|
20.08.2019 |
Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2018 |
Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2016 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2016 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2016 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2016 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2016 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.2016 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
16.03.2016 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2016 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.02.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.02.2016 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2016 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
18.11.2015 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.10.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.10.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2015 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.08.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.12.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.11.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.12.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
14.09.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.09.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.06.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.05.2011 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.02.2011 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiences in Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Request for further processing allowed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2011 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2011 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.01.2011 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2010 |
Deficiencies in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2010 |
Notice on debiting of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2010 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2010 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-entry into European phase) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.10.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2010 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.09.2010 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.07.2010 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.10.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.2009 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
30.04.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
30.04.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.04.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
16.03.2009 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.03.2009 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
16.03.2009 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
11 |
|
16.03.2009 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
5 |