EP2245022 - ANTAGONISTS OF PROSTAGLANDIN D2 RECEPTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panmira Pharmaceuticals, LLC 9535 Waples Street, Suite 100 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2011/48] |
Former [2010/44] | For all designated states Amira Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 9535 Waples Street, Suite 100 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUTCHINSON, John Howard 3435 Richmond Street San Diego CA 92103 / US | 02 /
STEARNS, Brian Andrew 157 Beechtree Drive Encinatas CA 92024 / US | 03 /
SEIDERS, Thomas Jon 5257 Soledad Mountain Road San Diego California 92109 / US | 04 /
SCOTT, Jill Melissa 456 Birmingham Drive Cardiff California 92007 / US | 05 /
ARRUDA, Jeannie M. 3611 Florida St. 4 San Diego California 92104 / US | 06 /
WANG, Bowei 10 Kirkview Circle Westfield NJ 07090 / US | [2010/44] | Representative(s) | Cole, William Gwyn, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 J J Thomson Avenue Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/44] | Cole, William Gwyn, et al HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane GB-Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09715996.6 | 25.02.2009 | [2010/44] | WO2009US35174 | Priority number, date | US20080031310 | 25.02.2008 Original published format: US 31310 | [2010/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009108720 | Date: | 03.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2245022 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.11.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D285/04, C07D291/04, C07D275/03, A61P29/00, A61P37/08, C07D233/06, C07D263/22, C07D263/52 | [2012/08] | CPC: |
C07D285/04 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P11/10 (EP);
A61P11/14 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D233/06 (EP,US);
C07D263/22 (EP,US);
C07D263/52 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/44] | C07D285/04, C07D291/04, C07D275/03, A61P29/00, A61P37/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/44] | Extension states | AL | 24.08.2010 | BA | 24.08.2010 | RS | 24.08.2010 | Title | German: | ANTAGONISTEN VON PROSTAGLANDIN-D2-REZEPTOREN | [2010/44] | English: | ANTAGONISTS OF PROSTAGLANDIN D2 RECEPTORS | [2010/44] | French: | ANTAGONISTES DES RÉCEPTEURS D2 DE LA PROSTAGLANDINE | [2010/44] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2010 | Search fee paid | 24.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/44] | 14.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/07] | 27.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2004094372 (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US], et al) [X] 1,2,11-15 * Ex. 11, title compound; ex. 11, intermediate of step C; paragraph [0368]; claim 1 * [I] 1,2,11-15; | [A]WO2006037982 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2007047378 (AVENTIS PHARMA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2004214888 (MATSUURA FUMIYOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]JP2004182657 (EISAI CO LTD); | [X]WO0149288 (MERCK FROSST CANADA INC [CA], et al) |