EP2247797 - FLEXIBLE STABILIZING STRIP INTENDED TO BE USED IN REINFORCED SOIL CONSTRUCTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Terre Armée Internationale 1 bis Rue du Petit Clamart 78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR | [2010/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREITAG, Nicolas 1 bis rue Racine F-91400 Orsay / FR | 02 /
MORIZOT, Jean-Claude 28 rue de la Dhuis F-75020 Paris / FR | [2010/45] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/22] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2010/45] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09716476.8 | 16.02.2009 | [2010/45] | WO2009EP51812 | Priority number, date | FR20080051407 | 04.03.2008 Original published format: FR 0851407 | [2010/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009109458 | Date: | 11.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2247797 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2247797 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E02D29/02 | [2010/45] | CPC: |
E02D29/0241 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/45] | Title | German: | FLEXIBLER STABILISIERUNGSSTREIFEN ZUR VERWENDUNG IN VERSTÄRKTEN BODENKONSTRUKTIONEN | [2010/45] | English: | FLEXIBLE STABILIZING STRIP INTENDED TO BE USED IN REINFORCED SOIL CONSTRUCTIONS | [2010/45] | French: | BANDE STABILISATRICE SOUPLE DESTINÉE À ÊTRE UTILISÉE DANS DES CONSTRUCTIONS EN TERRE ARMÉE | [2010/45] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/45] | 23.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.02.2009 | CY | 30.05.2012 | CZ | 30.05.2012 | DK | 30.05.2012 | EE | 30.05.2012 | FI | 30.05.2012 | LT | 30.05.2012 | LV | 30.05.2012 | MK | 30.05.2012 | MT | 30.05.2012 | SI | 30.05.2012 | SK | 30.05.2012 | TR | 30.05.2012 | BG | 30.08.2012 | NO | 30.08.2012 | IS | 30.09.2012 | LU | 16.02.2013 | MC | 28.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
MK | 30.05.2012 | ||
MT | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
TR | 30.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
MT | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/42] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 30.05.2012 | |
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 30.05.2012 | |
NO | 30.08.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]NL7610660 (VIDAL HENRI) [X] 1,4-9 * page 3, line 14 - page 8, line 5; figures 1-4,11,12,19 *; | [X]GB2014221 (TRANSPORT SECRETARY OF STATE F) [X] 1* the whole document *; | [X]WO9511351 (VIDAL HENRI BREVETS [FR], et al) [X] 1-5,8,9 * abstract * |