|
10.02.2014 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2013 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2013 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.10.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.10.2013 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.10.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2013 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2013 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2013 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.05.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2013 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.2013 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.04.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2013 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.08.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.08.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.04.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.04.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2011 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.10.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.10.2010 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2010 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiences in Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.09.2010 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.08.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2010 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.06.2010 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.09.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
20.08.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.2009 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
14.05.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
14.05.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
14.05.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
16.02.2009 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.02.2009 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
16.02.2009 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
12 |
|
16.02.2009 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
2 |