EP2259996 - Micro-fixture for a micro-channel plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/50] | MICRO-FIXTURE | ||
[2011/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Technology Services GmbH 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [2010/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAUSCHILD, Jan-Peter Gabriele-Münter-Str. 4a 28816 Stuhr / DE | 02 /
WAPELHORST, Eric Lehrer-Lämpel-Weg 32 28329 Bremen / DE | 03 /
MÜLLER, Jörg Weilsener Heide 9 121244 Buchholz / DE | [2011/42] |
Former [2010/50] | 01 /
HAUSCHILD, Jan-Peter Gabriele-Münter-Str. 4a 28816 Stuhr / DE | ||
02 /
WAPELHORST, Eric Lehrer-Lämpel-Weg 32 28329 Bremen / DE | |||
03 /
MÜLLER, Jörg Schwarzenbergstrasse 10 (G) 21073 Hamburg / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/42] | Application number, filing date | 09717253.0 | 17.02.2009 | [2010/50] | WO2009EP01088 | Priority number, date | DE20081011972 | 29.02.2008 Original published format: DE102008011972 | [2010/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009109288 | Date: | 11.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2259996 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2259996 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B81C3/00 | [2010/50] | CPC: |
B81C3/008 (EP,US);
H01J43/246 (EP,US);
H01J49/0018 (EP,US);
B81C2203/051 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/50] | Title | German: | Mikrohalterung für eine Mikrokanalplatte | [2011/10] | English: | Micro-fixture for a micro-channel plate | [2011/10] | French: | Micro-dispositif de fixation pour une plaque à microcanaux | [2011/10] |
Former [2010/50] | MIKROHALTERUNG | ||
Former [2010/50] | MICRO-FIXTURE | ||
Former [2010/50] | SUPPORT POUR MICROSYSTÈMES | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/50] | 27.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.02.2009 | CY | 19.10.2011 | CZ | 19.10.2011 | DK | 19.10.2011 | EE | 19.10.2011 | FI | 19.10.2011 | HR | 19.10.2011 | IE | 19.10.2011 | LT | 19.10.2011 | LV | 19.10.2011 | MK | 19.10.2011 | MT | 19.10.2011 | PL | 19.10.2011 | RO | 19.10.2011 | SE | 19.10.2011 | SI | 19.10.2011 | SK | 19.10.2011 | TR | 19.10.2011 | BG | 19.01.2012 | NO | 19.01.2012 | GR | 20.01.2012 | ES | 30.01.2012 | LU | 17.02.2012 | IS | 19.02.2012 | PT | 20.02.2012 | BE | 28.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
HR | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
MK | 19.10.2011 | ||
MT | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
TR | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
NO | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
ES | 30.01.2012 | ||
LU | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
HR | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
MK | 19.10.2011 | ||
MT | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
TR | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
NO | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
ES | 30.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
HR | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
MK | 19.10.2011 | ||
MT | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
NO | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
ES | 30.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
HR | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
MK | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
NO | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
ES | 30.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
HR | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
MK | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
NO | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
ES | 30.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
HR | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
MK | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
NO | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
HR | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
NO | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
HR | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
NO | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
HR | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
NO | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
HR | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
NO | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
HR | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
NO | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
HR | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
NO | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
HR | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
NO | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 19.10.2011 | |
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
NO | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 19.10.2011 | |
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
NO | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 19.10.2011 | |
NO | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 19.10.2011 | |
NO | 19.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 19.10.2011 | |
NO | 19.01.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5903059 (BERTIN CLAUDE LOUIS [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8 * figure 2 * * table 1 *; | [X]EP1700821 (ZYVEX CORP [US]) [X] 1-8 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0029] *; | [X]US2007087474 (EKLUND E J [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * figures 1a-1e * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0035] *; | [A] - WAPELHORST E ET AL, "A One - Chip Solution of a Mass Spectrometer", SOLID-STATE SENSORS, ACTUATORS AND MICROSYSTEMS CONFERENCE, 2007. TRANSDUCERS 2007. INTERNATIONAL, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20070610), ISBN 978-1-4244-0841-2, pages 2015 - 2018, XP031216458 [A] 9-15 * figure 3 * * Abschnitt "4. Fabrication" * | [A] - LOMAS D G ET AL, "A high-resolution, two-dimensional, electron imaging integrated circuit", MEASUREMENT SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, IOP, BRISTOL, GB, (19980301), vol. 9, no. 3, ISSN 0957-0233, pages 391 - 398, XP020064439 [A] 9,10 * figure 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0957-0233/9/3/012 |