EP2247883 - USE OF A COMPOSITE PIPE HAVING A PIPE MADE OF CROSS-LINKED POLYETHYLENE FOR DISTRIC HEATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/45] | COMPOSITE PIPE HAVING A PIPE MADE OF CROSS-LINKED POLYETHYLENE | ||
[2016/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rehau AG + Co Rheniumhaus 95111 Rehau / DE | [2010/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEINDL, Andreas Zöllnertorstrasse 2 91126 Schwabach / DE | 02 /
OELSCHLEGEL, Alexander Am Pfarrholz 17 95176 Konradsreuth / DE | 03 /
WINTER, Karlheinz Jägerstrasse 47 95111 Rehau / DE | [2010/45] | Application number, filing date | 09711695.8 | 17.02.2009 | [2010/45] | WO2009EP01097 | Priority number, date | DE20082002386U | 20.02.2008 Original published format: DE 202008002386 U | [2010/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009103483 | Date: | 27.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2247883 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2247883 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/32, B32B1/08, F16L9/12 | [2016/09] | CPC: |
F16L9/12 (EP);
B32B1/08 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP);
F16L9/121 (EP);
F16L9/123 (EP);
F16L2011/047 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/45] | F16L9/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/19] |
Former [2010/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINES VERBUNDROHRS MIT EINEM ROHR AUS VERNETZTEM POLYETHYLEN ZUM TRANSPORT VON FERNWÄRME | [2016/09] | English: | USE OF A COMPOSITE PIPE HAVING A PIPE MADE OF CROSS-LINKED POLYETHYLENE FOR DISTRIC HEATING | [2016/09] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN TUYAU COMPOSITE COMPRENANT UN TUYAU EN POLYÉTHYLÈNE RÉTICULÉ POUR CHAUFFAGE URBAIN | [2016/09] |
Former [2010/45] | VERBUNDROHR MIT EINEM ROHR AUS VERNETZTEM POLYETHYLEN | ||
Former [2010/45] | COMPOSITE PIPE HAVING A PIPE MADE OF CROSS-LINKED POLYETHYLENE | ||
Former [2010/45] | TUYAU COMPOSITE COMPRENANT UN TUYAU EN POLYÉTHYLÈNE RÉTICULÉ | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/45] | 14.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 31.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.02.2009 | BG | 11.05.2016 | CY | 11.05.2016 | CZ | 11.05.2016 | DK | 11.05.2016 | EE | 11.05.2016 | ES | 11.05.2016 | FI | 11.05.2016 | HR | 11.05.2016 | IT | 11.05.2016 | LT | 11.05.2016 | LV | 11.05.2016 | MC | 11.05.2016 | MK | 11.05.2016 | MT | 11.05.2016 | NL | 11.05.2016 | PL | 11.05.2016 | SE | 11.05.2016 | SI | 11.05.2016 | SK | 11.05.2016 | TR | 11.05.2016 | NO | 11.08.2016 | GR | 12.08.2016 | PT | 12.09.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 17.02.2009 | |
BG | 11.05.2016 | ||
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MK | 11.05.2016 | ||
MT | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 17.02.2009 | |
BG | 11.05.2016 | ||
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MT | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 17.02.2009 | |
BG | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MT | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 17.02.2009 | |
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MT | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 11.05.2016 | |
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MT | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 11.05.2016 | |
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 11.05.2016 | |
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 11.05.2016 | |
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 11.05.2016 | |
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 11.05.2016 | |
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | ES | 11.05.2016 | |
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 11.05.2016 | |
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 11.05.2016 | |
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 11.05.2016 | |
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 11.05.2016 | |
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 11.05.2016 | |
NO | 11.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US4144111 (SCHAERER ANDRE J) [X] 1,4,15 * column 1, line 6 - line 11 * * column 3, line 39 - column 5, line 2 * [A] 2,3; | [Y]GB2034433 (GOULD INC) [Y] 1-15 * page 1, line 5 - line 23 * * page 1, line 40 - line 55 * * page 1, line 101 - line 114 * * page 2, line 88 - line 111 * * figures 1,4-8 *; | [A]US4614208 (SKARELIUS JERKER [SE]) [A] 1,14,15 * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 32 ** figure 1 *; | [XA]WO9219904 (GLYNWED PLASTICS [GB]) [X] 1,2,4,7-12,15 * abstract * * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 7 * [A] 3,13; | [Y]WO9957474 (WIRSBO BRUKS AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 1, line 5 - page 2, line 30 * * page 12, line 3 - line 16 * * page 15, line 11 - line 31 * * figure 3 * | Examination | DE4432481 |