EP2251247 - ELECTRIC POWER STEERING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2010/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMIZU, Yoshinobu c/o JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8 Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2014/19] |
Former [2010/46] | 01 /
SHIMIZU, Yoshinobu c/o JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8 Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2014/19] |
Former [2010/46] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09716891.8 | 05.03.2009 | [2010/46] | WO2009JP54131 | Priority number, date | JP20080055692 | 06.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008055692 | [2010/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009110533 | Date: | 11.09.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2251247 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2251247 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.09.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B62D6/00, B62D5/04, H02P6/08, H02P27/06, B62D101/00, B62D113/00, B62D119/00, H02M3/155, H02P29/02 | [2012/47] | CPC: |
B62D5/0484 (EP,US);
B62D5/0481 (EP,US);
H02P27/06 (EP,US);
H02P29/025 (EP,US);
H02P6/085 (EP,US);
H02P2201/07 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/46] | B62D6/00, B62D5/04, H02P6/08, H02P27/06, B62D101/00, B62D113/00, B62D119/00, H02M3/155 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/46] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE SERVOLENKVORRICHTUNG | [2010/46] | English: | ELECTRIC POWER STEERING APPARATUS | [2010/46] | French: | APPAREIL DE DIRECTION ASSISTÉE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2010/46] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2010 | Translation filed | 02.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 02.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/46] | 21.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.03.2009 | AT | 07.05.2014 | BE | 07.05.2014 | BG | 07.05.2014 | CY | 07.05.2014 | CZ | 07.05.2014 | DK | 07.05.2014 | EE | 07.05.2014 | ES | 07.05.2014 | FI | 07.05.2014 | HR | 07.05.2014 | IT | 07.05.2014 | LT | 07.05.2014 | LV | 07.05.2014 | MC | 07.05.2014 | MK | 07.05.2014 | MT | 07.05.2014 | NL | 07.05.2014 | PL | 07.05.2014 | RO | 07.05.2014 | SE | 07.05.2014 | SI | 07.05.2014 | SK | 07.05.2014 | TR | 07.05.2014 | NO | 07.08.2014 | GR | 08.08.2014 | IS | 07.09.2014 | PT | 08.09.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 05.03.2009 | |
AT | 07.05.2014 | ||
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
BG | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
MT | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
TR | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
MT | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 07.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO2007066487 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * paragraphs [0018] , [0021] , [0022] , [0027] , [0030] , [0031] , [0040] , [0046]; figures 1-6; claim 1 * [A] 2,3; | EP1958851 [ ] (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [ ] * paragraphs [0018] , [0021] , [0022] , [0027] , [0030] , [0031] , [0040] , [0046]; figures 1-6; claim 1 *; | [YA]JP2007001324 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1 * paragraphs [0007] , [0014] , [0018] , [0020]; figures 1,3 * [A] 2,3; | [YA]JP2007210365 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1 * paragraphs [0002] , [0005] , [0009] , [0012] , [0019] , [0040] , [0044] * [A] 2,3 | International search | [Y]JP2004017732 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JP2007210365 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JPH06191418 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]JPH08127355 (JIDOSHA KIKI CO); | [A]JP2007112345 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [AE]JP2009040224 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [AE]JP2009061844 (JTEKT CORP) | by applicant | JP2007052263 |