EP2240198 - COMPOSITION FOR ABSORPTION THROUGH MUCOUS TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hernuss, Peter Peter-Jordan-Strasse 151 1180 Wien / AT | [2010/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/42] | Representative(s) | Babeluk, Michael, et al Patentanwalt Florianigasse 26/3 1080 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/42] | Babeluk, Michael, et al Patentanwalt Mariahilfer Gürtel 39/17 1150 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 09710075.4 | 13.02.2009 | [2010/42] | WO2009EP51682 | Priority number, date | AT20080000238 | 13.02.2008 Original published format: AT 2382008 | [2010/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009101165 | Date: | 20.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2240198 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2240198 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/27, A61K38/48, A61P3/02, A61P5/00, A61K9/00 | [2010/42] | CPC: |
A61K38/27 (EP,US);
A61K38/4873 (EP,US);
A61K9/006 (EP,US);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/42] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR AUFNAHME ÜBER MUKÖSES GEWEBE | [2010/42] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR ABSORPTION THROUGH MUCOUS TISSUE | [2010/42] | French: | COMPOSITION DESTINÉE À ÊTRE DÉPOSÉE SUR UN TISSU MUQUEUX | [2010/42] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/42] | 18.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.08.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.02.2009 | CY | 14.12.2011 | CZ | 14.12.2011 | DK | 14.12.2011 | EE | 14.12.2011 | FI | 14.12.2011 | HR | 14.12.2011 | IE | 14.12.2011 | IT | 14.12.2011 | LT | 14.12.2011 | LV | 14.12.2011 | MK | 14.12.2011 | MT | 14.12.2011 | NL | 14.12.2011 | PL | 14.12.2011 | RO | 14.12.2011 | SE | 14.12.2011 | SI | 14.12.2011 | SK | 14.12.2011 | TR | 14.12.2011 | LU | 13.02.2012 | BE | 28.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | BG | 14.03.2012 | NO | 14.03.2012 | GR | 15.03.2012 | ES | 25.03.2012 | IS | 14.04.2012 | PT | 16.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
FI | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
IT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
MK | 14.12.2011 | ||
MT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
TR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LU | 13.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
FI | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
IT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
MK | 14.12.2011 | ||
MT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
TR | 14.12.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
FI | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
IT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
MK | 14.12.2011 | ||
MT | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
FI | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
IT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
MK | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
IT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
MK | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
ES | 25.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
IT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
MK | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
IT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
IT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
DK | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
PL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
PT | 16.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
RO | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
SK | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
EE | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
IE | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
BG | 14.03.2012 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
CZ | 14.12.2011 | ||
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
IS | 14.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 14.12.2011 | |
HR | 14.12.2011 | ||
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 14.12.2011 | |
LT | 14.12.2011 | ||
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 14.12.2011 | |
LV | 14.12.2011 | ||
NL | 14.12.2011 | ||
SE | 14.12.2011 | ||
SI | 14.12.2011 | ||
NO | 14.03.2012 | ||
GR | 15.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 14.12.2011 | |
NO | 14.03.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO02058735 (GAINFUL PLAN LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-8 * pages 50-51; examples 4h,2c; claims 1,13-16 *; | [A]WO2004113522 (DIREVO BIOTECH AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 29; claims 1,2 *; | [A]WO2006009825 (ARCHIMEDES LAB INC [US], et al) [A] 1-8* claims 1-7,85 *; | [I]US2007009583 (QVIST MICHAEL H [DK]) [I] 1-5 * paragraphs [0031] , [0035] , [0039] , [0042]; examples 1-3; claims 1,3,7,8 *; | [A]US2007014735 (MUNDSCHENK DAVID D [US]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0009] , [0013] , [0023] , [0050]; claims 70,73,82,88,89 *; | [XI]WO2007067964 (NASTECH PHARM CO [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,7 * page 24, lines 5-34; claim 1 * * page 54, lines 11-13 * [I] 4,6,8 | by applicant | WO02058735 | WO2004100981 | US2007009538 | US2007014735 | WO2007067964 |