Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8298477 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2012 | B2 | US2011001021 | 06.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP01240 | 20.02.2009 | DE102008012554 | 04.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5602028B | Global Dossier | 08.10.2014 | B2 | JP2011514502 | 06.05.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP01240 | 20.02.2009 | DE102008012554 | 04.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2716431 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2016 | C | CA2716431 | 11.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP01240 | 20.02.2009 | DE102008012554 | 04.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009221263B | Global Dossier | 18.10.2012 | B2 | AU2009221263 | 11.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP01240 | 20.02.2009 | DE102008012554 | 04.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2252711 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2013 | B1 | EP2252711 | 24.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP01240 | 20.02.2009 | DE102008012554 | 04.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0908548 | 06.09.2022 | B8 | BRPI0908548 | 23.01.2018 | B1 | BRPI0908548 | 29.09.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP01240 | 20.02.2009 | DE102008012554 | 04.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102007225B | 19.06.2013 | B | CN102007225 | 06.04.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP01240 | 20.02.2009 | DE102008012554 | 04.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2445691T | 04.03.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP01240 | 20.02.2009 | DE102008012554 | 04.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2010009733 | 30.09.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP01240 | 20.02.2009 | DE102008012554 | 04.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201005710 | 28.04.2011 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2009EP01240 | 20.02.2009 | DE102008012554 | 04.03.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009109301 | Global Dossier | 11.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102008012554 | 04.03.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101564477B | Global Dossier | 29.10.2015 | B1 | KR20100124283 | 26.11.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102008012554 | 04.03.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102008012554 | 22.12.2011 | B4 | DE102008012554 | 10.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102008012554 | 04.03.2008 |