EP2240461 - SUBSTITUTED FURANS AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.2013 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE | [2012/39] |
Former [2011/34] | For all designated states Bayer Pharma Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2010/42] | For all designated states Bayer Schering Pharma Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAMPE, Thomas Kaiser-Wilhelm-Ring 25 40545 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
KAST, Raimund Nachtigallenweg 79 42349 Wuppertal / DE | 03 /
STOLL, Friederike Remscheider Strasse 22 40215 Düsseldorf / DE | 04 /
SCHUHMACHER, Joachim Lipkenskothen 31 42113 Wuppertal / DE | [2010/42] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 DE-40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2013/01] | BIP Patents Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2012/39] | Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 09707538.6 | 29.01.2009 | [2010/42] | WO2009EP00553 | Priority number, date | DE20081007400 | 04.02.2008 Original published format: DE102008007400 | [2010/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009097991 | Date: | 13.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2240461 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07D307/42, C07D307/52, C07D307/54, A61K31/341, A61P9/00 | [2010/42] | CPC: |
C07D307/54 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/42] | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE FURANE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2010/42] | English: | SUBSTITUTED FURANS AND USE THEREOF | [2010/42] | French: | FURANES SUBSTITUÉS ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2010/42] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/42] | 08.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/49] | 25.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO02092590 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-11* Beispiele.;; claims 1,26 *; | [DX]EP1535915 (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP]) [DX] 1-11 * paragraph [0001]; example 5; claims 1,30,44 * |