 18.09.2013 | MT | 18.09.2013 | NL | 18.09.2013 | RO | 18.09.2013 | SE | 18.09.2013 | SI | 18.09.2013 | SK | 18.09.2013 | NO | 18.12.2013 | GR | 19.12.2013 | IS | 18.01.2014 | PT | 20.01.2014 | IE | 28.01.2014 | LU | 28.01.2014 | CH | 31.01.2014 | LI | 31.01.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 28.01.2009 | |
AT | 18.09.2013 | ||
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
BG | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
MT | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
BG | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
MT | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
MT | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
ES | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 18.09.2013 | |
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | BE | 18.09.2013 | |
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
NL | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | BE | 18.09.2013 | |
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 11.09.2013 | |
HR | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 18.09.2013 | |
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 18.09.2013 | |
NO | 18.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 18.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5979709 (LICCIONI ROBERT [FR]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 55 * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 22 * * figure 1 * | International search | [A]US5184476 (DESROSIERS ANDRE [CA], et al); | [Y]CA2160586 (EBTECH INC [US]); | [X]US2005028550 (CRETTET MARCEL E [US]); | [A]WO2006092783 (GAZOZ SODA BAR LTD [IL], et al); | [A]US2007056314 (MALI MOHAMMED [CA], et al) |