EP2250428 - LIGHTING MODULE, LAMP AND LIGHTING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSRAM GmbH Marcel-Breuer-Strasse 6 80807 München / DE | For all designated states OSRAM Opto Semiconductors GmbH Leibnizstrasse 4 93055 Regensburg / DE | [2013/16] |
Former [2013/08] | For all designated states OSRAM GmbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | ||
For all designated states OSRAM Opto Semiconductors GmbH Leibnizstrasse 4 93055 Regensburg / DE | |||
Former [2012/29] | For all designated states OSRAM AG Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81536 München / DE | ||
For all designated states OSRAM Opto Semiconductors GmbH Leibnizstrasse 4 93055 Regensburg / DE | |||
Former [2010/46] | For all designated states Osram Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | ||
For all designated states OSRAM Opto Semiconductors GmbH Leibnizstrasse 4 93055 Regensburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAHLKE, Monika Toni-Schmid-Str. 28 81825 München / DE | 02 /
SCHROLL, Katrin Reichlberg 1 83301 Matzing / DE | 03 /
BILLY, Hartmut Am Olivberg 1 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | 04 /
MUSCHAWECK, Julius Augustin Zugspitzstr. 66 82131 Gauting / DE | [2010/46] | Representative(s) | Schulze, Mark Von Lieres Brachmann Schulze Patentanwälte Dietramszeller Str. 22 83624 Otterfing / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/48] | Schulze, Mark Von Lieres Brachmann Schulze Patentanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 12A 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/46] | Schulze, Mark Von Lieres Brachmann Schulze Patentanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 12A 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09708178.0 | 06.02.2009 | [2010/46] | WO2009EP00849 | Priority number, date | DE20081007723 | 06.02.2008 Original published format: DE102008007723 | [2010/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009098081 | Date: | 13.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2250428 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2250428 | Date: | 26.11.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F21K99/00, F21V13/04, F21S8/00 | [2010/47] | CPC: |
F21V13/04 (EP,KR,US);
F21K9/00 (EP,KR,US);
F21S2/005 (EP,KR,US);
F21V19/0005 (EP,KR,US);
F21V5/04 (EP,KR,US);
F21V7/09 (EP,KR,US);
F21V7/10 (KR);
F21W2131/103 (EP,KR,US);
F21Y2105/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/46] | F21K7/00, F21V13/04, F21S8/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/46] | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSMODUL, LEUCHTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR BELEUCHTUNG | [2010/46] | English: | LIGHTING MODULE, LAMP AND LIGHTING METHOD | [2010/46] | French: | MODULE D ÉCLAIRAGE, LAMPE ET PROCÉDÉ D ÉCLAIRAGE | [2010/46] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/46] | 27.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.02.2009 | BG | 26.11.2014 | CY | 26.11.2014 | CZ | 26.11.2014 | DK | 26.11.2014 | EE | 26.11.2014 | ES | 26.11.2014 | FI | 26.11.2014 | HR | 26.11.2014 | LT | 26.11.2014 | LV | 26.11.2014 | MC | 26.11.2014 | MK | 26.11.2014 | MT | 26.11.2014 | NL | 26.11.2014 | PL | 26.11.2014 | RO | 26.11.2014 | SE | 26.11.2014 | SI | 26.11.2014 | SK | 26.11.2014 | TR | 26.11.2014 | AT | 06.02.2015 | IE | 06.02.2015 | LU | 06.02.2015 | GB | 26.02.2015 | NO | 26.02.2015 | GR | 27.02.2015 | BE | 28.02.2015 | CH | 28.02.2015 | LI | 28.02.2015 | IS | 26.03.2015 | PT | 26.03.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 06.02.2009 | |
BG | 26.11.2014 | ||
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
MT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
TR | 26.11.2014 | ||
AT | 06.02.2015 | ||
IE | 06.02.2015 | ||
LU | 06.02.2015 | ||
GB | 26.02.2015 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 26.11.2014 | |
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
MT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
AT | 06.02.2015 | ||
IE | 06.02.2015 | ||
LU | 06.02.2015 | ||
GB | 26.02.2015 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | CY | 26.11.2014 | |
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
AT | 06.02.2015 | ||
IE | 06.02.2015 | ||
LU | 06.02.2015 | ||
GB | 26.02.2015 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 26.11.2014 | |
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
IE | 06.02.2015 | ||
LU | 06.02.2015 | ||
GB | 26.02.2015 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CY | 26.11.2014 | |
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
IE | 06.02.2015 | ||
LU | 06.02.2015 | ||
GB | 26.02.2015 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | CY | 26.11.2014 | |
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
LU | 06.02.2015 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 26.11.2014 | |
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
LU | 06.02.2015 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/44] | CY | 26.11.2014 | |
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
LU | 06.02.2015 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 26.11.2014 | |
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 26.11.2014 | |
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 26.11.2014 | |
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 26.11.2014 | |
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 26.11.2014 | |
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 26.11.2014 | |
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 26.11.2014 | |
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 26.11.2014 | |
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 26.11.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2006152820 (LIEN CHIN-CHUNG [TW], et al) [X] 1-4,9,11,12,14-16,19,21,24-27,31-35 * page 3, paragraph 37 * * figures 1-5 * [Y] 5-8,17,18,22,23,28; | [X]US6758582 (HSIAO YA-KUANG [TW], et al) [X] 1-9,11,12,14,21,24-28,31-35 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 11 * * column 3, line 31 - line 62 * * column 4, line 4 - line 15 * * figures 3-6 *; | [X]EP1255132 (LUMILEDS LIGHTING LLC [US]) [X] 1-4,9,11,12,14-16,19,21,24-27,31-35 * column 4, line 42 - line 53 * * column 5, line 19 - column 6, line 16 * * column 8, line 17 - line 40 * * figures 5A,5D-G,12 *; | [YA]US6582103 (POPOVICH JOHN [US], et al) [Y] 5-8,18,28 * column 3, line 46 - line 57 * * column 4, line 3 - line 11 * * column 5, line 24 - line 31 * * column 6, line 40 - column 7, line 34 * * column 8, line 30 - line 56 * * column 9, line 66 - column 10, line 19 * * figures 1-4,8-11 * [A] 1-4,9,14-17,19,21,24,26,27,31-35; | [YA]DE102004043516 (OSRAM OPTO SEMICONDUCTORS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 17 * page 3, paragraphs 19,20 * * figure 1 * [A] 1-16,21,25,26,31,35; | [YA]EP1453107 (TOYODA GOSEI KK [JP]) [Y] 22,23 * column 19, line 25 - line 37 * * column 21, line 52 - column 22, line 9 * * column 23, line 35 - column 24, line 16 * * column 25, line 11 - line 17 * * column 26, line 30 - column 27, line 35 * * column 45, line 33 - line 45 * * column 49, line 13 - line 32 * * figures 1,2,4a-e,6-8,11,12,18a-d,19a-c,41,99 * [A] 1-5,9,11,12,14,16-19,21,25-28,31,33-35 | by applicant | US2006152820 |