EP2245199 - USE OF MICROVESICLES IN DIAGNOSIS, PROGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF MEDICAL DISEASES AND CONDITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The General Hospital Corporation 55 Fruit Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | [2010/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SKOG, Johan, Karl, Olov 400 West 63rd Street, Apt. 407 New York 10069 / US | 02 /
BREAKEFIELD, Xandra O. 127 Homer Street Newton, MA 02459 / US | 03 /
BROWN, Dennis 3 Walnut Avenue Natick, MA 01760 / US | 04 /
MIRANDA, Kevin C. 3949 Lindell Boulevard, No. 169 St. Louis, MO 63108 / US | 05 /
RUSSO, Leileata M. 75 Old Cape Schanck Road Rosebud Victoria 3939 / AU | [2013/46] |
Former [2013/27] | 01 /
SKOG, Johan, Karl, Olov 250 First Avenue, Unit 438 Charlestown, MA 02129 / US | ||
02 /
BREAKEFIELD, Xandra O. 127 Homer Street Newton, MA 02459 / US | |||
03 /
BROWN, Dennis 3 Walnut Avenue Natick, MA 01760 / US | |||
04 /
MIRANDA, Kevin C. 3949 Lindell Boulevard, No. 169 St. Louis, MO 63108 / US | |||
05 /
RUSSO, Leileata M. 1 Oak Grove Avenue Apt. 227 Melrose, MA 02176 / US | |||
Former [2010/44] | 01 /
SKOG, Johan, Karl, Olov 250 First Avenue, Unit 438 Cambridge, MA 02141 / US | ||
02 /
BREAKEFIELD, Xandra O. 127 Homer Street Newton, MA 02459 / US | |||
03 /
BROWN, Dennis 3 Walnut Avenue Natick, MA 01760 / US | |||
04 /
MIRANDA, Kevin C. 3949 Lindell Boulevard, No. 169 St. Louis, MO 63108 / US | |||
05 /
RUSSO, Leileata M. 1 Oak Grove Avenue Apt. 227 Melrose, MA 02176 / US | Representative(s) | Kehoe, Laura Ellen Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/46] | Kehoe, Laura Ellen Keltie LLP Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place London EC4M 7ET / GB | ||
Former [2010/44] | Kehoe, Laura Ellen Keltie Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place London EC4M 7ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 09708907.2 | 02.02.2009 | [2010/44] | WO2009US32881 | Priority number, date | US20080025536 | 01.02.2008 Original published format: US 25536 | US20080100293 | 26.09.2008 Original published format: US 100293 | [2010/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009100029 | Date: | 13.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2245199 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2245199 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2010/44] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K48/00 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C12N15/1017 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q1/6806 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G01N33/68 (CN);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12Q2600/112 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12Q2600/178 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G01N2800/04 (CN);
G01N2800/042 (CN);
G01N2800/245 (CN);
G01N2800/7028 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/44] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON MIKROVESIKELN BEI DER DIAGNOSE, PROGNOSE UND BEHANDLUNG MEDIZINISCHER KRANKHEITEN UND LEIDEN | [2010/44] | English: | USE OF MICROVESICLES IN DIAGNOSIS, PROGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF MEDICAL DISEASES AND CONDITIONS | [2010/44] | French: | UTILISATION DE MICROVÉSICULES DANS LE DIAGNOSTIC, LE PRONOSTIC ET LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES ET D AFFECTIONS MÉDICALES | [2010/44] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/44] | 01.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP13151745.0 / EP2604704 | EP17153084.3 / EP3190192 | EP17170946.2 / EP3239305 | EP20161635.6 / EP3708682 | EP22208959.1 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.02.2009 | AT | 13.11.2013 | BG | 13.11.2013 | CY | 13.11.2013 | CZ | 13.11.2013 | EE | 13.11.2013 | FI | 13.11.2013 | HR | 13.11.2013 | LT | 13.11.2013 | LV | 13.11.2013 | MC | 13.11.2013 | MK | 13.11.2013 | MT | 13.11.2013 | PL | 13.11.2013 | RO | 13.11.2013 | SE | 13.11.2013 | SI | 13.11.2013 | SK | 13.11.2013 | TR | 13.11.2013 | LU | 02.02.2014 | NO | 13.02.2014 | GR | 14.02.2014 | IS | 13.03.2014 | PT | 13.03.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 02.02.2009 | |
AT | 13.11.2013 | ||
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
MT | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
TR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LU | 02.02.2014 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
GR | 14.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 02.02.2009 | |
AT | 13.11.2013 | ||
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
MT | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
LU | 02.02.2014 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
GR | 14.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
MT | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
LU | 02.02.2014 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
GR | 14.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
MT | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
LU | 02.02.2014 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
MT | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
LU | 02.02.2014 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
LU | 02.02.2014 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
LU | 02.02.2014 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 13.11.2013 | |
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 13.11.2013 | |
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 13.11.2013 | |
NO | 13.02.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9422018 (HOLMES MICHAEL JOHN [GB], et al) [X] 38-47,54,55,59-61 * the whole document * * page 3, paragraph LAST * * page 4 * * page 5, paragraph LAST * * claims 1-15 * [Y] 1-37,48-53,56-58; | [XY]WO0136601 (CHIRON SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1-37 * the whole document * * page 2, line 14 - page 3, line 30 * * example 3 * * claims 12-16 * [Y] 38-61; | [XY]WO03076603 (ANOSYS INC [US], et al) [X] 48-50,59-61 * the whole document * * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 3 * * page 8, lines 22-27 * * claims 1,12,28,30 * [Y] 1-47,51-58; | [XY]CA2453198 (ICHIM THOMAS EMANUEL [CA], et al) [X] 38-47 * the whole document * * page 3 - page 6 * * claims 1-29 * [Y] 1-37,48-61; | [XY]WO2005121369 (SOURCEPHARM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-50 * the whole document * * page 2 - page 5 * * page 15, line 15 - page 23, line 17 * * claims 8,33-37 * [Y] 51-61; | [XY]US2006116321 (ROBBINS PAUL D [US], et al) [X] 56-61 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0015] , [0075] , [0081] - [0088] - [0090] * * claims 1-46 * [Y] 1-55; | [XY]US2007104738 (TATISCHEFF IRENE [FR], et al) [X] 48-50 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0031] - [0034] * * claims 15-19 * [Y] 1-47,51-61; | [XY]WO2007103572 (AETHLON MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [X] 51-55 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0008] , [0016] - [0027] - [0029] , [0032] , [0036] , [0039] , [0040] * * paragraphs [0045] , [0060] * [Y] 1-50,56-61; | [XY]WO2007126386 (LOETVALL JAN OLOF [SE], et al) [X] 48-50 * the whole document * * page 3, lines 16-33 * * page 8, line 31 - page 10, line 6 * * page 14, lines 5-13 * * claims 1,2,12-17 * [Y] 1-47,51-61; | [PXY]WO2009015357 (UNIV LOUISVILLE RES FOUND [US], et al) [PX] 1-37 * the whole document * * page 3 - page 6 * * page 14 * * tables 1,2 * [PY] 38-61; | [E]WO2009021322 (UNIV MCGILL [CA], et al) [E] 1-37 * the whole document * * page 6 - page 10 * * page 13 - page 19 ** claims 1-40 *; | [E]WO2009036236 (UNIV OHIO STATE RES FOUND [US], et al) [E] 1-37 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0008] - [0022] - [0034] - [0052] * * page 32 - page 38 * * claims 1-50 *; | [XY] - MONIKA BAJ-KRZYWORZEKA ET AL, "Tumour-derived microvesicles carry several surface determinants and mRNA of tumour cells and transfer some of these determinants to monocytes", CANCER IMMUNOLOGY, IMMUNOTHERAPY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20060701), vol. 55, no. 7, ISSN 1432-0851, pages 808 - 818, XP019333260 [X] 36-47 * the whole document * * page 808, column 2 * [Y] 1-35,48-61 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00262-005-0075-9 | [PX] - SKOG JOHAN ET AL, "Glioblastoma microvesicles transport RNA and proteins that promote tumour growth and provide diagnostic biomarkers.", NATURE CELL BIOLOGY DEC 2008, (200812), vol. 10, no. 12, ISSN 1476-4679, pages 1470 - 1476, XP002526160 [PX] 1-61 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncb1800 | [PY] - AL-NEDAWI KHALID ET AL, "Intercellular transfer of the oncogenic receptor EGFRvIII by microvesicles derived from tumour cells.", NATURE CELL BIOLOGY MAY 2008, (200805), vol. 10, no. 5, ISSN 1476-4679, pages 619 - 624, XP002526161 [PY] 1-61 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncb1725 | Examination | - HESSELS D ET AL, "DD3PCA3-BASED MOLECULAR URINE ANALYSIS FOR THE DIAGNOSIS OF PROSTATE CANCER", EUROPEAN UROLOGY, ELSEVIER BV, NL, (20030701), vol. 44, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0302-2838(03)00201-X, ISSN 0302-2838, pages 8 - 16, XP009032062 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0302-2838(03)00201-X | - LAXMAN BHARATHI ET AL, "Noninvasive detection of TMPRSS2:ERG fusion transcripts in the urine of men with prostate cancer.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (200610), Database accession no. NLM17059688 | - LAXMAN BHARATHI ET AL, "Noninvasive detection of TMPRSS2:ERG fusion transcripts in the urine of men with prostate cancer.", NEOPLASIA (NEW YORK, N.Y.) OCT 2006, (200610), vol. 8, no. 10, ISSN 1476-5586, pages 885 - 888 | by applicant | US5219727 | US5538871 | US5547859 | US5556773 | US5582981 | US5639606 | US5639611 | US5840867 | US6004755 | WO0004194 | US6525154 | WO03023065 | WO03050290 | US6812023 | US6893837 | US6899863 | US6913879 | US6994960 | US2006147959 | US7074563 | WO2006113590 | US7186512 | US7198923 | US7198893 | US7332553 | US7364848 | US7378245 | US7384589 | - ABRAVAYA, K.; J.J. CARRINO; S. MULDOON; H.H. LEE, "Detection of point mutations with a modified ligase chain reaction (Gap-LCR", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1995), vol. 23, pages 675 - 82 | - AL-NEDAWI, K.; B. MEEHAN; J. MICALLEF; V. LHOTAK; L. MAY; A. GUHA; J. RAK, "Intercellular transfer of the oncogenic receptor EGFRvIII by microvesicles derived from tumour cells", NAT CELL BIOL., (2008), vol. 10, pages 619 - 24 | - BAJ-KRZYWORZEKA, M.; R. SZATANEK; K. WEGLARCZYK; J. BARAN; B. URBANOWICZ; P. BRANSKI; M.Z. RATAJCZAK; M. ZEMBALA, "Tumour-derived microvesicles carry several surface determinants and mRNA of tumour cells and transfer some of these determinants to monocytes", CANCER IMMUNOL IMMUNOTHER., (2006), vol. 55, pages 808 - 18 | - BALZAR, M.; M.J. WINTER; C.J. DE BOER; S.V. LITVINOV, "The biology of the 17-1A antigen (Ep-CAM", J MOL MED., (1999), vol. 77, pages 699 - 712 | - BOOTH, A.M.; Y. FANG; J.K. FALLON; J.M. YANG; J.E. HILDRETH; S.J. GOULD, "Exosomes and HIV Gag bud from endosome-like domains of the T cell plasma membrane", J CELL BIOL., (2006), vol. 172, pages 923 - 35 | - BOSSI, A.; F. BONINI; A.P. TURNER; S.A. PILETSKY, "Molecularly imprinted polymers for the recognition of proteins: the state of the art", BIOSENS BIOELECTRON, (2007), vol. 22, pages 1131 - 7 | - BROOKES, M.J.; N.K. SHARMA; C. TSELEPIS; T.H. IQBAL, "Serum pro-hepcidin: measuring active hepcidin or a non-functional precursor?", GUT, (2005), vol. 54, pages 169 - 70 | - CARMELIET, P.; R.K. JAIN, "Angiogenesis in cancer and other diseases", NATURE, (2000), vol. 407, pages 249 - 57 | - CARPENTER, G., "Receptors for epidermal growth factor and other polypeptide mitogens", ANNU REV BIOCHEM., (1987), vol. 56, pages 881 - 914 | - CHANG, H.R.; W.H. KUO; Y.S. HSIEH; S.F. YANG; C.C. LIN; M.L. LEE; J.D. LIAN; S.C. CHU, "Circulating matrix metalloproteinase-2 is associated with cystatin C level, posttransplant duration, and diabetes mellitus in kidney transplant recipients", TRANSL RES., (2008), vol. 151, pages 217 - 23 | - CHAPUT, N.; J. TAIEB; F. ANDRE; L. ZITVOGEL., "The potential of exosomes in immunotherapy", EXPERT OPIN BIOL THER., (2005), vol. 5, pages 737 - 47 | - CHERUVANKY, A.; H. ZHOU; T. PISITKUN; J.B. KOPP; M.A. KNEPPER; P.S. YUEN; R.A. STAR, "Rapid isolation of urinary exosomal biomarkers using a nanomembrane ultrafiltration concentrator", AM J PHYSIOL RENAL PHYSIOL., (2007), vol. 292, pages F1657 - 61 | - CLAYTON, A.; J.P. MITCHELL; J. COURT; M.D. MASON; Z. TABI, "Human tumor-derived exosomes selectively impair lymphocyte responses to interleukin-2", CANCER RES., (2007), vol. 67, pages 7458 - 66 | - COTTON, RG.; N.R. RODRIGUES; R.D. CAMPBELL., "Reactivity of cytosine and thymine in single-base-pair mismatches with hydroxylamine and osmium tetroxide and its application to the study of mutations", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (1988), vol. 85, pages 4397 - 401 | - DELVES, G.H.; A.B. STEWART; A.J. COOPER; B.A. LWALEED, "Prostasomes, angiogenesis, and tissue factor", SEMIN THROMB HEMOST., (2007), vol. 33, pages 75 - 9 | - DIEHL, F.; K. SCHMIDT; M.A. CHOTI; K. ROMANS; S. GOODMAN; M. LI; K. THORNTON; N. AGRAWAL; L. SOKOLL; S.A. SZABO, "Circulating mutant DNA to assess tumor dynamics", NAT MED., (2008), vol. 14, pages 985 - 90 | - FIORENTINO, F.; M.C. MAGLI; D. PODINI; A.P. FERRARETTI; A. NUCCITELLI; N. VITALE; M. BALDI; L. GIANAROLI., "The minisequencing method: an alternative strategy for preimplantation genetic diagnosis of single gene disorders", MOL HUM REPROD., (2003), vol. 9, pages 399 - 410 | - FISCHER, S.G.; L.S. LERMAN, "Length-independent separation of DNA restriction fragments in two-dimensional gel electrophoresis", CELL, (1979), vol. 16, pages 191 - 200 | - FISCHER, S.G.; L.S. LERMAN, "Two-dimensional electrophoretic separation of restriction enzyme fragments of DNA", METHODS ENZYMOL., (1979), vol. 68, pages 183 - 91 | - FURNARI, F.B.; T. FENTON; R.M. BACHOO; A. MUKASA; J.M. STOMMEL; A. STEGH; W.C. HAHN; K.L. LIGON; D.N. LOUIS; C. BRENNAN, "Malignant astrocytic glioma: genetics, biology, and paths to treatment", GENES DEV., (2007), vol. 21, pages 2683 - 710 | - GABRILOVICH, D.I., "Molecular mechanisms and therapeutic reversal of immune suppression in cancer", CURR CANCER DRUG TARGETS., (2007), vol. 7, page 1 | - GEISS, G.K.; R.E. BUMGARNER; B. BIRDITT; T. DAHL; N. DOWIDAR; D.L. DUNAWAY; H.P. FELL; S. FERREE; R.D. GEORGE; T. GROGAN, "Direct multiplexed measurement of gene expression with color-coded probe pairs", NAT BIOTECHNOL., (2008), vol. 26, pages 317 - 25 | - GOESSL, C.; H. KRAUSE; M. MULLER; R. HEICAPPELL; M. SCHRADER; J. SACHSINGER; K. MILLER, "Fluorescent methylation-specific polymerase chain reaction for DNA- based detection of prostate cancer in bodily fluids", CANCER RES., (2000), vol. 60, pages 5941 - 5 | - GONZALGO, M.L.; M. NAKAYAMA; S.M. LEE; A.M. DE MARZO; W.G. NELSON, "Detection of GSTP1 methylation in prostatic secretions using combinatorial MSP analysis", UROLOGY, (2004), vol. 63, pages 414 - 8 | - GORMALLY, E.; E. CABOUX; P. VINEIS; P. HAINAUT, "Circulating free DNA in plasma or serum as biomarker of carcinogenesis: practical aspects and biological significance", MUTAT RES., (2007), vol. 635, pages 105 - 17 | - GRECO, V.; M. HANNUS; S. EATON., "Argosomes: a potential vehicle for the spread of morphogens through epithelia", CELL, (2001), vol. 106, pages 633 - 45 | - GROSKOPF, J.; S.M. AUBIN; I.L. DERAS; A. BLASE; S. BODRUG; C. CLARK; S. BRENTANO; J. MATHIS; J. PHAM; T. MEYER, "APTIMA PCA3 molecular urine test: development of a method to aid in the diagnosis of prostate cancer", CLIN CHEM., (2006), vol. 52, pages 1089 - 95 | - GUATELLI, J.C.; K.M. WHITFIELD; D.Y. KWOH; K.J. BARRINGER; D.D. RICHMAN; T.R. GINGERAS, "Isothermal, in vitro amplification of nucleic acids by a multienzyme reaction modeled after retroviral replication", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (1990), vol. 87, pages 1874 - 8 | - HAHN, P.J., "Molecular biology of double-minute chromosomes", BIOESSAYS, (1993), vol. 15, pages 477 - 84 | - HUBNER, R.H.; S. MEFFERT; U. MUNDT; H. BOTTCHER; S. FREITAG; N.E. EL MOKHTARI; T. PUFE; S. HIRT; U.R. FOLSCH; B. BEWIG, "Matrix metalloproteinase-9 in bronchiolitis obliterans syndrome after lung transplantation", EUR RESPIR J., (2005), vol. 25, pages 494 - 501 | - JANOWSKA-WIECZOREK, A.; M. WYSOCZYNSKI; J. KIJOWSKI; L. MARQUEZ-CURTIS; B. MACHALINSKI; J. RATAJCZAK; M.Z. RATAJCZAK, "Microvesicles derived from activated platelets induce metastasis and angiogenesis in lung cancer", INT J CANCER, (2005), vol. 113, pages 752 - 60 | - JOHNSON, S.; D. EVANS; S. LAURENSON; D. PAUL; A.G. DAVIES; P.K. FERRIGNO; C. WALTI., "Surface-immobilized peptide aptamers as probe molecules for protein detection", ANAL CHEM., (2008), vol. 80, pages 978 - 83 | - KAN, Y.W.; A.M. DOZY, "Antenatal diagnosis of sickle-cell anaemia by D.N.A. analysis of amniotic-fluid cells", LANCET, (1978), vol. 2, pages 910 - 2 | - KAN, Y.W.; A.M. DOZY, "Polymorphism of DNA sequence adjacent to human beta-globin structural gene: relationship to sickle mutation", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (1978), vol. 75, pages 5631 - 5 | - KELLER, S.; C. RUPP; A. STOECK; S. RUNZ; M. FOGEL; S. LUGERT; H.D. HAGER; M.S. ABDEL-BAKKY; P. GUTWEIN; P. ALTEVOGT., "CD24 is a marker of exosomes secreted into urine and amniotic fluid", KIDNEY INT., (2007), vol. 72, pages 1095 - 102 | - KEMNA, E.; P. PICKKERS; E. NEMETH; H. VAN DER HOEVEN; D. SWINKELS, "Time- course analysis of hepcidin, serum iron, and plasma cytokine levels in humans injected with LPS", BLOOD, (2005), vol. 106, pages 1864 - 6 | - KEMNA, E.H.; H. TJALSMA; V.N. PODUST; D.W. SWINKELS, "Mass spectrometry-based hepcidin measurements in serum and urine: analytical aspects and clinical implications", CLIN CHEM., (2007), vol. 53, pages 620 - 8 | - KEMNA, E.H.; H. TJALSMA; H.L. WILLEMS; D.W. SWINKELS, "Hepcidin: from discovery to differential diagnosis", HAEMATOLOGICA, (2008), vol. 93, pages 90 - 7 | - KISLAUSKIS, E.H.; X. ZHU; R.H. SINGER, "Sequences responsible for intracellular localization of beta-actin messenger RNA also affect cell phenotype", J CELL BIOL., (1994), vol. 127, pages 441 - 51 | - KWOH, D.Y.; G.R. DAVIS; K.M. WHITFIELD; H.L. CHAPPELLE; L.J. DIMICHELE; T.R. GINGERAS, "Transcription-based amplification system and detection of amplified human immunodeficiency virus type 1 with a bead-based sandwich hybridization format", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (1989), vol. 86, pages 1173 - 7 | - LANDEGREN, U.; R. KAISER; J. SANDERS; L. HOOD, "A ligase-mediated gene detection technique", SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 241, pages 1077 - 80 | - LI, J.; L. WANG; H. MAMON; M.H. KULKE; R. BERBECO; G.M. MAKRIGIORGOS, "Replacing PCR with COLD-PCR enriches variant DNA sequences and redefines the sensitivity of genetic testing", NAT MED., (2008), vol. 14, pages 579 - 84 | - LIU, C.; S. YU; K. ZINN; J. WANG; L. ZHANG; Y. JIA; J.C. KAPPES; S. BARNES; R.P. KIMBERLY; W.E. GRIZZLE, "Murine mammary carcinoma exosomes promote tumor growth by suppression of NK cell function", J LMMUNOL., (2006), vol. 176, pages 1375 - 85 | - LIU, Q.; J.C. GREIMANN; C.D. LIMA, "Reconstitution, activities, and structure of the eukaryotic RNA exosome", CELL, (2006), vol. 127, pages 1223 - 37 | - LO, Y.M.; N.B. TSUI; R.W. CHIU; T.K. LAU; T.N. LEUNG; M.M. HEUNG; A. GEROVASSILI; Y. JIN; K.H. NICOLAIDES; C.R. CANTOR, "Plasma placental RNA allelic ratio permits noninvasive prenatal chromosomal aneuploidy detection", NAT MED., (2007), vol. 13, pages 218 - 23 | - LOUIS, D.N.; H. OHGAKI; O.D. WIESTLER; W.K. CAVENEE; P.C. BURGER; A. JOUVET; B.W. SCHEITHAUER; P. KLEIHUES, "The 2007 WHO classification of tumours of the central nervous system", ACTA NEUROPATHOL., (2007), vol. 114, pages 97 - 109 | - MACK, M.; A. KLEINSCHMIDT; H. BRUHL; C. KLIER; P.J. NELSON; J. CIHAK; J. PLACHY; M. STANGASSINGER; V. ERFLE; D. SCHLONDORFF., "Transfer of the chemokine receptor CCR5 between cells by membrane-derived microparticles: a mechanism for cellular human immunodeficiency virus 1 infection", NAT MED., (2000), vol. 6, pages 769 - 75 | - MALLARDO, M.; A. DEITINGHOFF; J. MULLER; B. GOETZE; P. MACCHI; C. PETERS; M.A. KIEBLER, "Isolation and characterization of Staufen-containing ribonucleoprotein particles from rat brain", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (2003), vol. 100, pages 2100 - 5 | - MARON, J.L.; K.L. JOHNSON; D. SLONIM; C.Q. LAI; M. RAMONI; G. ALTEROVITZ; Z. JARRAH; Z. YANG; D.W. BIANCHI, "Gene expression analysis in pregnant women and their infants identifies unique fetal biomarkers that circulate in maternal blood", J CLIN INVEST., (2007), vol. 117, pages 3007 - 19 | - MAZZOCCA, A.; R. COPPARI; R. DE FRANCO; J.Y. CHO; T.A. LIBERMANN; M. PINZANI; A. TOKER, "A secreted form of ADAM9 promotes carcinoma invasion through tumor-stromal interactions", CANCER RES., (2005), vol. 65, pages 4728 - 38 | - MELLINGHOFF, I.K.; M.Y. WANG; I. VIVANCO; D.A. HAAS-KOGAN; S. ZHU; E.Q. DIA; K.V. LU; K. YOSHIMOTO; J.H. HUANG; D.J. CHUTE, "Molecular determinants of the response of glioblastomas to EGFR kinase inhibitors", N ENGL J MED., (2005), vol. 353, pages 2012 - 24 | - MIELE, E.A.; D.R. MILLS; F.R. KRAMER, "Autocatalytic replication of a recombinant RNA", J MOL BIOL., (1983), vol. 171, pages 281 - 95 | - MILLIMAGGI, D.; M. MARI; S. D'ASCENZO; E. CAROSA; E.A. JANNINI; S. ZUCKER; G. CARTA; A. PAVAN; V. DOLO, "Tumor vesicle-associated CD147 modulates the angiogenic capability of endothelial cells", NEOPLASIA, (2007), vol. 9, pages 349 - 57 | - MUERKOSTER, S.; K. WEGEHENKEL; A. ARLT; M. WITT; B. SIPOS; M.L. KRUSE; T. SEBENS; G. KLOPPEL; H. KALTHOFF; U.R. FOLSCH, "Tumor stroma interactions induce chemoresistance in pancreatic ductal carcinoma cells involving increased secretion and paracrine effects of nitric oxide and interleukin-lbeta", CANCER RES., (2004), vol. 64, pages 1331 - 7 | - MYERS, R.M.; Z. LARIN; T. MANIATIS, "Detection of single base substitutions by ribonuclease cleavage at mismatches in RNA:DNA duplexes", SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 230, pages 1242 - 6 | - NAGRATH, S.; L.V. SEQUIST; S. MAHESWARAN; D.W. BELL; D. IRIMIA; L. ULKUS; M.R. SMITH; E.L. KWAK; S. DIGUMARTHY; A. MUZIKANSKY, "Isolation of rare circulating tumour cells in cancer patients by microchip technology", NATURE, (2007), vol. 450, pages 1235 - 9 | - NAKANISHI, H.; J. GROSKOPF; H.A. FRITSCHE; V. BHADKAMKAR; A. BLASE; S.V. KUMAR; J.W. DAVIS; P. TRONCOSO; H. RITTENHOUSE; R.J. BABA, "PCA3 molecular urine assay correlates with prostate cancer tumor volume: implication in selecting candidates for active surveillance", J UROL., (2008), vol. 179, pages 1804 - 9 | - NAKAZAWA, H.; D. ENGLISH; P.L. RANDELL; K. NAKAZAWA; N. MARTEL; B.K. ARMSTRONG; H. YAMASAKI, "UV and skin cancer: specific p53 gene mutation in normal skin as a biologically relevant exposure measurement", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (1994), vol. 91, pages 360 - 4 | - NG, E.K.; T.N. LEUNG; N.B. TSUI; T.K. LAU; N.S. PANESAR; R.W. CHIU; Y.M. LO., "The concentration of circulating corticotropin-releasing hormone mRNA in maternal plasma is increased in preeclampsia", CLIN CHEM., (2003), vol. 49, pages 727 - 31 | - NG, E.K.; N.B. TSUI; T.K. LAU; T.N. LEUNG; R.W. CHIU; N.S. PANESAR; L.C. LIT; K.W. CHAN; Y.M. LO., "mRNA of placental origin is readily detectable in maternal plasma", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (2003), vol. 100, pages 4748 - 53 | - NISHIKAWA, R.; T. SUGIYAMA; Y. NARITA; F. FURNARI; W.K. CAVENEE; M. MATSUTANI, "Immunohistochemical analysis of the mutant epidermal growth factor, deltaEGFR, in glioblastoma", BRAIN TUMOR PATHOL., (2004), vol. 21, pages 53 - 6 | - ORITA, M.; H. IWAHANA; H. KANAZAWA; K. HAYASHI; T. SEKIYA, "Detection of polymorphisms of human DNA by gel electrophoresis as single-strand conformation polymorphisms", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (1989), vol. 86, pages 2766 - 70 | - PAN, B.T.; R.M. JOHNSTONE, "Fate of the transferrin receptor during maturation of sheep reticulocytes in vitro: selective externalization of the receptor", CELL, (1983), vol. 33, pages 967 - 78 | - PELLOSKI, C.E.; K.V. BALLMAN; A.F. FURTH; L. ZHANG; E. LIN; E.P. SULMAN; K. BHAT; J.M. MCDONALD; W.K. YUNG; H. COLMAN, "Epidermal growth factor receptor variant III status defines clinically distinct subtypes of glioblastoma.", J CLIN ONCOL., (2007), vol. 25, pages 2288 - 94 | - RAPOSO, G.; H.W. NIJMAN; W. STOORVOGEL; R. LIEJENDEKKER; C.V. HARDING; C.J. MELIEF; H.J. GEUZE, "B lymphocytes secrete antigen-presenting vesicles", J EXP MED., (1996), vol. 183, pages 1161 - 72 | - ROE, M.A.; C. SPINKS; A.L. HEATH; L.J. HARVEY; R. FOXALL; J. WIMPERIS; C. WOLF; S.J. FAIRWEATHER-TAIT., "Serum prohepcidin concentration: no association with iron absorption in healthy men; and no relationship with iron status in men carrying HFE mutations, hereditary haemochromatosis patients undergoing phlebotomy treatment, or pregnant women", BR J NUTR., (2007), vol. 97, pages 544 - 9 | - SCHETTER, A.J.; S.Y. LEUNG; J.J. SOHN; K.A. ZANETTI; E.D. BOWMAN; N. YANAIHARA; S.T. YUEN; T.L. CHAN; D.L. KWONG; G.K. AU, "MicroRNA expression profiles associated with prognosis and therapeutic outcome in colon adenocarcinoma", JAMA, (2008), vol. 299, pages 425 - 36 | - STEEMERS, F.J.; W. CHANG; G. LEE; D.L. BARKER; R. SHEN; K.L. GUNDERSON, "Whole-genome genotyping with the single-base extension assay", NAT METHODS, (2006), vol. 3, pages 31 - 3 | - STUPP, R.; W.P. MASON; M.J. VAN DEN BENT; M. WELLER; B. FISHER; M.J. TAPHOORN; K. BELANGER; A.A. BRANDES; C. MAROSI; U. BOGDAHN, "Radiotherapy plus concomitant and adjuvant temozolomide for glioblastoma", N ENGL J MED., (2005), vol. 352, pages 987 - 96 | - TAYLOR, D.D.; C. GERCEL-TAYLOR, "MicroRNA signatures of tumor-derived exosomes as diagnostic biomarkers of ovarian cancer", GYNECOL ONCOL., (2008), vol. 110, pages 13 - 21 | - THERY, C.; L. ZITVOGEL; S. AMIGORENA, "Exosomes: composition, biogenesis and function", NAT REV IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 2, pages 569 - 79 | - TOMLINS, S.A.; D.R. RHODES; S. PERNER; S.M. DHANASEKARAN; R. MEHRA; X.W. SUN; S. VARAMBALLY; X. CAO; J. TCHINDA; R. KUEFER, "Recurrent fusion of TMPRSS2 and ETS transcription factor genes in prostate cancer", SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 310, pages 644 - 8 | - VALADI, H.; K. EKSTROM; A. BOSSIOS; M. SJOSTRAND; J.J. LEE; J.O. LOTVALL, "Exosome-mediated transfer of mRNAs and microRNAs is a novel mechanism of genetic exchange between cells", NAT CELL BIOL., (2007), vol. 9, pages 654 - 9 | - VAN DIJK, E.L.; G. SCHILDERS; G.J. PRUIJN, "Human cell growth requires a functional cytoplasmic exosome, which is involved in various mRNA decay pathways", RNA, (2007), vol. 13, pages 1027 - 35 | - VELCULESCU, V.E.; L. ZHANG; B. VOGELSTEIN; K.W. KINZLER, "Serial analysis of gene expression", SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 270, pages 484 - 7 | - WEISS, G.; L.T. GOODNOUGH, "Anemia of chronic disease", N ENGL J MED., (2005), vol. 352, pages 1011 - 23 | - WENT, P.T.; A. LUGLI; S. MEIER; M. BUNDI; M. MIRLACHER; G. SAUTER; S. DIRNHOFER, "Frequent EpCam protein expression in human carcinomas", HUM PATHOL., (2004), vol. 35, pages 122 - 8 | - WIECKOWSKI, E.; T.L. WHITESIDE, "Human tumor-derived vs dendritic cell-derived exosomes have distinct biologic roles and molecular profiles", IMMUNOL RES., (2006), vol. 36, pages 247 - 54 | - WONG, B.C.; R.W. CHIU; N.B. TSUI; K.C. CHAN; L.W. CHAN; T.K. LAU; T.N. LEUNG; Y.M. LO., "Circulating placental RNA in maternal plasma is associated with a preponderance of 5' mRNA fragments: implications for noninvasive prenatal diagnosis and monitoring", CLIN CHEM., (2005), vol. 51, pages 1786 - 95 | - WOOD, L.D.; D.W. PARSONS; S. JONES; J. LIN; T. SJOBLOM; R.J. LEARY; D. SHEN; S.M. BOCA; T. BARBER; J. PTAK, "The genomic landscapes of human breast and colorectal cancers", SCIENCE, (2007), vol. 318, pages 1108 - 13 | - WRIGHT, J.L.; P.H. LANGE, "Newer potential biomarkers in prostate cancer", REV UROL., (2007), vol. 9, pages 207 - 13 | - ZEHENTNER, B.K.; H. SECRIST; X. ZHANG; D.C. HAYES; R. OSTENSON; G. GOODMAN; J. XU; M. KIVIAT; N. KIVIAT; D.H. PERSING, "Detection of alpha-methylacyl-coenzyme-A racemase transcripts in blood and urine samples of prostate cancer patients", MOL DIAGN THER., (2006), vol. 10, pages 397 - 403 | - ZIELIE, P.J.; J.A. MOBLEY; R.G. EBB; Z. JIANG; R.D. BLUTE; S.M. HO, "A novel diagnostic test for prostate cancer emerges from the determination of alpha-methylacyl-coenzyme a racemase in prostatic secretions", J UROL., (2004), vol. 172, pages 1130 - 3 |