EP2248009 - COUNTERMEASURE METHOD AND DEVICES FOR ASYMMETRIC CRYPTOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inside Secure 41 Parc Club du Golf 13856 Aix-en-Provence Cedex 3 / FR | [2011/24] |
Former [2010/45] | For all designated states Inside Contactless 41 Parc Club du Golf 13856 Aix-en-Provence Cedex 3 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENTEO, Bruno 11 rue Bernard Mule F-31400 Toulouse / FR | 02 /
FEIX, Benoît Bât. A, Résidence Clair Soleil Traverse des Aubes, Route des Aubes F-13400 Aubagne / FR | 03 /
NEROT, Sébastien 420 Nouveau Chemin du Cannet F-13490 Jouques / FR | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/45] | 01 /
BENTEO, Bruno 11 rue Bernard Mule F-31400 Toulouse / FR | ||
02 /
FEIX, Benoît Résidence Cytharista, Bât. B Avenue Cytharista F-13600 La Ciotat / FR | |||
03 /
NEROT, Sébastien 420 Nouveau Chemin du Cannet F-13490 Jouques / FR | Representative(s) | Marchand, André, et al Omnipat 610, chemin de Fabrègues 13510 Éguilles / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/45] | Marchand, André, et al OMNIPAT, 24 Place des Martyrs de la Résistance 13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR | Application number, filing date | 09719837.8 | 23.01.2009 | [2010/45] | WO2009FR00071 | Priority number, date | FR20080000344 | 23.01.2008 Original published format: FR 0800344 | [2010/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009112686 | Date: | 17.09.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2248009 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/72 | [2010/45] | CPC: |
G06F7/723 (EP,US);
G06F7/725 (EP,US);
H04L9/002 (EP,US);
H04L9/302 (EP,US);
H04L9/3066 (EP,US);
G06F2207/7219 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/45] | Title | German: | GEGENMASSNAHMENVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN FÜR ASYMMETRISCHE KRYPTOGRAPHIE | [2010/45] | English: | COUNTERMEASURE METHOD AND DEVICES FOR ASYMMETRIC CRYPTOGRAPHY | [2010/45] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIFS DE CONTRE-MESURE POUR CRYPTOGRAPHIE ASYMETRIQUE | [2010/45] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/45] | 12.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/11] | 29.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.03.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2399904 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 7,9 * abstract * * figure 8 *; | [Y]WO2007000702 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-9,16,18-20,25 * abstract * * page 6, line 3 - page 8, line 5 * * claim 3 *; | [X] - ITOH K ET AL, "DPA COUNTERMEASURES BY IMPROVING THE WINDOW METHOD", CRYPTOGRAPHIC HARDWARE AND EMBEDDED SYSTEMS. INTERNATIONALWORKSHOP, XX, XX, (20020813), pages 303 - 317, XP001160529 [X] 1-3,5-9,16,18-20,25 * abstract * * page 303, lines 1-13 * * page 305, paragraph 3 - page 309, paragraph 3.3 * * page 308; figure 2 * | [Y] - DHEM J-F, "Design of an efficient public-key cryptographic library for RISC-based smart cards", THESE SOUTENUE EN VUE DE L'OBTENTION DU GRADE DE DOCTEUR ENSCIENCES APPLIQUEES, UCL, FACULTÉ DES SCIENCES APPLIQUÉES, LOUVAIN-LA-NEUVE, BE, (20010830), pages 1 - 2,57, XP002280822 [Y] 1-3,5-9,16,18-20,25 * page 61, paragraph 3.4 * |