01.07.2016 |
Refusal of application |
published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] |
15.03.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
14.03.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
14.03.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.01.2016 |
Change - applicant |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
18.09.2015 |
Change - applicant |
published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] |
14.08.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
09.07.2015 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
29.04.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
01.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.03.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
01.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.02.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.11.2013 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
31.07.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.04.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.02.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
11.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.09.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.06.2011 |
Change - inventor |
published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] |
03.06.2011 |
First examination report |
|
30.05.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.05.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.05.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 08.06.2011 [2011/23] |
30.03.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.03.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
22.02.2011 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
22.02.2011 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
22.02.2011 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
18.02.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] |
18.02.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] |
11.02.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.02.2011 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
28.01.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.12.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.12.2010 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
13.12.2010 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
03.11.2010 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
26.10.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.10.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.10.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.09.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|