EP2245854 - METHOD FOR DISPLAYING MULTIMEDIA CONTENT WITH VARIABLE INTERFERENCE BASED ON RECEIVER/DECODER LOCAL LEGISLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.05.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2010/44] |
Former [2010/44] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ONNO, Stephane 6 allee Claude Debussy F-35760 Saint Gregoire / FR | [2010/44] | Representative(s) | Huchet, Anne, et al InterDigital CE Patent Holdings 20, rue Rouget de Lisle 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/44] | Lorette, Anne, et al Technicolor 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 09719039.1 | 27.02.2009 | [2010/44] | WO2009FR50314 | Priority number, date | FR20080051352 | 29.02.2008 Original published format: FR 0851352 | [2010/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009112771 | Date: | 17.09.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2245854 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/167, H04N7/173, H04N7/24, G06F21/00 | [2010/44] | CPC: |
H04N7/17318 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0601 (EP,US);
H04N21/23476 (EP,US);
H04N21/235 (EP,US);
H04N21/2541 (EP,US);
H04N21/4318 (EP,US);
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04N21/44055 (EP,US);
H04N21/4623 (EP,US);
H04N21/4627 (EP,US);
H04N21/835 (EP,US);
H04N7/164 (EP,US);
H04N7/1675 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ANZEIGE VON MULTIMEDIA-INHALTEN MIT VARIABLER INTERFERENZ AUF BASIS LOKALER RICHTLINIEN FÜR EINEN EMPFÄNGER/DECODER | [2010/44] | English: | METHOD FOR DISPLAYING MULTIMEDIA CONTENT WITH VARIABLE INTERFERENCE BASED ON RECEIVER/DECODER LOCAL LEGISLATION | [2010/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AFFICHAGE DE CONTENUS MULTIMÉDIA À PERTURBATIONS VARIABLES EN FONCTION DE DROITS LOCAUX DE RÉCEPTEURS/DÉCODEURS | [2010/44] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/44] | 04.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.02.2019 | 04.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/25] | 14.02.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/25] | 15.02.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2004068541 (BAYASSI MULHAM [FR], et al) [Y] 2-4,6,7,9 * paragraphs [0087] - [0089] - [0094] - [0099] - [0250] - [0257] *; | [Y]US6925566 (FEIGEN RONALD GLEN [US], et al) [Y] 5 * abstract *; | [XY]US6937730 (BUXTON MARK J [US]) [X] 1,8,11,12 * column 1, line 8 - column 1, line 10 * * column 2, line 54 - column 2, line 58 * * column 4, line 47 - column 4, line 51 * * column 5, line 6 - column 5, line 34; figure 1 * [Y] 2-7,9,10; | [Y]WO2005107256 (CONCURRENT COMP CORP [US], et al) [Y] 9 * page 7, line 26 - page 7, line 30 * * page 11, line 20 - page 11, line 25; figure 3B *; | [Y] - ARIB, "ARIB STD-B25 Version 5.0: Conditional Access System Specifications for Digital Broadcasting", ASSOCIATION OF RADIO INDUSTRIES AND BUSINESSES (ARIB), (20070314), URL: http://www.arib.or.jp/english/html/overview/ov/std_b25.html, (20081125), XP002505326 [Y] 10 * page 182 * |