Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8231763 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2012 | B2 | US2011042021 | 24.02.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102008011163 | 26.02.2008 | WO2009DE00252 | 25.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2713873 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2016 | C | CA2713873 | 03.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102008011163 | 26.02.2008 | WO2009DE00252 | 25.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009218902B | Global Dossier | 15.08.2013 | B2 | AU2009218902 | 03.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102008011163 | 26.02.2008 | WO2009DE00252 | 25.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2252658 | Global Dossier | 19.11.2014 | B9 | EP2252658 | 22.02.2012 | B1 | EP2252658 | 24.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102008011163 | 26.02.2008 | WO2009DE00252 | 25.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE546491T | 15.03.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE102008011163 | 26.02.2008 | WO2009DE00252 | 25.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2384023T | 28.06.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102008011163 | 26.02.2008 | WO2009DE00252 | 25.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ587565 | 27.07.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102008011163 | 26.02.2008 | WO2009DE00252 | 25.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2252658T | 31.07.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102008011163 | 26.02.2008 | WO2009DE00252 | 25.02.2009 | EP09714248 | 25.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2492196 | 10.09.2013 | C2 | RU2010138195 | 10.04.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102008011163 | 26.02.2008 | WO2009DE00252 | 25.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201005699 | 28.04.2011 | B | Priority number | Date | DE102008011163 | 26.02.2008 | WO2009DE00252 | 25.02.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009106052 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102008011163 | 26.02.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102008011163 | 27.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102008011163 | 26.02.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2252658E | 28.05.2012 | E | Priority number | Date | DE102008011163 | 26.02.2008 |