EP2257335 - SYSTEMS, APPARATUSES, AND METHODS FOR DIFFERENTIATING BETWEEN MULTIPLE LEADS IMPLANTED WITHIN A PATIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Neuromodulation Corporation 25155 Rye Canyon Loop Valencia, CA 92355 / US | [2010/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHINN, Kenny, Kinyen 29942 Crawford Pl. Castaic CA 91384 / US | 02 /
MOFFITT, Michael, A. 28132 Castillo Lane Valencia CA 91354 / US | 03 /
MEADOWS, Paul, M. 1854 Los Encinos Avenue Glendale CA 91208-2240 / US | [2010/49] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/49] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09719410.4 | 09.03.2009 | [2010/49] | WO2009US36526 | Priority number, date | US20080035540P | 11.03.2008 Original published format: US 35540 P | [2010/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009114468 | Date: | 17.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2257335 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05, A61B17/34 | [2010/49] | CPC: |
A61N1/05 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320056 (EP,US);
A61N1/372 (EP,US);
A61N1/3752 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/49] | Title | German: | SYSTEME, GERÄTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR DIFFERENZIERUNG ZWISCHEN MEHREREN IN EINEM PATIENTEN IMPLANTIERTEN LEITUNGEN | [2010/49] | English: | SYSTEMS, APPARATUSES, AND METHODS FOR DIFFERENTIATING BETWEEN MULTIPLE LEADS IMPLANTED WITHIN A PATIENT | [2010/49] | French: | SYSTÈMES, APPAREILS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR DIFFÉRENCIER ENTRE DE MULTIPLES FILS IMPLANTÉS CHEZ UN PATIENT | [2010/49] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/49] | 01.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/12] | 10.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2003040784 (PASTERNAK SCOTT VINCENT [US], et al) [Y] 1-6,12-14 * paragraphs [0003] , [0009] , [0018] , [0019] *; | [Y]WO03035173 (OSCOR INC [US]) [Y] 1-18 * abstract * * figures 3-5; claim 1 *; | [Y]US2004059348 (GESKE JEFF B [US], et al) [Y] 4-11,15-18 * paragraphs [0001] , [0050] , [0051] , [0056] *; | [X]WO2005028025 (ADVANCED BIONICS CORP [US]) [X] 12-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0015] * * paragraphs [0017] - [0019] * * paragraphs [0038] - [0040] *; | [A]WO2007115198 (ADVANCED NEUROMODULATION SYS [US], et al) [A] 1,2,12* paragraphs [0055] , [0056] *; | [A]WO2008017059 (MEDTRONIC INC [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4-12,16-18 * abstract * * page 5, line 29 - page 7, line 20 * * page 10, line 26 - page 11, line 4 * |