EP2255392 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FABRICATING COMPOSITE SUBSTRATES FOR THIN FILM ELECTRO-OPTICAL DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/48] | METHOD AND APPARTUS FOR FABRICATING COMPOSITE SUBSTRATES FOR THIN FILM ELECTRO-OPTICAL DEVICES | ||
[2017/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sunlight Photonics Inc. 2045 Lincoln Highway Suite One West Edison, NJ 08817 / US | [2017/21] |
Former [2010/48] | For all designated states Sunlight Photonics Inc. 600 Corporate Court, Ste C South Plainfield, NJ 07080 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FROLOV, Sergey 226 Gallinson Drive Murray Hill New Jersey 07974 / US | 02 /
CYRUS, Michael 26 Locust Drive No. 41 Summit New Jersey 07901 / US | [2017/23] |
Former [2010/48] | 01 /
FROLOV, Sergey 226 Gallinson Drive Murray Hill New Jersey 07974 / US | ||
02 /
CYRUS, Michael 26 Locust Drive No. 41 Summit New Jersey 07901 / US | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [2017/23] |
Former [2010/48] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09715056.9 | 26.02.2009 | [2010/48] | WO2009US35322 | Priority number, date | US20080038893 | 28.02.2008 Original published format: US 38893 | [2010/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009108800 | Date: | 03.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2255392 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2255392 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.11.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/043, H01L31/054, H01L31/0224, H01L31/0392 | [2016/52] | CPC: |
H01L31/022433 (EP,US);
H01L31/022466 (EP,US);
H01L31/0392 (EP,US);
H01L31/03926 (EP,US);
H01L31/043 (EP,US);
H01L31/0543 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01015 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01047 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/48 (US,EP);
H01L2924/01015, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/01047, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/207, H01L2924/0002 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2013/42] | H01L25/04, H01L31/052, H01L31/0224, H01L31/0392, H01L31/05 | ||
Former IPC [2010/48] | H01L31/042 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/23] |
Former [2010/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN ZUSAMMENGESETZTER SUBSTRATE FÜR ELEKTROOPTISCHE DÜNNFILMANORDNUNGEN | [2010/48] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FABRICATING COMPOSITE SUBSTRATES FOR THIN FILM ELECTRO-OPTICAL DEVICES | [2017/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA FABRICATION DE SUBSTRATS COMPOSITES POUR DISPOSITIFS ÉLECTRO-OPTIQUES À FILM MINCE | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/48] | METHOD AND APPARTUS FOR FABRICATING COMPOSITE SUBSTRATES FOR THIN FILM ELECTRO-OPTICAL DEVICES | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/48] | 16.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.02.2009 | AT | 07.06.2017 | CY | 07.06.2017 | CZ | 07.06.2017 | DK | 07.06.2017 | EE | 07.06.2017 | FI | 07.06.2017 | HR | 07.06.2017 | LT | 07.06.2017 | LV | 07.06.2017 | MC | 07.06.2017 | MK | 07.06.2017 | NL | 07.06.2017 | PL | 07.06.2017 | PT | 07.06.2017 | RO | 07.06.2017 | SE | 07.06.2017 | SI | 07.06.2017 | SK | 07.06.2017 | TR | 07.06.2017 | BG | 07.09.2017 | NO | 07.09.2017 | GR | 08.09.2017 | IS | 07.10.2017 | IE | 26.02.2018 | LU | 26.02.2018 | MT | 26.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | CH | 28.02.2018 | LI | 28.02.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 26.02.2009 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PT | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
TR | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
IE | 26.02.2018 | ||
LU | 26.02.2018 | ||
MT | 26.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
TR | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
IE | 26.02.2018 | ||
LU | 26.02.2018 | ||
MT | 26.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
IE | 26.02.2018 | ||
LU | 26.02.2018 | ||
MT | 26.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
IE | 26.02.2018 | ||
LU | 26.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
IE | 26.02.2018 | ||
LU | 26.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
LU | 26.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 07.06.2017 | |
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | FI | 07.06.2017 | |
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 07.06.2017 | |
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 07.06.2017 | |
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6050975 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [X] 1-3,8,12 * abstract *; | [A]US5019176 (BRANDHORST JR HENRY W [US], et al) [A] 1-4,8,12 * abstract * * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 19 ** column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 14; figures 1,2,3,5 *; | [XI]US5554229 (VOGELI CRAIG N [US]) [X] 1-3,5-9,11-13 * column 3, line 5 - column 6, line 44; figures 1-4 * [I] 4,10 | International search | [X]JPH03205879 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP2004047825 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [X]JP2004146425 (FUJIKURA LTD); | [A]JP2005317225 (ENPLAS CORP) | Examination | US4379202 | US5076857 | DE9421390U |