EP2247440 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING THIN FLAKE PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vast Films, Ltd. 101 Aid Drive Darlington, Pennsylvania 16115 / US | [2010/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DECKER, Wolfgang 177 Evergreen Trail Beaver Falls Pennsylvania 15010 / US | [2010/45] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/48] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/45] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09716293.7 | 26.02.2009 | [2010/45] | WO2009US35312 | Priority number, date | US20080033549 | 04.03.2008 Original published format: US 33549 | [2010/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009111268 | Date: | 11.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2247440 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2247440 | Date: | 26.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.09.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/00, C09C1/62, C09C1/64, B32B5/16 | [2011/10] | CPC: |
C09C1/0018 (EP,US);
C09C1/0015 (EP,US);
C09C1/622 (EP,US);
C09C1/64 (EP,US);
C01P2004/03 (EP,US);
C01P2004/20 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C09C2200/1004 (EP,US);
C09C2200/1054 (EP,US);
C09C2220/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/45] | B32B5/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DÜNNER FLOCKENTEILCHEN | [2010/45] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING THIN FLAKE PARTICLES | [2010/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE MINCES PARTICULES DE FLOCON | [2010/45] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 02.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/45] | 22.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 16.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.02.2009 | AT | 26.11.2014 | BE | 26.11.2014 | BG | 26.11.2014 | CY | 26.11.2014 | CZ | 26.11.2014 | DK | 26.11.2014 | EE | 26.11.2014 | ES | 26.11.2014 | FI | 26.11.2014 | HR | 26.11.2014 | IT | 26.11.2014 | LT | 26.11.2014 | LV | 26.11.2014 | MC | 26.11.2014 | MK | 26.11.2014 | MT | 26.11.2014 | NL | 26.11.2014 | PL | 26.11.2014 | RO | 26.11.2014 | SE | 26.11.2014 | SI | 26.11.2014 | SK | 26.11.2014 | TR | 26.11.2014 | IE | 26.02.2015 | LU | 26.02.2015 | NO | 26.02.2015 | GR | 27.02.2015 | IS | 26.03.2015 | PT | 26.03.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/46] | HU | 26.02.2009 | |
AT | 26.11.2014 | ||
BE | 26.11.2014 | ||
BG | 26.11.2014 | ||
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
MT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
TR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IE | 26.02.2015 | ||
LU | 26.02.2015 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 26.02.2009 | |
AT | 26.11.2014 | ||
BG | 26.11.2014 | ||
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
MT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
TR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IE | 26.02.2015 | ||
LU | 26.02.2015 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
MT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
IE | 26.02.2015 | ||
LU | 26.02.2015 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
IE | 26.02.2015 | ||
LU | 26.02.2015 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
IE | 26.02.2015 | ||
LU | 26.02.2015 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
LU | 26.02.2015 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
LU | 26.02.2015 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/44] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
LU | 26.02.2015 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 26.11.2014 | |
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 26.11.2014 | |
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 26.11.2014 | |
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 26.11.2014 | |
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 26.11.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0916704 (MITSUBISHI POLYESTER FILM LLC [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0015] , [0019] , [0051] , [0059] *; | [X]WO2007105001 (DUPONT TEIJIN FILMS US LTD [US], et al) [X] 1-15* page 23 * | International search | [Y]US2941894 (MCADOW WALTER R); | [A]US5156720 (ROSENFELD ARON M [CA], et al); | [A]US5653792 (PHILLIPS ROGER W [US], et al); | [X]US2004146642 (JOSEPHY KARL [US], et al); | [A]US2006267241 (ARGOITIA ALBERTO [US]) | by applicant | EP0916704 | WO2007105001 |