EP2244851 - ROLLING SYSTEM FOR ROLLING STRIP-SHAPED ROLLING STOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS Siemag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [2010/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLERDINGS, Arthur Brücherweg 15 57482 Wenden-Altwenden / DE | [2010/44] | Representative(s) | Klüppel, Walter Hemmerich & Kollegen Patentanwälte Hammerstraße 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/14] | Klüppel, Walter Hemmerich & Kollegen Patentanwälte Hammerstraße 2 57072 Siegen / DE | ||
Former [2010/44] | Klüppel, Walter Hemmerich & Kollegen Patentanwälte Hammerstraße 2 57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09710853.4 | 29.01.2009 | [2010/44] | WO2009DE00148 | Priority number, date | DE20081009916 | 15.02.2008 Original published format: DE102008009916 | [2010/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009100705 | Date: | 20.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2244851 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2244851 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B21C47/02, B21C47/16, B21C47/24, B21B39/00 | [2010/44] | CPC: |
B21B39/00 (EP,US);
B21C47/04 (EP,US);
B21C47/18 (EP,US);
B21C47/24 (EP,US);
B21B1/32 (EP,US);
B21B15/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/44] | Title | German: | WALZANLAGE ZUM WALZEN VON BANDFÖRMIGEM WALZGUT | [2010/44] | English: | ROLLING SYSTEM FOR ROLLING STRIP-SHAPED ROLLING STOCK | [2010/44] | French: | INSTALLATION DE LAMINAGE POUR LE LAMINAGE DE PRODUITS À LAMINER SOUS FORME DE FEUILLARD | [2010/44] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/44] | 25.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.01.2009 | CY | 03.04.2013 | CZ | 03.04.2013 | DK | 03.04.2013 | EE | 03.04.2013 | FI | 03.04.2013 | HR | 03.04.2013 | LT | 03.04.2013 | LV | 03.04.2013 | MC | 03.04.2013 | MK | 03.04.2013 | MT | 03.04.2013 | NL | 03.04.2013 | PL | 03.04.2013 | RO | 03.04.2013 | SE | 03.04.2013 | SI | 03.04.2013 | SK | 03.04.2013 | TR | 03.04.2013 | BG | 03.07.2013 | NO | 03.07.2013 | GR | 04.07.2013 | ES | 14.07.2013 | IS | 03.08.2013 | PT | 05.08.2013 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 29.01.2009 | |
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
MT | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
TR | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 29.01.2009 | |
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
MT | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 03.04.2013 | |
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
MT | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | CY | 03.04.2013 | |
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 03.04.2013 | |
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 03.04.2013 | |
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 03.04.2013 | |
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 03.04.2013 | |
HR | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 03.04.2013 | |
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 03.04.2013 | |
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 03.04.2013 | |
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 03.04.2013 | |
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
NO | 03.07.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | SI | 03.04.2013 | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB749501 (DAVY & UNITED ENG CO LTD) [Y] 7,8 * page 2, line 82 - page 5, line 8; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]US3635417 (KAJIWARA TOSHIYUKI, et al) [Y] 2,5,6 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 40; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0088745 (VOEST ALPINE AG [AT]) [X] 1,3,4* page 4, line 1 - line 21; figure 1 *; | [X]JPS62151209 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [X] 1,3,4 * abstract *; | [X]US5706690 (CONNOLLY RICHARD S [US]) [X] 1,3,4 * column 3, line 13 - column 4, line 65; figure 1 *; | [XY]EP0618018 (SMS DEMAG AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,4 * column 3, paragraph 14 - paragraph 16; figure 1; claims 1,2,8 * [Y] 2,5-10; | [Y] - GUO R-M ET AL, "DESIGN AND SIMULATION OF AN ENTRY EDGE GUIDE CONTROL SYSTEM FOR TANDEM COLD MILLS", TRANSACTIONS OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF MECHANICAL ENGINEERS,SERIES B: JOURNAL OF ENGINEERING FOR INDUSTRY, ASME. NEW YORK, US, (19990201), vol. 121, no. 1, ISSN 0022-0817, pages 69 - 75, XP000803155 [Y] 9,10 * pages 2-3; figure 2 * |