EP2254646 - An implantable device for regulating csf drainage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/48] | A METHOD OF REGULATING CSF DRAINAGE | ||
[2019/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sophysa 5 Rue Guy Moquet 91400 Orsay / FR | [2020/45] |
Former [2010/48] | For all designated states Sophysa 22, rue Jean Rostand Parc-Club Orsay Université 91893 Orsay Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEGRE, Philippe 19 rue Decamps F-75116 Paris / FR | 02 /
MOUREAUX, Christophe 8 rue des Grands Cyprès F-25000 Besancon / FR | 03 /
BOYER, Christophe 18 rue des Etouvettes F-25480 Miserey Salines / FR | 04 /
BONNAL, Olivier 6 rue Mozart F-25115 Pouilley Les Vignes / FR | [2010/48] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/29] | Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2010/48] | Sartorius, Jérome Nony & Associés 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 09718919.5 | 13.03.2009 | [2010/48] | WO2009IB51054 | Priority number, date | FR20080051684 | 14.03.2008 Original published format: FR 0851684 | [2010/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009113037 | Date: | 17.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2254646 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2254646 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61M27/00, G01F1/68 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
A61M27/006 (EP,US);
G01F1/68 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3379 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/29] |
Former [2010/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Implantierbares Gerät zur regulierung von Hirnwasserdrainage | [2019/44] | English: | An implantable device for regulating csf drainage | [2019/44] | French: | Outil implantable de régulatioainage du liquide céphalorachidien | [2019/44] |
Former [2010/48] | VERFAHREN ZUR REGULIERUNG VON CSF-DRAINAGE | ||
Former [2010/48] | A METHOD OF REGULATING CSF DRAINAGE | ||
Former [2010/48] | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGULATION DE DRAINAGE DU LIQUIDE CÉPHALORACHIDIEN | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/48] | 21.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.03.2009 | AT | 15.07.2020 | CY | 15.07.2020 | CZ | 15.07.2020 | DK | 15.07.2020 | EE | 15.07.2020 | FI | 15.07.2020 | HR | 15.07.2020 | LT | 15.07.2020 | LV | 15.07.2020 | MC | 15.07.2020 | MK | 15.07.2020 | MT | 15.07.2020 | NL | 15.07.2020 | PL | 15.07.2020 | RO | 15.07.2020 | SE | 15.07.2020 | SI | 15.07.2020 | SK | 15.07.2020 | TR | 15.07.2020 | BG | 15.10.2020 | NO | 15.10.2020 | GR | 16.10.2020 | IS | 15.11.2020 | PT | 16.11.2020 | IE | 13.03.2021 | LU | 13.03.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 13.03.2009 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CY | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
MK | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
TR | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
IE | 13.03.2021 | ||
LU | 13.03.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 13.03.2009 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CY | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
MK | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
IE | 13.03.2021 | ||
LU | 13.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 13.03.2009 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CY | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
IE | 13.03.2021 | ||
LU | 13.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
CY | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
IE | 13.03.2021 | ||
LU | 13.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
IE | 13.03.2021 | ||
LU | 13.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
IE | 13.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
DK | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
NL | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 15.07.2020 | |
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 15.07.2020 | |
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [DYA]DE19654990 (LEONHARDT STEFFEN DR ING [DE], et al) [DY] 17,18 * column 1, line 3 - column 1, line 6 * * column 1, line 27 - column 1, line 28 * * column 2, line 36 - column 2, line 50 * * column 3, line 2 - column 4, line 63 * * column 6, line 33 - column 7, line 21; figures 1,2,5-7,10 * [A] 1-9,14-16,20; | [X]US2002052563 (PENN RICHARD D [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8,9,15,17-21 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 1, paragraph 11 - page 2, paragraph 17 * * page 2, paragraph 23 * * page 3, paragraph 48; figure 2 * * page 3, paragraph 49 - page 4, paragraph 67; figures 3-9 * * page 6, paragraph 83 - page 6, paragraph 94 * * page 7, paragraph 104 - page 8, paragraph 115; figures 18,19 *; | [X]US2004068201 (SAUL TOM [US]) [X] 1-9,15-21 * page 1, paragraph 3 * * page 3, paragraph 22 * * page 4, paragraph 27 - page 5, paragraph 33 * * page 6, paragraph 50 - page 8, paragraph 70; figures 3-8 * * claims 16-28 *; | [A]US2005171452 (NEFF SAMUEL [US]) [A] 1-20 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraph 6 * * page 1, paragraph 18 - page 2, paragraph 18 * * page 2, paragraph 32 - page 3, paragraph 36; figures 3,4 * * page 3, paragraph 42 ** claims 1-18 *; | [XY]EP1612523 (CODMAN & SHURTLEFF [US]) [X] 1-9,14-16,19-21 * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 2, paragraph 9 * * column 3, paragraph 11 - column 4, paragraph 12; figures 1-6 * * column 5, paragraph 14 * * column 5, paragraph 16 - column 6, paragraph 18 * * column 8, paragraph 24 * [Y] 17,18; | [A]WO2006115724 (NEURO DIAGNOSTIC DEVICES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * page 1, line 11 - page 1, line 13 * * page 4, line 7 - page 4, line 16 * * page 5, line 14 - page 8, line 13; figures 1,2,5 * |