EP2248663 - MATERIAL FOR ELECTRICAL/ELECTRONIC COMPONENT AND ELECTRICAL/ELECTRONIC COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.04.2012 [2012/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [2010/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TACHIBANA, Akira c/o THE FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 02 /
ITO, Takayori c/o THE FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 03 /
SUGAHARA, Chikahito c/o THE FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [2010/45] | Representative(s) | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al Boeters & Lieck Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/45] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al Boeters & Lieck Oberanger 32 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09715665.7 | 26.02.2009 | [2010/45] | WO2009JP53608 | Priority number, date | JP20080046021 | 27.02.2008 Original published format: JP 2008046021 | [2010/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009107752 | Date: | 03.09.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2248663 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B32B15/088, B32B15/08, C23C26/00 | [2010/45] | CPC: |
C08G73/1053 (EP,US);
C08G73/1035 (EP,US);
C08G73/1067 (EP,US);
C08G73/1075 (EP,US);
C08G73/14 (EP,US);
C09D179/08 (EP,US);
H05K9/0084 (EP,US);
H01B3/306 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12569 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31681 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/45] | Title | German: | MATERIAL FÜR ELEKTRISCHES/ELEKTRONISCHES BAUTEIL UND ELEKTRISCHES/ELEKTRONISCHES BAUTEIL | [2010/45] | English: | MATERIAL FOR ELECTRICAL/ELECTRONIC COMPONENT AND ELECTRICAL/ELECTRONIC COMPONENT | [2010/45] | French: | MATÉRIAU POUR COMPOSANT ÉLECTRIQUE/ÉLECTRONIQUE ET COMPOSANT ÉLECTRIQUE/ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2010/45] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2010 | Translation filed | 01.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 01.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/45] | 02.03.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH05271438 (UBE INDUSTRIES, LTD.); | [X]JPH08230101 (UBE INDUSTRIES); | [X]JPH0999518 (UBE INDUSTRIES); | [X]JPH09291159 (UBE INDUSTRIES); | [X]JP2006130925 (UBE INDUSTRIES); | [X]JP2008023760 (UBE INDUSTRIES) | by applicant | JPH05245432 | JP2802402B | JP2004197224 |