EP2247788 - EMBOSSED FIBROUS STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 27.05.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2014/51] |
Former [2010/45] | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANIFOLD, John, Allen 8091 East State Route 48 Milan Indiana 47031 / US | 02 /
EKENGA, Charles, Chidozie 2118A Gilbert Cincinnati Ohio 45206 / US | 03 /
BARKEY, Douglas, Jay 964 Airymeadows Drive Hamilton Township Ohio 45039 / US | 04 /
SANDS, Kathleen, Diane 7972 Kennesaw Drive West Chester Ohio 45069 / US | 05 /
KNOBLOCH, Thorsten 1363 Herschel Avenue Cincinnati, Ohio 45208 / US | [2011/01] |
Former [2010/45] | 01 /
MANIFOLD, John, Allen 8091 East State Route 48 Milan Indiana 47031 / US | ||
02 /
EKENGA, Charles, Chidozie 2118A Gilbert Cincinnati Ohio 45206 / US | |||
03 /
BARKEY, Douglas, Jay 964 Airymeadows Drive Hamilton Township Ohio 45039 / US | |||
04 /
SANDS, Kathleen, Diane 7972 Kennesaw Drive West Chester Ohio 45069 / US | |||
05 /
KNOBLOCH, Thorsten 6743 Miami Woods Drive Loveland Ohio 45140 / US | Representative(s) | Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2013/10] | Nargolwalla, Cyra, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2010/45] | Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 09714099.0 | 13.02.2009 | [2010/45] | WO2009IB50610 | Priority number, date | US20080040692 | 29.02.2008 Original published format: US 40692 | [2010/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009107022 | Date: | 03.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2247788 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2247788 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | D21H27/00 | [2010/45] | CPC: |
D21H27/005 (EP,US);
C08L97/02 (US);
D21H27/02 (EP,US);
B27N3/28 (US);
Y10T428/24124 (EP,US);
Y10T428/253 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/45] | Title | German: | GEPRÄGTE FASERSTRUKTUREN | [2014/31] | English: | EMBOSSED FIBROUS STRUCTURES | [2010/45] | French: | STRUCTURES FIBREUSES GAUFRÉES | [2010/45] |
Former [2010/45] | GEPRÄGTE FASERSTRUKTUREN | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/45] | 16.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.05.2015
ADMISSIBLE Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 2300 Winchester Road Neenah WI 54956 / US Opponent's representative Davies, Christopher Robert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.05.2015
ADMISSIBLE Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 2300 Winchester Road Neenah WI 54956 / US Opponent's representative Davies, Christopher Robert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | 22.10.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.02.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 25.02.2016 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2016/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.02.2009 | AT | 17.12.2014 | BE | 17.12.2014 | BG | 17.12.2014 | CY | 17.12.2014 | CZ | 17.12.2014 | DK | 17.12.2014 | EE | 17.12.2014 | ES | 17.12.2014 | FI | 17.12.2014 | HR | 17.12.2014 | IT | 17.12.2014 | LT | 17.12.2014 | LV | 17.12.2014 | MC | 17.12.2014 | NL | 17.12.2014 | PL | 17.12.2014 | PT | 17.12.2014 | RO | 17.12.2014 | SI | 17.12.2014 | SK | 17.12.2014 | TR | 17.12.2014 | IE | 13.02.2015 | LU | 13.02.2015 | CH | 28.02.2015 | LI | 28.02.2015 | MT | 28.02.2015 | NO | 17.03.2015 | GR | 18.03.2015 | IS | 17.04.2015 | [2022/27] |
Former [2020/22] | HU | 13.02.2009 | |
AT | 17.12.2014 | ||
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
BG | 17.12.2014 | ||
CY | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PT | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 13.02.2015 | ||
LU | 13.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
MT | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2020/21] | HU | 13.02.2009 | |
AT | 17.12.2014 | ||
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
BG | 17.12.2014 | ||
CY | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 13.02.2015 | ||
LU | 13.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
MT | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2019/38] | HU | 13.02.2009 | |
AT | 17.12.2014 | ||
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
BG | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 13.02.2015 | ||
LU | 13.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
MT | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2018/34] | HU | 13.02.2009 | |
AT | 17.12.2014 | ||
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 13.02.2015 | ||
LU | 13.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
MT | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | HU | 13.02.2009 | |
AT | 17.12.2014 | ||
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 13.02.2015 | ||
LU | 13.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
BE | 17.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 13.02.2015 | ||
LU | 13.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SI | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 13.02.2015 | ||
LU | 13.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
IE | 13.02.2015 | ||
LU | 13.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
IT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
LU | 13.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
DK | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
LU | 13.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
LU | 13.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
MC | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
LU | 13.02.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/44] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
LU | 13.02.2015 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 17.12.2014 | |
CZ | 17.12.2014 | ||
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IS | 17.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 17.12.2014 | |
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
PL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
SK | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 17.12.2014 | |
EE | 17.12.2014 | ||
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
RO | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | EE | 17.12.2014 | |
ES | 17.12.2014 | ||
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 17.12.2014 | |
FI | 17.12.2014 | ||
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/29] | FI | 17.12.2014 | |
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NL | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 17.12.2014 | |
HR | 17.12.2014 | ||
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
LV | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
GR | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 17.12.2014 | |
LT | 17.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 17.12.2014 | |
NO | 17.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 17.12.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3974025 (AYERS PETER G); | [X]US2005045293 (HERMANS MICHAEL ALAN [US], et al); | [X]WO2005068720 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US], et al); | [X]WO2007070124 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US], et al); | [X]EP1876291 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) | by applicant | US2005045293 | WO2005068720 | WO2007070124 | EP1876291 |