EP2271220 - DOUGH WITH FRUCTAN AND FRUCTAN-DEGRADING ENZYME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novozymes A/S Krogshøjvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [2011/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEIER, Felix Neumatt CH-4243 Dittingen / CH | 02 /
RITTIG, Frank Neumatt CH-4243 Dittingen / CH | 03 /
DROST-LUSTENBERGER, Cornelia Riedmattstrasse 10 CH-8342 Wernetshausen / CH | [2011/02] | Application number, filing date | 09719441.9 | 09.03.2009 | [2011/02] | WO2009EP52738 | Priority number, date | EP20080152519 | 10.03.2008 Original published format: EP 08152519 | [2011/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009112464 | Date: | 17.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2271220 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2271220 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A21D2/18, A21D10/00, A21D8/04 | [2015/22] | CPC: |
A21D8/042 (EP,US);
A21D2/18 (EP,US);
A21D2/181 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/02] | A21D2/18, A21D10/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/52] |
Former [2011/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | TEIG MIT FRUCTAN UND EINEM FRUCTAN-ABBAUENDEN ENZYM | [2015/22] | English: | DOUGH WITH FRUCTAN AND FRUCTAN-DEGRADING ENZYME | [2011/02] | French: | PÂTE CONTENANT DU FRUCTOSANE ET UNE ENZYME DÉGRADANT LE FRUCTOSANE | [2015/22] |
Former [2011/02] | TEIG MIT FRUCTAN UND FRUCTANABBAUENDEM ENZYM | ||
Former [2011/02] | PÂTE AVEC FRUCTOSANE ET ENZYME DE DÉGRADATION DU FRUCTOSANE | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/02] | 01.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2014 | Opposition(s) | 26.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.03.2009 | AT | 23.12.2015 | BE | 23.12.2015 | BG | 23.12.2015 | CY | 23.12.2015 | CZ | 23.12.2015 | EE | 23.12.2015 | ES | 23.12.2015 | FI | 23.12.2015 | HR | 23.12.2015 | IT | 23.12.2015 | LT | 23.12.2015 | LV | 23.12.2015 | MC | 23.12.2015 | MK | 23.12.2015 | RO | 23.12.2015 | SI | 23.12.2015 | SK | 23.12.2015 | TR | 23.12.2015 | IE | 09.03.2016 | LU | 09.03.2016 | NO | 23.03.2016 | GR | 24.03.2016 | CH | 31.03.2016 | LI | 31.03.2016 | MT | 31.03.2016 | IS | 23.04.2016 | PT | 26.04.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 09.03.2009 | |
AT | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
MK | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
TR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IE | 09.03.2016 | ||
LU | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 09.03.2009 | |
AT | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
MK | 23.12.2015 | ||
MT | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
TR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IE | 09.03.2016 | ||
LU | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 09.03.2009 | |
AT | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
MK | 23.12.2015 | ||
MT | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
IE | 09.03.2016 | ||
LU | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
MT | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
IE | 09.03.2016 | ||
LU | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
IE | 09.03.2016 | ||
LU | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
IE | 09.03.2016 | ||
LU | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
LU | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
LU | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
LU | 09.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | CZ | 23.12.2015 | |
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 23.12.2015 | |
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 23.12.2015 | |
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 23.12.2015 | |
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 23.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5527556 (FRIPPIAT ANNE [BE], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7,12,15,16,18-21 * column 5, line 20 - column 8, line 30 * * examples 9,12,20 *; | [X]US5169671 (HARADA TSUTOMU [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7,12,15,16,18-21 * column 2, line 49 - column 4, line 3 * * examples 12,13,23-25 *; | [X]US2003186940 (DE LEENHEER LEEN [BE], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7,12,15,16,18-21 * paragraphs [0018] - [0030] * * paragraphs [0131] - [0147] *; | [X]US5659028 (COUSSEMENT PAUL [BE], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7,12,15,16,18-21 * examples 7,8 *; | [A]WO2005023007 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [A] * page 3, line 24 - page 7, line 24 *; | [A]USH2095H (YOUNG TIMOTHY J [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]WO0219828 (NOVOZYMES AS [DK]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]JP2004357631 (INOUE KAZUHARU, et al) [A] * abstract * | [A] - SILVA R F, "USE OF INULIN AS A NATURAL TEXTURE MODIFIER", CEREAL FOODS WORLD, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF CEREAL CHEMISTS, INC, US, (19961001), vol. 41, no. 10, ISSN 0146-6283, pages 792 - 794, XP002037124 [A] * the whole document * | Examination | - FRETZDORFF B ET AL, "Reduction of endogenous fructans during rye whole-meal breadmaking", GETREIDE MEHL UND BROT, BOCHUM, DE, (20030101), vol. 57, no. 3, ISSN 0367-4177, pages 147 - 151, XP009111230 |