EP2250420 - Fixation of a clamp for a hose end [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/46] | CLAMP FITTING FOR A HOSE END | ||
[2012/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.2014 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VERITAS AG Stettiner Strasse 1-9 63571 Gelnhausen / DE | [2013/25] |
Former [2010/46] | For all designated states VERITAS AG Stettiner Strasse 1-9 63571 Gelnhausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CÖL, Isa Berger Str. 383 60385 Frankfurt / DE | [2010/46] | Representative(s) | Klinski, Robert, et al Patentship Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elsenheimerstraße 65 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | Klinski, Robert, et al PATENTSHIP Patentanwaltskanzlei Elsenheimerstraße 65 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/03] | Buchhold, Jürgen, et al Olbricht Buchhold Keulertz Partnerschaft Bettinastrasse 53-55 60325 Frankfurt/Main / DE | ||
Former [2012/36] | Hamel, Armin, et al Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Willi Schickedanz Langener Straße 68 63073 Offenbach / DE | ||
Former [2010/46] | Schickedanz, Willi Langener Strasse 68 63073 Offenbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 09716960.1 | 24.02.2009 | [2010/46] | WO2009EP52162 | Priority number, date | DE20081013207 | 07.03.2008 Original published format: DE102008013207 | [2010/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009109484 | Date: | 11.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2250420 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2250420 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16L33/08 | [2010/46] | CPC: |
F16L33/08 (EP,US);
Y10T24/14 (US);
Y10T24/1427 (US);
Y10T24/1441 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/46] | Title | German: | Schellenfixierung für ein Schlauchende | [2012/46] | English: | Fixation of a clamp for a hose end | [2012/46] | French: | Fixation d'un collier de serrage pour une extrémité de tuyau souple | [2012/46] |
Former [2010/46] | SCHELLENFIXIERUNG FÜR EIN SCHLAUCHENDE | ||
Former [2010/46] | CLAMP FITTING FOR A HOSE END | ||
Former [2010/46] | FIXATION PAR BRIDE D'UNE EXTRÉMITÉ DE TUYAU | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/46] | 24.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 20.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.02.2009 | CY | 19.06.2013 | CZ | 19.06.2013 | DK | 19.06.2013 | EE | 19.06.2013 | FI | 19.06.2013 | HR | 19.06.2013 | LT | 19.06.2013 | LV | 19.06.2013 | MC | 19.06.2013 | MK | 19.06.2013 | MT | 19.06.2013 | NL | 19.06.2013 | PL | 19.06.2013 | RO | 19.06.2013 | SE | 19.06.2013 | SI | 19.06.2013 | SK | 19.06.2013 | TR | 19.06.2013 | BG | 19.09.2013 | NO | 19.09.2013 | GR | 20.09.2013 | IS | 19.10.2013 | PT | 21.10.2013 | AT | 24.02.2014 | IE | 24.02.2014 | LU | 24.02.2014 | BE | 28.02.2014 | CH | 28.02.2014 | LI | 28.02.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 24.02.2009 | |
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
MT | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
TR | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
AT | 24.02.2014 | ||
IE | 24.02.2014 | ||
LU | 24.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 24.02.2009 | |
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
MT | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
AT | 24.02.2014 | ||
IE | 24.02.2014 | ||
LU | 24.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
MT | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
AT | 24.02.2014 | ||
IE | 24.02.2014 | ||
LU | 24.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/25] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
AT | 24.02.2014 | ||
IE | 24.02.2014 | ||
LU | 24.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
IE | 24.02.2014 | ||
LU | 24.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
IE | 24.02.2014 | ||
LU | 24.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
LU | 24.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
LU | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CZ | 19.06.2013 | |
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | IT | 24.02.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | IT | 24.02.2013 | |
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | IT | 24.02.2013 | |
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | IT | 24.02.2013 | |
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 19.06.2013 | |
NO | 19.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3407448 (TETZLAFF CLARENCE C, et al) [X] 1-17 * column 4, line 9 - column 6, line 49; figure - *; | [DX]US3477106 (TETZLAFF CLARENCE C, et al) [DX] 1-17 * column 4, line 14 - column 6, line 27; figure - *; | [DX]US3454996 (TETZLAFF CLARENCE C, et al) [DX] 1-17 * column 4, line 33 - column 6, line 62; figure - *; | [DX]DE10324236 (VERITAS AG [DE]) [DX] 1,2,7-15 * abstract *; | [X]DE202005011542U (RASMUSSEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,7-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] - [0028] *; | [X]WO2008022853 (MUENDENER GUMMIWERK GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,7-15 * abstract *; | [DPX]EP1912007 (NORMA GERMANY GMBH [DE]) [DPX] 1-4,7-15 * abstract *; | [PX]EP2017518 (CAILLAU ETS [FR]) [PX] 1-4,7-15 * abstract * | by applicant | DE10324236 | US3454996 | US3477106 | DE102006048344 | US3407448 | EP1912007 | EP2017518 |