EP2267764 - PLASMA PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ULVAC, INC. 2500 Hagisono Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa 253-8543 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/52] | For all designated states ULVAC, INC. 2500 Hagisono Chigasaki-shi Kanagawa 253-8543 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORIKAWA, Yasuhiro c/o ULVAC INC. Institute for Semiconductor Technologies 1220-1 Suyama Susono-shi Shizuoka 410-1231 / JP | 02 /
SUU, Koukou c/o ULVAC INC. Institute for Semiconductor Technologies 1220-1 Suyama Susono-shi Shizuoka 410-1231 / JP | 03 /
MURAYAMA, Takahide c/o ULVAC INC. Institute for Semiconductor Technologies 1220-1 Suyama Susono-shi Shizuoka 410-1231 / JP | [2010/52] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/52] | Albutt, Anthony John D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 09718527.6 | 05.03.2009 | [2010/52] | WO2009JP54205 | Priority number, date | JP20080057621 | 07.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008057621 | [2010/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009110567 | Date: | 11.09.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2267764 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.09.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/3065 | [2010/52] | CPC: |
H01J37/34 (EP,US);
H01J37/321 (EP,US);
H01J37/32146 (EP,US);
H01J37/32449 (EP,US);
H01L21/30655 (EP,US);
H01J2237/334 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/52] | Title | German: | PLASMA-VERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2010/52] | English: | PLASMA PROCESSING METHOD | [2010/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT PAR PLASMA | [2010/52] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2010 | Translation filed | 06.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/52] | 19.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/07] | 06.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.05.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2002092619 (UCHIDA TAIJIRO [JP]) [Y] 2-4 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0062] * [A] 1,5-7; | [A]US2003230985 (UCHIDA TAIJIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [XDY]EP1793418 (ULVAC INC [JP]) [XD] 1,5-7 * abstract * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0060] * [Y] 2-4; | [E]EP2178109 (ULVAC INC [JP]) [E] 1-7* the whole document * | International search | [Y]WO2006003962 (ULVAC INC [JP], et al); | [Y]JPH0790632 (ULVAC CORP); | [Y]JPH0963792 (ULVAC CORP) | Examination | JP2005116780 | by applicant | WO2006003962 |