EP2255401 - NONWOVEN FABRIC HAVING CROSS-LINKING MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Freudenberg KG Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2010/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBER, Christoph Kirchstrasse 24 69514 Laudenbach / DE | 02 /
ROTH, Michael Dr. Am Winterhafen 24 55131 Mainz / DE | 03 /
SMITH, Iain 24 Stallpits Road Shrivenham Swindon SN6 8BA / GB | 04 /
GENTILCORE, Giovanni 1A Clifton Street Swindon SN1 3PY / GB | [2014/21] |
Former [2011/02] | 01 /
WEBER, Christoph Kirchstrasse 24 69514 Laudenbach / DE | ||
02 /
ROTH, Michael Jakob-Dieterich-Strasse 24 55118 Mainz / DE | |||
03 /
SMITH, Iain 24 Stallpits Road Shrivenham Swindon SN6 8BA / GB | |||
04 /
GENTILCORE, Giovanni 1A Clifton Street Swindon SN1 3PY / GB | |||
Former [2010/48] | 01 /
WEBER, Christoph Kirchstrasse 24 69514 Laudenbach / DE | ||
02 /
ROTH, Michael Jakob-Dieterich-Strasse 24 55118 Mainz / DE | |||
03 /
SMITH, Iain 24 Stallpits Road Shrivenham Swindon SN6 8BA / GB | |||
04 /
GENTILCORE, Giovanni 121 Goddard Ave Swindon SN1 4HU / GB | Representative(s) | Ripper, Monika Sigrid Carl Freudenberg KG Höhnerweg 2 - 4 69469 Weinheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/14] | Ripper, Monika Sigrid Carl Freudenberg KG Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | ||
Former [2010/48] | Ripper, Monika Sigrid Carl Freudenberg KG, Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 09711807.9 | 19.02.2009 | [2010/48] | WO2009EP01197 | Priority number, date | DE20081010152 | 20.02.2008 Original published format: DE102008010152 | [2010/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009103537 | Date: | 27.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2255401 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2255401 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/16 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
H01M50/44 (EP,US);
D04H1/413 (KR);
D04H1/587 (KR);
H01M50/414 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/431 (EP,US);
H01M50/434 (EP,US);
H01M50/437 (EP,US);
H01M50/446 (EP,US);
H01M50/489 (EP,US);
H01M50/491 (EP,US);
H01M50/494 (EP,US);
H01M50/4295 (EP,US);
H01M8/0226 (EP,US);
H01M8/0241 (EP,US);
H01M8/0289 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49108 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/48] | Title | German: | VLIESSTOFF MIT VERNETZUNGSMATERIAL | [2010/48] | English: | NONWOVEN FABRIC HAVING CROSS-LINKING MATERIAL | [2010/48] | French: | NON-TISSÉ COMPORTANT UN MATÉRIAU DE RÉTICULATION | [2010/48] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/48] | 29.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.02.2009 | BG | 01.04.2015 | CY | 01.04.2015 | CZ | 01.04.2015 | DK | 01.04.2015 | EE | 01.04.2015 | ES | 01.04.2015 | FI | 01.04.2015 | HR | 01.04.2015 | IT | 01.04.2015 | LT | 01.04.2015 | LV | 01.04.2015 | MC | 01.04.2015 | MK | 01.04.2015 | MT | 01.04.2015 | NL | 01.04.2015 | PL | 01.04.2015 | RO | 01.04.2015 | SE | 01.04.2015 | SI | 01.04.2015 | SK | 01.04.2015 | TR | 01.04.2015 | NO | 01.07.2015 | GR | 02.07.2015 | IS | 01.08.2015 | PT | 03.08.2015 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 19.02.2009 | |
CY | 01.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
MK | 01.04.2015 | ||
MT | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SE | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
TR | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 19.02.2009 | |
CY | 01.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
MK | 01.04.2015 | ||
MT | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SE | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
MT | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SE | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/42] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
HR | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
NO | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 01.04.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2078769 (TEXON INC) [X] 1-24,31-33 * page 1, line 24 - line 31 * * page 1, line 51 - page 3, line 7 * * page 1, line 11 - line 15 * * page 3, line 16 - line 35 *; | [X]DE19850826 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-24,31-33 * page 2, line 47 - line 51 * * page 12, line 64 - page 14, line 6 * * page 12, line 12 - page 15, line 55 * * page 16, line 18 - line 23 * * page 16, line 55 - line 68 * * page 17, line 19 - line 26 * * claims 1,3,5 *; | [X]EP1271673 (YUASA BATTERY CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-14,18-33* paragraphs [0009] , [0012] - [0014] - [0022] - [0024] - [0027] , [0051] , [0052] , [0054] , [0059] , [0061] , [0063] , [0064] , [0067] - [0069] - [0072] * | Examination | WO2007126242 |