EP2269069 - USE OF SYNTHETIC PEPTIDE DERIVED FROM ZEBRA PROTEIN FOR THE IN VIVO DIAGNOSIS OF THE EPSTEIN-BARR VIRUS (EBV) REACTIVATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2012 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Université Joseph Fourier 621 Avenue Centrale Domaine Universitaire B.P. 53 38041 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | [2011/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DROUET, Emmanuel 7 Allée du Taillefer F-38700 Corenc / FR | [2011/01] | Representative(s) | Grosset-Fournier, Chantal Catherine, et al Grosset-Fournier & Demachy 54, rue Saint-Lazare 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/02] | Grosset-Fournier, Chantal Catherine, et al Grosset-Fournier & Demachy 54, rue Saint-Lazare 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2011/01] | Mouget-Goniot, Claire, et al Grosset-Fournier & Demachy 54, rue Saint-Lazare 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 09719883.2 | 10.03.2009 | [2011/01] | WO2009EP52798 | Priority number, date | EP20080290224 | 10.03.2008 Original published format: EP 08290224 | [2011/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009112497 | Date: | 17.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2269069 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2269069 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/569, C07K17/00 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
C07K17/00 (EP,US);
G01N33/56994 (EP,US);
G01N2333/05 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/01] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINES SYNTHETISCHEN PEPTIDS AUS DEM ZEBRA-PROTEIN FÜR DIE IN-VITRO DIAGNOSE VON EPPSTEIN-BARR-VIRUS (EBV)-REAKTIVIERUNG | [2011/01] | English: | USE OF SYNTHETIC PEPTIDE DERIVED FROM ZEBRA PROTEIN FOR THE IN VIVO DIAGNOSIS OF THE EPSTEIN-BARR VIRUS (EBV) REACTIVATION | [2011/01] | French: | UTILISATION DE PEPTIDE SYNTHÉTIQUE DÉRIVÉ DE LA PROTÉINE ZEBRA POUR LE DIAGNOSTIC IN VITRO DE LA RÉACTIVATION DU VIRUS D'EPSTEIN-BARR (EBV) | [2011/01] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 24.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.03.2009 | AT | 26.10.2011 | BE | 26.10.2011 | CY | 26.10.2011 | CZ | 26.10.2011 | DK | 26.10.2011 | EE | 26.10.2011 | FI | 26.10.2011 | HR | 26.10.2011 | LT | 26.10.2011 | LV | 26.10.2011 | MK | 26.10.2011 | MT | 26.10.2011 | NL | 26.10.2011 | PL | 26.10.2011 | RO | 26.10.2011 | SE | 26.10.2011 | SI | 26.10.2011 | SK | 26.10.2011 | TR | 26.10.2011 | BG | 26.01.2012 | NO | 26.01.2012 | GR | 27.01.2012 | IS | 26.02.2012 | PT | 27.02.2012 | IE | 10.03.2012 | LU | 10.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MK | 26.10.2011 | ||
MT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
TR | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
IE | 10.03.2012 | ||
LU | 10.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MK | 26.10.2011 | ||
MT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
TR | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
IE | 10.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MK | 26.10.2011 | ||
MT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
IE | 10.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MK | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
IE | 10.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MK | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
IE | 10.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
IE | 10.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 26.10.2011 | |
NO | 26.01.2012 | Cited in | International search | [YDX]WO9621155 (PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR], et al) [YD] 1,5 * examples 1,2; claims 1-9 * [X] 11; | [AD]WO0055622 (UNIV GRENOBLE 1 [FR], et al) [AD] * page 18, line 6 - line 20 *; | [YDX] - MARECHAL V ET AL., "Enzyme-linked immunosorbent assay for antibodies to ZEBRA, an Epstein-Barr trans-activator", RESEARCH VIROLOGY, (1993), vol. 144, no. 5, pages 397 - 404, XP022352696 [YD] 1-10 * the entire cocument, particularly abstract, page 398, figures 1-3 and "Discussion" * [X] 11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0923-2516(06)80055-5 | [YDX] - DROUET E ET AL., "High Epstein-Barr Virus Serum Load and Elevated Titers of Anti-ZEBRA Antibodies in Patients With EBV-Harboring Tumor Cells of Hodgkin's Disease", JOURNAL OF MEDICAL VIROLOGY, (1999), vol. 57, pages 383 - 389, XP002489204 [YD] 1-10 * page 384; figures 1,2; table 1 * [X] 11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1096-9071(199904)57:4<383::AID-JMV10>3.0.CO;2-3 | [YDX] - TOUGE C ET AL., "High incidence of elevated antibody titers to Epstein-Barr-virus in patients with uveitis", ARCHIVES OF VIROLOGY, (2006), vol. 151, pages 895 - 903, XP019378678 [YD] 1-10 * page 896 - page 898; figures 1-3; table 1 * [X] 11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00705-005-0686-7 | [YDX] - TEDESCHI R ET AL., "Activation of Maternal Epstein-Barr Virus Infection and Risk of Acute Leukemia in the Offspring", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF EPIDEMIOLOGY, (2006), vol. 165, no. 2, pages 134 - 137, XP002489206 [YD] 1-10 * abstract, page 135 * [X] 11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/aje/kwj332 | [YDX] - DARDARI R ET AL., "Analyses of the prognostic significance of the Epstein-Barr virus transactivator ZEBRA protein and diagnostic value of its two synthetic peptides in nasopharyngeal carcinoma", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL VIROLOGY, (200802), vol. 41, no. 2, pages 96 - 103, XP022503936 [YD] 1,5 * abstract * [X] 11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jcv.2007.09.010 | [YDX] - DARDARI R ET AL, "Antibody Responses to Recombinant Epstein-Barr Virus Antigens in Nasopharyngeal Carcinoma Patients: Complementary Test of ZEBRA Protein and Early Antigens p54 and p138", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, (2001), vol. 39, no. 9, pages 3164 - 3170, XP002489208 [YD] 1,5 * abstract, page 3165, tables 1-4 * [X] 11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JCM.39.9.3164-3170.2001 | by applicant | WO9621155 | - THORLEY-LAWSON DA, MIYASHITA EM, KHAN G., "Epstein-Barr virus and the B cell: that's all it takes", TRENDS MICROBIOL., (199605), vol. 4, no. 5, pages 204 - 8 | - SPECK SH, CHATILA T, FLEMINGTON E., "Reactivation of Epstein-Barr virus: regulation and function of the BZLF1 gene", TRENDS MICROBIOL., (199710), vol. 5, no. 10, pages 399 - 405 | - FEEDERLE R, KOST M, BAUMANN M, JANZ A, DROUET E, HAMMERSCHMIDT W, DELECLUSE HJ., "The Epstein-Barr virus lytic program is controlled by the co-operative functions of two transactivators", EMBO J., (20000615), vol. 19, no. 12, pages 3080 - 9 | - HONG GK, GULLEY ML, FENG WH, DELECLUSE HJ, HOLLEY-GUTHRIE E, KENNEY SC., "Epstein-Barr virus lytic infection contributes to lymphoproliferative disease in a SCID mouse model", J VIROL., (200511), vol. 79, no. 22, pages 13993 - 4003 | - MONTONE KT, HODINKA RL, SALHANY KE, LAVI E, ROSTAMI A, TOMASZEWSKI JE., "Identification of Epstein-Barr virus lytic activity in post-transplantation lymphoproliferative disease", MOD PATHOL., (199606), vol. 9, no. 6, pages 621 - 30 | - MARECHAL V, MEYOHAS MC, JOAB I, GAHA S, GIOT JF, SERGEANT A, NICOLAS JC., "Enzyme-linked immunosorbent assay for antibodies to ZEBRA, an Epstein-Barr trans-activator", RES VIROL., (199309), vol. 144, no. 5, pages 397 - 404 | - JOAB I, TRIKI H, DE SAINT MARTIN J, PERRICAUDET M, NICOLAS JC., "Detection of anti-Epstein-Barr virus trans-activator (ZEBRA) antibodies in sera from patients with human immunodeficiency virus", J INFECT DIS., (199101), vol. 163, no. 1, pages 53 - 6 | - BROUSSET P, DROUET E, SCHLAIFER D, ICART J, PAYEN C, MEGGETTO F, MARCHOU B, MASSIP P, DELSOL G., "Epstein-Barr virus (EBV) replicative gene expression in tumour cells of AIDS- related non-Hodgkin's lymphoma in relation to CD4 cell number and antibody titres to EBV", AIDS, (199405), vol. 8, no. 5, pages 583 - 90 | - DARDARI R, MENEZES J, DROUET E, JOAB I, BENIDER A, BAKKALI H, KANOUNI L, JOUHADI H, BENJAAFAR N, GUEDDARI BE, "Analyses of the prognostic significance of the Epstein-Barr virus transactivator ZEBRA protein and diagnostic value of its two synthetic peptides in nasopharyngeal carcinoma", J CLIN VIROL., (20071119), vol. 41, no. 2, pages 96 - 103 | - DROUET E, BROUSSET P, FARES F, ICART J, VERNIOL C, MEGGETTO F, SCHLAIFER D, DESMORAT-COAT H, RIGAL-HUGUET F, NIVELEAU A, "High Epstein-Barr virus serum load and elevated titers of anti-ZEBRA antibodies in patients with EBV-harboring tumor cells of Hodgkin's disease", J MED VIROL., (199904), vol. 57, no. 4, pages 383 - 9 | - TOUGE C, AGAWA H, SAIRENJI T, INOUE Y., "High incidence of elevated antibody titers to Epstein-Barr virus in patients with uveitis", ARCH VIROL., (200605), vol. 151, no. 5, pages 895 - 903 | - TEDESCHI R, BLOIGU A, OGMUNDSDOTTIR HM, MARUS A, DILLNER J, DEPAOLI P, GUDNADOTTIR M, KOSKELA P, PUKKALA E, LEHTINEN T, "Activation of maternal Epstein-Barr virus infection and risk of acute leukemia in the offspring", AM J EPIDEMIOL., (20070115), vol. 165, no. 2, pages 134 - 7 | - DARDARI R, HINDERER W, LANG D, BENIDER A, EL GUEDDARI B, JOAB I, BENSLIMANE A, KHYATTI M., "Antibody responses to recombinant Epstein-Barr virus antigens in nasopharyngeal carcinoma patients: complementary test of ZEBRA protein and early antigens p54 and p138", J CLIN MICROBIOL., (200109), vol. 39, no. 9, pages 3164 - 70 |