EP2252658 - WOOD COMPOSITION CONTAINING OLEFINS, USE OF OLEFINS FOR RENDERING RAW WOOD MATERIALS WATER REPELLENT, AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF WOOD MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 01.04.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2016 | Opposition rejected | published on 04.05.2016 [2016/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sasol Wax GmbH Worthdamm 13-27 20457 Hamburg / DE | [2010/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUCHHOLZ, Thomas An der Eulenburg 18 21391 Reppenstedt / DE | 02 /
MEYER, Gernot Am Hamboken 15o 21244 Rosengarten / DE | 03 /
PRÜSMANN, Marc Luhdorfer Bahnhofstrasse 2A 21423 Winsen / DE | [2011/03] |
Former [2010/47] | 01 /
BUCHHOLZ, Thomas An der Landwehr 27 21391 Reppenstedt / DE | ||
02 /
MEYER, Gernot Am Hamboken 15o 21244 Rosengarten / DE | |||
03 /
PRÜSMANN, Marc Luhdorfer Bahnhofstrasse 2A 21423 Winsen / DE | Representative(s) | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB (Muc) Schellerdamm 19 21079 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/12] | Müller Schupfner & Partner Schellerdamm 19 21079 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2012/08] | Schupfner, Georg, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Schellerdamm 19 21079 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2010/47] | Schupfner, Georg, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Parkstrasse 1 21244 Buchholz / DE | Application number, filing date | 09714248.3 | 25.02.2009 | [2010/47] | WO2009DE00252 | Priority number, date | DE20081011163 | 26.02.2008 Original published format: DE102008011163 | [2010/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009106052 | Date: | 03.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2252658 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2252658 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/08] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2252658 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | [2014/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08L97/02, B27N3/00 | [2010/47] | CPC: |
B27N1/006 (EP,US);
C08L97/02 (EP,US);
C08L91/06 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249925 (EP,US);
Y10T428/253 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2982 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L97/02, C08L91/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/47] | Title | German: | HOLZWERKSTOFF-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ENTHALTEND OLEFINE UND VERWENDUNG VON OLEFINEN ZUR HYDROPHOBIERUNG VON HOLZWERKSTOFF-ROHSTOFFEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HOLZWERKSTOFFEN | [2010/47] | English: | WOOD COMPOSITION CONTAINING OLEFINS, USE OF OLEFINS FOR RENDERING RAW WOOD MATERIALS WATER REPELLENT, AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF WOOD MATERIALS | [2010/47] | French: | COMPOSITION DE MATÉRIAU DÉRIVÉ DU BOIS CONTENANT DES OLÉFINES, UTILISATION D'OLÉFINES POUR L'HYDROFUGATION DE MATIÈRES PREMIÈRES POUR DÉRIVÉS DU BOIS ET PROCÉDÉ POUR PRODUIRE DES MATÉRIAUX DÉRIVÉS DU BOIS | [2010/47] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/47] | 01.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.11.2012
29.11.2012
ADMISSIBLE BARDEHLE PAGENBERG Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE Opponent's representative Bublak, Wolfgang, et al, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.11.2012
29.11.2012
ADMISSIBLE BARDEHLE PAGENBERG Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE Opponent's representative Bublak, Wolfgang, et al, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | 11.01.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.07.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.12.2015 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2016/18] | 02.12.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.12.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 21.12.2015 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.02.2012 | DK | 22.02.2012 | EE | 22.02.2012 | FI | 22.02.2012 | HR | 22.02.2012 | IE | 22.02.2012 | LT | 22.02.2012 | LV | 22.02.2012 | MK | 22.02.2012 | MT | 22.02.2012 | NL | 22.02.2012 | SI | 22.02.2012 | SK | 22.02.2012 | TR | 22.02.2012 | LU | 25.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | BG | 22.05.2012 | NO | 22.05.2012 | GR | 23.05.2012 | IS | 22.06.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
HR | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
MK | 22.02.2012 | ||
MT | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
TR | 22.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
NO | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
HR | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
MK | 22.02.2012 | ||
MT | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
NO | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
HR | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
MK | 22.02.2012 | ||
MT | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
NO | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
HR | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
MK | 22.02.2012 | ||
MT | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
NO | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
HR | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
MK | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
NO | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
HR | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
HR | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
HR | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
HR | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
HR | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
HR | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
NO | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 22.02.2012 | |
HR | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
NO | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 22.02.2012 | |
HR | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
NO | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 22.02.2012 | |
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
NO | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 22.02.2012 | |
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
NO | 22.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 22.02.2012 | |
NO | 22.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4404239 (GRUNEWALDER JOHN F [US]) [A] 1-23* claim 1 *; | [X]EP1203647 (WACKER POLYMER SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-23 * paragraph [0020] *; | [X]DE102005029740 (OECOPAC GRUNERT VERPACKUNGEN G [DE]) [X] 1-19,23 * paragraph [0021] *; | [X]WO2007115534 (SASOL WAX GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-23 * claim 12 * * page 3, lines 5-13 *; | [PX]WO2008141635 (SASOL WAX GMBH [DE], et al) [PX] 1-23 * claim 1 * * page 3, lines 6-13 * |