EP2297783 - DRIFT FIELD DEMODULATION PIXEL WITH PINNED PHOTO DIODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heptagon Micro Optics Pte. Ltd. 26 Woodlands Loop Singapore 738317 / SG | [2016/09] |
Former [2015/43] | For all designated states MESA Imaging AG Technoparkstrasse 1 8005 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2011/12] | For all designated states MESA Imaging AG Technoparkstrasse 1 8005 Zürich / CH | ||
For all designated states Houston, J. Grant 4 Militia Drive, Suite 4 Lexington, MA 02421 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUETTGEN, Bernhard Breitenstrasse 10 CH-8034 Adliswil / CH | 02 /
LEHMANN, Michael Wuelflingerstrasse 149d CH-8048 Winterthur / CH | 03 /
FELBER, Jonas Mattenweg 1B Niederbipp 4704 / CH | [2011/28] |
Former [2011/12] | 01 /
BUETTGEN, Bernhard Breitenstrasse 10 CH-8034 Adliswil / CH | ||
02 /
LEHMANN, Michael Wuelflingerstrasse 149d CH-8048 Winterthur / CH | |||
03 /
FELBER, Jonas Scheuergasse 5 5210 Windisch / CH | Representative(s) | Peterreins Schley Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Hermann-Sack-Straße 3 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/11] | Ganahl, Bernhard, et al PATRONUS IP Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Truderinger Straße 246 81825 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/12] | Ganahl, Bernhard, et al Huber & Schüssler Patentanwälte Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09717139.1 | 04.03.2009 | [2011/12] | WO2009US36017 | Priority number, date | US20080033501 | 04.03.2008 Original published format: US 33501 | [2011/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009111556 | Date: | 11.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2297783 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/146, G01J9/00, G01S7/491, G01S17/89, H03D9/06 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
H01L27/14609 (EP,US);
G01S17/894 (EP,US);
G01S7/4914 (EP,US);
H01L27/14641 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/12] | Title | German: | DRIFTFELDDEMODULATIONSPIXEL MIT PINNED-PHOTODIODE | [2011/12] | English: | DRIFT FIELD DEMODULATION PIXEL WITH PINNED PHOTO DIODE | [2011/12] | French: | PIXEL DE DÉMODULATION DE CHAMP DE DÉRIVE POURVU D'UNE PHOTODIODE PIN | [2011/12] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 03.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/12] | 28.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/31] | 02.03.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.03.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 16.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.06.2011 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 03.12.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 03.12.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.02.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 03.12.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 03.12.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.02.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 03.12.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 03.12.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.02.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2006192938 (KAWAHITO SHOJI [JP]) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0002] , [0015] , [0016] , [0041] - [0046]; figures 1,2,5 *; | [DA]EP1777747 (SUISSE ELECTRONIQUE MICROTECH [CH]) [DA] 1-14* the whole document * | Examination | US4612580 | US2002008767 | US6489992 |