Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009199836 | Global Dossier | 13.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36705809 | 06.02.2009 | US2751208 | 11.02.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011512036 | Global Dossier | 14.04.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US2751208 | 11.02.2008 | WO2009US33363 | 06.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2242629 | Global Dossier | 27.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2751208 | 11.02.2008 | WO2009US33363 | 06.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101970193 | 09.02.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US2751208 | 11.02.2008 | WO2009US33363 | 06.02.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009102630 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US2751208 | 11.02.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20100120685 | Global Dossier | 16.11.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US2751208 | 11.02.2008 |