EP2247184 - DUAL PHARMACOPHORES-PDE4-MUSCARINIC ANTAGONISTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glaxo Group Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [2013/18] |
Former [2010/45] | For all designated states Glaxo Group Limited Glaxo Wellcome House Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CALLAHAN, James, Francis 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia PA 19406 / US | 02 /
LIN, Guoliang 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia PA 19406 / US | 03 /
WAN, Zehong No 3 Building 898 Halei Rd Pudong Zhangjiang Hi-tech Park Shanghai / CN | 04 /
YAN, Hongxing 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia PA 19406 / US | [2010/45] | Representative(s) | Fowler, Gavin James, et al GSK Legal & Compliance - Global Patents 79 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1DG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/38] | Fowler, Gavin James, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | ||
Former [2010/45] | Cooke, Tracey GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property CN925.1 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 09708465.1 | 05.02.2009 | [2010/45] | WO2009US33129 | Priority number, date | US20080026568 | 06.02.2008 Original published format: US 26568 | [2010/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009100167 | Date: | 13.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2247184 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.08.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/42, C07D471/04, C07D519/00 | [2012/29] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2010/45] | A01N43/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/45] | Extension states | AL | 03.09.2010 | BA | 03.09.2010 | RS | 03.09.2010 | Title | German: | PDE4-MUSCARIN-ANTAGONISTEN-DOPPELPHARMACOPHOREN | [2010/45] | English: | DUAL PHARMACOPHORES-PDE4-MUSCARINIC ANTAGONISTICS | [2010/45] | French: | PHARMACOPHORES DUALS, ANTAGONISTES DES RÉCEPTEURS MUSCARINIQUES ET INHIBITEURS DE L'ACTIVITÉ PDE4 | [2010/45] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 03.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/45] | 05.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/11] | 30.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.05.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]WO2006055553 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [YD] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [AD]US2006252790 (ALLEN DAVID G [GB], et al) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2008009735 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-10* the whole document * | International search | [Y]WO02060900 (TELIK INC [US], et al); | [Y]WO2008009735 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) |