|
28.03.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2013 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2012 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.02.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.02.2012 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2012 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.02.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.02.2012 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
13.10.2010 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2010 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2010 |
Communication regarding comments on Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.08.2010 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
11.08.2010 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.08.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.2010 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.06.2010 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.03.2010 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.03.2010 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2010 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
10 |
|
09.03.2010 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.03.2010 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.03.2010 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
09.03.2010 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
09.03.2010 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
09.03.2010 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
09.03.2010 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.03.2010 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.12.2009 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
11.12.2009 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
11.12.2009 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
11.12.2009 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
11.12.2009 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
11.12.2009 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
9 |
|
04.12.2009 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
04.12.2009 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
04.12.2009 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
04.12.2009 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
04.12.2009 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
04.12.2009 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
9 |
|
30.10.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.10.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.09.2009 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.09.2009 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.09.2009 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2009 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2009 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/404 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.09.2009 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.09.2009 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Invitation to correct defects in demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.09.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
28.08.2009 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.08.2009 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
13.08.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.08.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.08.2009 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
05.06.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
05.06.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
05.06.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
12.05.2009 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
12.05.2009 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
1 |