EP2254464 - ADMINISTRATION OF DRUGS TO A PATIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medimetrics Personalized Drug Delivery B.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE, Eindhoven / NL | [2012/26] |
Former [2010/48] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMIZU, Jeff c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2010/48] | Representative(s) | Flügel Preissner Schober Seidel Patentanwälte PartG mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 20 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/01] | Flügel Preissner Schober Seidel Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 31 02 03 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/42] | Flügel Preissner Kastel Schober Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 31 02 03 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/49] | Preissner, Nicolaus, et al Flügel Preissner Kastel Schober Patentanwälte Postfach 31 02 03 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/48] | Kroeze, Johannes Antonius Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 09712414.3 | 11.02.2009 | [2010/48] | WO2009IB50553 | Priority number, date | US20080029447 | 18.02.2008 Original published format: US 29447 | [2010/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009104110 | Date: | 27.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2254464 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2254464 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/07, A61M31/00, A61B5/145 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
A61M31/002 (EP,US);
A61B5/073 (EP,US);
A61B5/14539 (EP,US);
A61B5/4839 (EP,US);
A61B5/42 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3523 (EP,US);
A61M2205/50 (EP,US);
A61M2210/1053 (EP,US);
A61M2210/1057 (EP,US);
A61M2210/106 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/48] | A61B5/00, A61B5/07, A61M31/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/01] |
Former [2010/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERABREICHUNG VON WIRKSTOFFEN AN EINEN PATIENTEN | [2010/48] | English: | ADMINISTRATION OF DRUGS TO A PATIENT | [2010/48] | French: | ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENTS À UN PATIENT | [2010/48] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/48] | 19.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.02.2009 | AT | 04.01.2017 | CY | 04.01.2017 | CZ | 04.01.2017 | DK | 04.01.2017 | EE | 04.01.2017 | ES | 04.01.2017 | FI | 04.01.2017 | HR | 04.01.2017 | IT | 04.01.2017 | LT | 04.01.2017 | LV | 04.01.2017 | MC | 04.01.2017 | MK | 04.01.2017 | NL | 04.01.2017 | PL | 04.01.2017 | RO | 04.01.2017 | SE | 04.01.2017 | SI | 04.01.2017 | SK | 04.01.2017 | TR | 04.01.2017 | IE | 11.02.2017 | LU | 11.02.2017 | MT | 11.02.2017 | BE | 28.02.2017 | CH | 28.02.2017 | LI | 28.02.2017 | BG | 04.04.2017 | NO | 04.04.2017 | GR | 05.04.2017 | IS | 04.05.2017 | PT | 04.05.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 11.02.2009 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MK | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
IE | 11.02.2017 | ||
LU | 11.02.2017 | ||
MT | 11.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 11.02.2009 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
IE | 11.02.2017 | ||
LU | 11.02.2017 | ||
MT | 11.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 11.02.2009 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
IE | 11.02.2017 | ||
LU | 11.02.2017 | ||
MT | 11.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
IE | 11.02.2017 | ||
LU | 11.02.2017 | ||
MT | 11.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
IE | 11.02.2017 | ||
LU | 11.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
LU | 11.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | ES | 04.01.2017 | |
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005147559 (VON ALTEN THOMAS W [US]) [X] 8-10 * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 1, paragraph 8 * * page 2, paragraph 23 - page 4, paragraph 41; figures 1-3 * * page 6, paragraph 60 - page 6, paragraph 61; figures 8,9 *; | [X]WO2006056944 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 8-10 * page 1, line 3 - page 7, line 26; figures 1,2 *; | [X]WO2007072297 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 8-10 * page 1, line 5 - page 1, line 8 * * page 1, line 25 - page 3, line 25 * * page 8, line 7 - page 8, line 26; figure 1 *; | [X]WO2006021932 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 8-10 * page 1, line 3 - page 1, line 5 * * page 3, line 20 - page 3, line 24 * * page 4, line 11 - page 14, line 23; figures 1-8 *; | [PX]WO2008099356 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [PX] 8-10 * page 1, line 2 - page 4, line 1 * * page 5, line 17 - page 5, line 27 * * page 8, line 10 - page 9, line 30; figure 1 *; | [XA]US2006145876 (KIMURA HITOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 8,9 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 1, paragraph 9 - page 2, paragraph 13 * * page 3, paragraph 34 - page 4, paragraph 48; figures 1-4 * [A] 10 | Examination | WO2004066903 |