EP2249958 - REACTOR FOR THE PREPARATION OF METHANOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haldor Topso̸e A/S Nymolievej 55 2800 Lyngby / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2011/31] | For all designated states Haldor Topsoe A/S Nymolievej 55 2800 Lyngby / DK | ||
Former [2010/46] | For all designated states Haldor Topsoe A/S Nymollevej 55 2800 Lyngby / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THORHAUGE, Max Dalbugten 26 DK-2730 Herlev / DK | [2010/46] | Application number, filing date | 09714360.6 | 12.02.2009 | [2010/46] | WO2009EP00972 | Priority number, date | DK20080000260 | 25.02.2008 Original published format: DK 200800260 | DK20080000261 | 25.02.2008 Original published format: DK 200800261 | [2010/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009106231 | Date: | 03.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2249958 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2249958 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/02, B01J8/06 | [2010/46] | CPC: |
B01J8/0285 (EP,US);
B01J8/06 (KR);
B01J8/009 (EP,US);
B01J8/0214 (EP,US);
B01J8/0292 (EP,US);
B01J8/065 (KR);
B01J8/067 (EP,US);
C07C29/152 (EP,KR,US);
C07C31/04 (KR);
B01J2208/00115 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00123 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00132 (EP,US);
B01J2208/0015 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00212 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00772 (EP,US);
Y02P20/52 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/152, C07C31/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/46] | Title | German: | REAKTOR ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON METHANOL | [2010/46] | English: | REACTOR FOR THE PREPARATION OF METHANOL | [2010/46] | French: | RÉACTEUR POUR LA PRÉPARATION DE MÉTHANOL | [2010/46] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/46] | 27.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.02.2009 | AT | 24.08.2011 | BE | 24.08.2011 | CY | 24.08.2011 | DK | 24.08.2011 | EE | 24.08.2011 | HR | 24.08.2011 | LT | 24.08.2011 | LV | 24.08.2011 | MK | 24.08.2011 | MT | 24.08.2011 | SI | 24.08.2011 | SK | 24.08.2011 | TR | 24.08.2011 | BG | 24.11.2011 | GR | 25.11.2011 | IS | 24.12.2011 | PT | 26.12.2011 | IE | 12.02.2012 | LU | 12.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MK | 24.08.2011 | ||
MT | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
TR | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
IE | 12.02.2012 | ||
LU | 12.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MK | 24.08.2011 | ||
MT | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
TR | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
IE | 12.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MK | 24.08.2011 | ||
MT | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
IE | 12.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MK | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
IE | 12.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
MK | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
IE | 12.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
IE | 12.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/14] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
HR | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LV | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
GR | 25.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
PT | 26.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1565824 (ICI LTD); | [A]EP0737646 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]); | [A]WO9804342 (SYNTROLEUM CORP [US]); | [A]US2003068260 (WELLINGTON SCOTT LEE [US], et al) | by applicant | US4731387 | US5262443 |