EP2245014 - UREA DERIVATIVES OF BENZOMORPHANES AND RELATED SCAFFOLDS, MEDICAMENTS CONTAINING SUCH COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2010/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ECKHARDT, Matthias Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | 02 /
HIMMELSBACH, Frank Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | 03 /
HAMILTON, Bradford Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | 04 /
PETERS, Stefan Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/25] | 01 /
ECKHARDT, Matthias Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | ||
02 /
HIMMELSBACH, Frank Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | |||
03 /
HAMILTON, Bradford Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | |||
04 /
PETERS, Stefan Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | |||
Former [2010/44] | 01 /
ECKHARDT, Matthias Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | ||
02 /
HIMMELSBACH, Frank BoehringerIngelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | |||
03 /
HAMILTON, Bradford Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | |||
04 /
PETERS, Stefan Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/44] | Application number, filing date | 09709660.6 | 10.02.2009 | [2010/44] | WO2009EP00905 | Priority number, date | EP20080151295 | 12.02.2008 Original published format: EP 08151295 | [2010/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009100872 | Date: | 20.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2245014 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2245014 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07D221/26, C07D401/06, C07D401/14, C07D413/06, C07D413/10, C07D471/04, C07D471/08, C07D487/04, C07D495/04, C07D498/08, A61K31/55, A61P3/00 | [2010/44] | CPC: |
C07D221/26 (EP,US);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P19/06 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/50 (EP);
A61P7/10 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D401/06 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D413/06 (EP,US);
C07D413/10 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
C07D471/08 (EP,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/44] | Title | German: | HARNSTOFF-DERIVATE VON BENZOMORPHANEN, ENTSPRECHENDE GERÜSTE, MEDIKAMENTE MIT SOLCHEN VERBINDUNGEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2010/44] | English: | UREA DERIVATIVES OF BENZOMORPHANES AND RELATED SCAFFOLDS, MEDICAMENTS CONTAINING SUCH COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE | [2010/44] | French: | DERIVES D'UREE DE BENZOMORPHANES ET STRUCTURES ASSOCIEES, MEDICAMENTS CONTENANT DE TELS COMPOSES ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2011/24] |
Former [2010/44] | DÉRIVÉS D URÉE DE BENZOMORPHANES ET STRUCTURES ASSOCIÉES, MÉDICAMENTS CONTENANT DE TELS COMPOSÉS ET LEUR UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/44] | 12.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.02.2009 | AT | 02.11.2011 | BE | 02.11.2011 | CY | 02.11.2011 | CZ | 02.11.2011 | DK | 02.11.2011 | EE | 02.11.2011 | FI | 02.11.2011 | HR | 02.11.2011 | IT | 02.11.2011 | LT | 02.11.2011 | LV | 02.11.2011 | MK | 02.11.2011 | MT | 02.11.2011 | NL | 02.11.2011 | PL | 02.11.2011 | RO | 02.11.2011 | SE | 02.11.2011 | SI | 02.11.2011 | SK | 02.11.2011 | TR | 02.11.2011 | BG | 02.02.2012 | NO | 02.02.2012 | GR | 03.02.2012 | IE | 10.02.2012 | LU | 10.02.2012 | ES | 13.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | IS | 02.03.2012 | PT | 02.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MK | 02.11.2011 | ||
MT | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
TR | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IE | 10.02.2012 | ||
LU | 10.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MK | 02.11.2011 | ||
MT | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
TR | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IE | 10.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MK | 02.11.2011 | ||
MT | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IE | 10.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MK | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IE | 10.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MK | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IE | 10.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
MK | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IE | 10.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IE | 10.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
HR | 02.11.2011 | ||
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
LT | 02.11.2011 | ||
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
LV | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
NO | 02.02.2012 | ||
IS | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 02.11.2011 | |
NO | 02.02.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XD]GB1077711 (GEIGY AG J R) [XD] 1-6,9 * page 1, column L, line 16 - page 1, column R, line 43 * * page 2, column L, line 18 - page 2, column L, line 40 *; | [DX]US3341538 (BLOCK FRED B, et al) [DX] 1-6 * claims 4,8,13,14 *; | [A]WO2006024628 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 3, line 26 - page 4, line 20 * * page 20, line 6 - page 20, line 17 *; | [A]WO2006040329 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-9* page 9, line 31 - page 13, line 18 *; | [A]WO2007051810 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0085] - [0120] * * paragraph [0299] *; | [A]WO2008000951 (SANOFI AVENTIS [FR], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 4, line 25 - page 6, line 6 * |