EP2252153 - B RING REDUCED-D RING OXIDIZED TETRAPYROLLIC PHOTOSENSITIZERS FOR PHOTODYNAMIC THERAPY AND TUMOR IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HR | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Health Research, INC. Roswell Park Cancer Institute Elm and Carlton Streets Buffalo, NY 14263 / US | [2010/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Chao 56 Englewood Avenue Buffalo NY 14214 / US | 02 /
DOBHAL, Mahabeer 161 Princeton Avenue - 2 Amherst NY 14226 / US | 03 /
POTTER, William 166 Coriander Court Amherst NY 14051 / US | 04 /
MORGAN, Janet 529 Norwood Avenue Buffalo NY 14222 / US | 05 /
OSEROFF, Allan 269 Middlesex Road Buffalo NY 14216 / US | 06 /
PANDEY, Ravindra 75 Lemay Court Williamsville, NY 14221 / US | [2010/47] | Representative(s) | WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [2016/38] |
Former [2010/47] | WSL Patentanwälte Taunusstraße 5a 65183 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 09712567.8 | 19.02.2009 | [2010/47] | WO2009US01030 | Priority number, date | US20080066374P | 19.02.2008 Original published format: US 66374 P | [2016/24] |
Former [2010/47] | US20080066374 | 19.02.2008 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009105210 | Date: | 27.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2252153 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2252153 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.12.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A01N55/02 | [2010/47] | CPC: |
C07D487/22 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/38] |
Former [2010/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | IM B-RING REDUZIERTE UND IM D-RING OXIDIERTE TETRAPYRROL-PHOTOSENSITIZER FÜR DIE PHOTODYNAMISCHE THERAPIE UND DAS TUMOR-IMAGING | [2010/47] | English: | B RING REDUCED-D RING OXIDIZED TETRAPYROLLIC PHOTOSENSITIZERS FOR PHOTODYNAMIC THERAPY AND TUMOR IMAGING | [2010/47] | French: | PHOTOSENSIBILISATEURS TÉTRAPYROLLIQUES À ANNEAU B RÉDUIT-ANNEAU D OXYDÉ POUR UNE THÉRAPIE PHOTODYNAMIQUE ET UNE IMAGERIE DE TUMEUR | [2010/47] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/47] | 03.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.02.2009 | AT | 21.09.2016 | BE | 21.09.2016 | CY | 21.09.2016 | CZ | 21.09.2016 | DK | 21.09.2016 | EE | 21.09.2016 | ES | 21.09.2016 | FI | 21.09.2016 | HR | 21.09.2016 | IT | 21.09.2016 | LT | 21.09.2016 | LV | 21.09.2016 | MC | 21.09.2016 | MK | 21.09.2016 | NL | 21.09.2016 | PL | 21.09.2016 | RO | 21.09.2016 | SE | 21.09.2016 | SI | 21.09.2016 | SK | 21.09.2016 | TR | 21.09.2016 | BG | 21.12.2016 | NO | 21.12.2016 | GR | 22.12.2016 | IS | 21.01.2017 | PT | 23.01.2017 | IE | 19.02.2017 | LU | 19.02.2017 | MT | 19.02.2017 | CH | 28.02.2017 | LI | 28.02.2017 | [2020/30] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 19.02.2009 | |
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CY | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
MK | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
TR | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
IE | 19.02.2017 | ||
LU | 19.02.2017 | ||
MT | 19.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 19.02.2009 | |
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CY | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
MK | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
IE | 19.02.2017 | ||
LU | 19.02.2017 | ||
MT | 19.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 19.02.2009 | |
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CY | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
IE | 19.02.2017 | ||
LU | 19.02.2017 | ||
MT | 19.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 19.02.2009 | |
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
IE | 19.02.2017 | ||
LU | 19.02.2017 | ||
MT | 19.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
IE | 19.02.2017 | ||
LU | 19.02.2017 | ||
MT | 19.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
IE | 19.02.2017 | ||
LU | 19.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
LU | 19.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
IT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 21.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - PANDEY R K ET AL, "Synthesis, photophysical properties, in vivo photosensitizing efficacy, and human serum albumin binding properties of some novel bacteriochlorins", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19970815), vol. 40, no. 17, doi:10.1021/JM9702894, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 2770 - 2779, XP002209117 [X] 1-7 * page 2771; compound 8a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm9702894 | International search | [Y]US2006198783 (PANDEY RAVINDRA K [US], et al); | [Y]US5770730 (PANDEY RAVINDRA K [US], et al) | [YP] - LIU ET AL., "Highly Selective Synthesis of the Ring-B Reduced Chlorins by Ferric Chloride- Mediated Oxidation of Bacteriochlorins: Effects of the Fused Imide vs Isocyclic Ring on Photophysical and Electrochemical Properties", J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2008), vol. 130, no. 43, pages 14311 - 14323 |