EP2256086 - MICROPOROUS CARBONACEOUS MATERIAL, MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF, AND HYDROGEN STORAGE METHOD USING A MICROPOROUS CARBONACEOUS MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [2015/27] |
Former [2010/48] | For all designated states Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. 2, Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO, Masashi c/o Nissan Motor CO., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 02 /
KYOTANI, Takashi c/o TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 2-1-1, Katahira, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | 03 /
NISHIHARA, Hirotomo c/o TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 2-1-1, Katahira, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | 04 /
HOU, Peng-Xiang c/o TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 2-1-1, Katahira Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | 05 /
LI, Li-Xiang c/o TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 2-1-1, Katahira, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | 06 /
HADA, Kyohei c/o NIPPON STEEL CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 46-80, Nakabaru Sakinohama Tobata-ku, Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 804-8503 / JP | 07 /
MIZUUCHI, Kazuhiko c/o NIPPON STEEL CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 46-80, Nakabaru Sakinohama Tobata-ku, Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 804-8503 / JP | [2015/27] |
Former [2011/08] | 01 /
ITO, Masashi c/o Nissan Motor CO., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | ||
02 /
KYOTANI, Takashi c/o TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 2-1-1, Katahira, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | |||
03 /
NISHIHARA, Hirotomo c/o TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 2-1-1, Katahira, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | |||
04 /
HOU, Peng-Yiang c/o Intellectual Property Department of NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1 Morinosatoaoyama, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | |||
05 /
LI, Li-Xiang c/o TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 2-1-1, Katahira, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | |||
06 /
HADA, Kyohei c/o NIPPON STEEL CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 46-80, Nakabaru Sakinohama Tobata-ku, Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 804-8503 / JP | |||
07 /
MIZUUCHI, Kazuhiko c/o NIPPON STEEL CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 46-80, Nakabaru Sakinohama Tobata-ku, Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 804-8503 / JP | |||
Former [2010/48] | 01 /
ITO, Masashi c/o Nissan Motor CO., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | ||
02 /
KYOTANI, Takashi c/o TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 2-1-1, Katahira, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | |||
03 /
NISHIHARA, Hirotomo c/o TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 2-1-1, Katahira, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | |||
04 /
HOU, Peng-Yiang c/o TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 2-1-1, Katahira, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | |||
05 /
LI, Li-Xiang c/o TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 2-1-1, Katahira, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 980-8577 / JP | |||
06 /
HADA, Kyohei c/o NIPPON STEEL CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 46-80, Nakabaru Sakinohama Tobata-ku, Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 804-8503 / JP | |||
07 /
MIZUUCHI, Kazuhiko c/o NIPPON STEEL CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 46-80, Nakabaru Sakinohama Tobata-ku, Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 804-8503 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2015/27] |
Former [2010/48] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09713967.9 | 25.02.2009 | [2010/48] | WO2009JP53450 | Priority number, date | JP20080045069 | 26.02.2008 Original published format: JP 2008045069 | JP20080268753 | 17.10.2008 Original published format: JP 2008268753 | JP20090040932 | 24.02.2009 Original published format: JP 2009040932 | [2010/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009107678 | Date: | 03.09.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2256086 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2256086 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.09.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C01B31/00, B01J20/20, B01J20/32, B01J20/28, B82Y30/00, C01B3/00, C04B35/52, C04B38/00, B01J20/30 | [2015/02] | CPC: |
B01J20/20 (EP);
B01J20/2808 (EP);
B01J20/28097 (EP);
B01J20/3057 (EP);
B01J20/3236 (EP);
B82Y30/00 (EP);
C01B3/0021 (EP);
C01B32/00 (EP);
C01B32/05 (EP);
C04B35/52 (EP);
C04B35/524 (EP);
C04B38/0022 (EP);
C04B2111/0081 (EP);
C04B2111/00853 (EP);
C04B2235/3472 (EP);
C04B2235/3481 (EP);
C04B2235/40 (EP);
C04B2235/408 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C04B38/0022, C04B35/524, C04B38/0054, C04B38/106 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/45] | C01B31/02, B01J20/20, C04B35/52, C01B3/00, B01J20/28, B01J20/32, B82Y30/00, C04B35/00, C04B38/00, C04B111/00, C04B35/524, B01J20/30 | ||
Former IPC [2010/48] | C01B31/02, B01J20/20, C04B35/52, C01B3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/27] |
Former [2010/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MIKROPORÖSES KOHLENSTOFFHALTIGES MATERIAL, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND VERFAHREN ZUR SPEICHERUNG VON WASSERSTOFF UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES MIKROPORÖSEN KOHLENSTOFFHALTIGEN MATERIALS | [2010/48] | English: | MICROPOROUS CARBONACEOUS MATERIAL, MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF, AND HYDROGEN STORAGE METHOD USING A MICROPOROUS CARBONACEOUS MATERIAL | [2010/48] | French: | MATIÈRE CARBONÉE MICROPOREUSE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE STOCKAGE D'HYDROGÈNE À L'AIDE D'UNE MATIÈRE CARBONÉE MICROPOREUSE | [2010/48] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2010 | Translation filed | 20.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 20.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/48] | 27.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.02.2009 | AT | 01.07.2015 | BE | 01.07.2015 | BG | 01.07.2015 | CY | 01.07.2015 | CZ | 01.07.2015 | DK | 01.07.2015 | EE | 01.07.2015 | ES | 01.07.2015 | FI | 01.07.2015 | HR | 01.07.2015 | IT | 01.07.2015 | LT | 01.07.2015 | LV | 01.07.2015 | MC | 01.07.2015 | MK | 01.07.2015 | NL | 01.07.2015 | PL | 01.07.2015 | RO | 01.07.2015 | SE | 01.07.2015 | SI | 01.07.2015 | SK | 01.07.2015 | TR | 01.07.2015 | NO | 01.10.2015 | GR | 02.10.2015 | IS | 01.11.2015 | PT | 02.11.2015 | IE | 25.02.2016 | LU | 25.02.2016 | CH | 29.02.2016 | LI | 29.02.2016 | MT | 29.02.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 25.02.2009 | |
AT | 01.07.2015 | ||
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CY | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
MK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NL | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
TR | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
IE | 25.02.2016 | ||
LU | 25.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
MT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 25.02.2009 | |
AT | 01.07.2015 | ||
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CY | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
MK | 01.07.2015 | ||
MT | 01.07.2015 | ||
NL | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
TR | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
IE | 25.02.2016 | ||
LU | 25.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 25.02.2009 | |
AT | 01.07.2015 | ||
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CY | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
MK | 01.07.2015 | ||
MT | 01.07.2015 | ||
NL | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
IE | 25.02.2016 | ||
LU | 25.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
MT | 01.07.2015 | ||
NL | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
IE | 25.02.2016 | ||
LU | 25.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
IE | 25.02.2016 | ||
LU | 25.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
LU | 25.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
LU | 25.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/43] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
LU | 25.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 01.07.2015 | |
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 01.07.2015 | |
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 01.07.2015 | |
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 01.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003170165 (KOJIMA YOSHITSUGU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,14 * paragraphs [0064] , [0065] , [0086]; table 7 * * the whole document * [I] 3; | [XI] - COKER ET AL, "Nanostructured Pt/C electrocatalysts with high platinum dispersions through zeolite-templating", MICROPOROUS AND MESOPOROUS MATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHING, NEW YORK, US, (20070327), vol. 101, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.MICROMESO.2006.12.022, ISSN 1387-1811, pages 440 - 444, XP022003264 [X] 1,3,5,7,13,14 * 2.1 Sample preparation;; page 442, column r, paragraph 1 * * the whole document * [I] 2,4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.micromeso.2006.12.022 | [A] - SU ET AL, "Template synthesis of microporous carbon for direct methanol fuel cell application", CARBON, ELSEVIER, OXFORD, GB, (20050901), vol. 43, no. 11, doi:10.1016/J.CARBON.2005.04.018, ISSN 0008-6223, pages 2366 - 2373, XP005000946 [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 2367, column r * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carbon.2005.04.018 | International search | [X] - COKER, E. N. ET AL., "Nanostructured Pt/C electrocatalysts with high platinum dispersions through zeolite-templating", MIRCOPOROUS MESOPOROUS MAT., (20070420), vol. 101, no. 3, pages 440 - 444, XP022003264 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.micromeso.2006.12.022 | [X] - SU, F. ET AL., "Template synthesis of microporous carbon for direct methanol fuel cell application", CARBON, (200509), vol. 43, no. 11, pages 2366 - 2373, XP005000946 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carbon.2005.04.018 | by applicant | JP3951567B | JP2003206112 | - ROOR ET AL., J. PHYS. CHEM., (1999), vol. 103, pages 7743 - 7746 | - LEEJ ET AL., CHEM. COMMUN., (1999), pages 2177 - 2178 | - KYOTANI ET AL., CHEM. COMMUN., (2000), pages 2365 - 2366 | - MAZX ET AL., CARBON, (2002), vol. 40, pages 2367 - 2374 |