EP2249511 - INFORMATION SECURITY DEVICE AND INFORMATION SECURITY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2013 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/45] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUSHIMA, Hideki c/o Panasonic Corporation, IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
TAKAYAMA, Hisashi c/o Panasonic Corporation, IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
ITO, Takayuki c/o Panasonic Corporation, IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
HAGA, Tomoyuki c/o Panasonic Corporation, IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
FUTA, Yuichi c/o Panasonic Corporation, IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 06 /
SATO, Taichi c/o Panasonic Corporation, IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2010/45] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/45] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09714837.3 | 23.02.2009 | [2010/45] | WO2009JP00761 | Priority number, date | JP20080043008 | 25.02.2008 Original published format: JP 2008043008 | [2010/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009107351 | Date: | 03.09.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2249511 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/16, G06F21/24, G09C1/00, H04L9/08, H04L9/32 | [2010/45] | CPC: |
G06F9/45558 (EP,US);
G06F21/1082 (EP,US);
G06F21/57 (EP,US);
H04L9/14 (EP,US);
H04L9/3234 (EP,US);
H04L9/3247 (EP,US);
H04L9/3263 (EP,US);
G06F2009/45587 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2137 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/45] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSSICHERHEITSVORRICHTUNG UND INFORMATIONSSICHERHEITSSYSTEM | [2010/45] | English: | INFORMATION SECURITY DEVICE AND INFORMATION SECURITY SYSTEM | [2010/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SÉCURITÉ D'INFORMATIONS ET SYSTÈME DE SÉCURITÉ D'INFORMATIONS | [2010/45] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2010 | Translation filed | 19.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2010 | Search fee paid | 19.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/45] | 05.02.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH1188859 (IBM); | [A]JP2005102188 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]WO2006092840 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al); | [AE]WO2009001539 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) | [A] - HIROYOSHI HARUKI ET AL., "Tai Tamper Processor L-MSP ni Okeru Process Migration to Process Ichiisei no Kosatsu", Symposium on Multimedia, Distributed, Cooperative and Mobile Systems(DICOMO 2005) Ronbunshu, 06 July, 2005 (06.07.05), vol. 2005, pages 705 - 708 |