EP2252711 - LANCE HOLDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2014 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEDA Oxygentechnik Armaturen GmbH An der Pönt 59 40885 Ratingen / DE | [2013/45] |
Former [2010/47] | For all designated states BEDA Oxygentechnik Armaturen Gmbh An der Pönt 59 40885 Ratingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARMANN, Horst K. Schulweg 5 40489 Düsseldorf / DE | [2010/47] | Representative(s) | Schulte & Schulte Hauptstrasse 2 45219 Essen / DE | [2013/45] |
Former [2010/47] | Schulte & Schulte Hauptstrasse 2 45219 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09716569.0 | 20.02.2009 | [2010/47] | WO2009EP01240 | Priority number, date | DE20081012554 | 04.03.2008 Original published format: DE102008012554 | [2010/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009109301 | Date: | 11.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2252711 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2252711 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C21C5/46 | [2010/47] | CPC: |
C21C5/4606 (EP,US);
C21C5/462 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7722 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/47] | Title | German: | LANZENHALTER | [2010/47] | English: | LANCE HOLDER | [2010/47] | French: | PORTE-LANCE | [2010/47] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/47] | 05.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.02.2009 | BG | 06.11.2013 | CY | 06.11.2013 | CZ | 06.11.2013 | DK | 06.11.2013 | EE | 06.11.2013 | FI | 06.11.2013 | HR | 06.11.2013 | LT | 06.11.2013 | LV | 06.11.2013 | MC | 06.11.2013 | MK | 06.11.2013 | MT | 06.11.2013 | NL | 06.11.2013 | PL | 06.11.2013 | RO | 06.11.2013 | SE | 06.11.2013 | SI | 06.11.2013 | SK | 06.11.2013 | TR | 06.11.2013 | NO | 06.02.2014 | GR | 07.02.2014 | GB | 20.02.2014 | IE | 20.02.2014 | LU | 20.02.2014 | BE | 28.02.2014 | CH | 28.02.2014 | LI | 28.02.2014 | IS | 06.03.2014 | PT | 06.03.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 20.02.2009 | |
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
TR | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
GB | 20.02.2014 | ||
IE | 20.02.2014 | ||
LU | 20.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 20.02.2009 | |
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
GB | 20.02.2014 | ||
IE | 20.02.2014 | ||
LU | 20.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | BG | 06.11.2013 | |
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
GB | 20.02.2014 | ||
IE | 20.02.2014 | ||
LU | 20.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 06.11.2013 | |
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
GB | 20.02.2014 | ||
IE | 20.02.2014 | ||
LU | 20.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 06.11.2013 | |
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
GB | 20.02.2014 | ||
IE | 20.02.2014 | ||
LU | 20.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 06.11.2013 | |
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
GB | 20.02.2014 | ||
IE | 20.02.2014 | ||
LU | 20.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | CZ | 06.11.2013 | |
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
GB | 20.02.2014 | ||
IE | 20.02.2014 | ||
LU | 20.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CZ | 06.11.2013 | |
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
GB | 20.02.2014 | ||
IE | 20.02.2014 | ||
LU | 20.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CZ | 06.11.2013 | |
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IE | 20.02.2014 | ||
LU | 20.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | CZ | 06.11.2013 | |
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IE | 20.02.2014 | ||
LU | 20.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | CZ | 06.11.2013 | |
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
LU | 20.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | CZ | 06.11.2013 | |
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
LU | 20.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CZ | 06.11.2013 | |
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CZ | 06.11.2013 | |
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
PL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | EE | 06.11.2013 | |
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | FI | 06.11.2013 | |
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | FI | 06.11.2013 | |
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 06.11.2013 | |
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 06.11.2013 | |
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 06.11.2013 | |
NO | 06.02.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1534241 (SCHULZ M) [A] 1-20 * page 2, line 35 - line 59; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0372099 (BEDA OXYGENTECH ARMATUR [DE]) [A] 1-20 * figures 1,4 *; | [A]JPH10204519 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [A] 1-20* paragraph [0031]; figure 6 *; | [A]US6171545 (MARMANN HORST [DE]) [A] 1-20 * figures 1,2,4 * | by applicant | DE2327595 | DE2447723 |