EP2274842 - LDPC-CODED MULTILEVEL MODULATION SCHEME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/39] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | ||
Former [2011/03] | For all designated states NEC Laboratories America, Inc. 4 Independence Way, Suite 200 Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DJORDJEVIC, Ivan c/o NEC Laboratories America Inc. 4 Independence Way Suite 200 Princeton, New Jersey 08540 / US | 02 /
XU, Lei 10 Stuart Lane East Princeton Junction, New Jersey 08550 / US | 03 /
WANG, Ting 10 Glacier Drive West Windsor, New Jersey 08550 / US | [2015/41] |
Former [2011/03] | 01 /
DJORDJEVIC, Ivan c/o NEC Laboratories America Inc. 4 Independence Way Suite 200 Princeton, New Jersey 08540 / US | ||
02 /
XU, Lei 10 Stuart Lane East Princeton Junction, New Jersey 08550 / US | |||
03 /
WANG, Ting 10 Glacier Drive West Windsor, New Jersey 08550 / US | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/41] | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Theatinerstraße 8 (Fünf Höfe) 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/03] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09720290.7 | 03.02.2009 | [2011/03] | WO2009US32939 | Priority number, date | US20080036112P | 13.03.2008 Original published format: US 36112 P | US20080242205 | 30.09.2008 Original published format: US 242205 | [2014/38] |
Former [2011/03] | US20080036205P | 13.03.2008 | |
US20080242205 | 30.09.2008 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009114221 | Date: | 17.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2274842 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2274842 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.09.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/516 | [2014/34] | CPC: |
H04B10/516 (EP,US);
H03M13/255 (EP,US);
H04B10/2569 (EP,US);
H04B10/541 (EP,US);
H04B10/61 (EP,US);
H04L1/0041 (EP,US);
H04L1/0057 (EP,US);
H04L1/0058 (EP,US);
H04L1/0065 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/03] | H04B10/13, H04B10/02, H04B10/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/41] |
Former [2011/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | LDPC-CODIERTES MEHREBENEN-MODULATIONSSCHEMA | [2011/03] | English: | LDPC-CODED MULTILEVEL MODULATION SCHEME | [2011/03] | French: | LOGIQUE DE MODULATION MULTI-NIVEAU CODÉE LDPC | [2011/03] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/03] | 13.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.02.2009 | AT | 07.10.2015 | BE | 07.10.2015 | BG | 07.10.2015 | CY | 07.10.2015 | CZ | 07.10.2015 | DK | 07.10.2015 | EE | 07.10.2015 | ES | 07.10.2015 | FI | 07.10.2015 | HR | 07.10.2015 | IT | 07.10.2015 | LT | 07.10.2015 | LV | 07.10.2015 | MC | 07.10.2015 | MK | 07.10.2015 | NL | 07.10.2015 | PL | 07.10.2015 | RO | 07.10.2015 | SE | 07.10.2015 | SI | 07.10.2015 | SK | 07.10.2015 | TR | 07.10.2015 | NO | 07.01.2016 | GR | 08.01.2016 | IE | 03.02.2016 | LU | 03.02.2016 | IS | 07.02.2016 | PT | 08.02.2016 | CH | 29.02.2016 | LI | 29.02.2016 | MT | 29.02.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 03.02.2009 | |
AT | 07.10.2015 | ||
BE | 07.10.2015 | ||
CY | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
MK | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
TR | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IE | 03.02.2016 | ||
LU | 03.02.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
MT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 03.02.2009 | |
AT | 07.10.2015 | ||
BE | 07.10.2015 | ||
CY | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
MK | 07.10.2015 | ||
MT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
TR | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IE | 03.02.2016 | ||
LU | 03.02.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 03.02.2009 | |
AT | 07.10.2015 | ||
BE | 07.10.2015 | ||
CY | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
MK | 07.10.2015 | ||
MT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IE | 03.02.2016 | ||
LU | 03.02.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
BE | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
MT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IE | 03.02.2016 | ||
LU | 03.02.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
BE | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IE | 03.02.2016 | ||
LU | 03.02.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
BE | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
LU | 03.02.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
LU | 03.02.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
LU | 03.02.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/43] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
LU | 03.02.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 07.10.2015 | |
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 07.10.2015 | |
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 07.10.2015 | |
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 07.10.2015 | |
LT | 07.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP] - DJORDJEVIC I B ET AL, "PMD compensation in multilevel coded-modulation schemes with coherent detection using Alamouti-type polarization-time coding", IEEE/LEOS SUMMER TOPICAL MEETINGS, 2008 DIGEST OF THE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080721), ISBN 978-1-4244-1925-8, pages 103 - 104, XP031298846 [XP] 1-6 * the whole document * | [XP] - Ivan B Djordjevic ET AL, "Alamouti-type polarization-time coding in coded-modulation schemes with coherent detection", Optics Express, vol. 16, no. 18, (20080826), pages 14163 - 14172, URL: http://www.opticsinfobase.org/DirectPDFAccess/3C88996D-B306-A07B-0C85C107CF5439EB_171323/oe-16-18-14163.pdf?da=1&id=171323&seq=0&mobile=no, (20140710), XP055128184 [XP] 1-6 * the whole document * | [A] - IVAN B DJORDJEVIC ET AL, "Proposal for Beyond 100-Gb/s Optical Transmission Based on Bit-Interleaved LDPC-Coded Modulation", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20070615), vol. 19, no. 12, doi:10.1109/LPT.2007.897520, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 874 - 876, XP011181528 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LPT.2007.897520 | [A] - IVAN B DJORDJEVIC ET AL, "Ultra High-Speed Optical Transmission based on LDPC-Coded Modulation and Coherent Detection for Employment in All-Optical Network Scenario", TRANSPARENT OPTICAL NETWORKS, 2007. ICTON '07. 9TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PI, (20070701), ISBN 978-1-4244-1248-8, pages 171 - 174, XP031130475 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | [A] - IVAN B DJORDJEVIC ED - SEBASTIAN RANDEL ET AL, "LDPC-Coded Modulation for High-Speed Optical Transmission Systems", LEOS SUMMER TOPICAL MEETINGS, 2007 DIGEST OF THE IEEE, IEEE, PI, (20070701), ISBN 978-1-4244-0926-6, pages 248 - 249, XP031125419 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | [A] - YAN HAN ET AL, "Polarization Diversity Transmitter and Optical Nonlinearity Mitigation Using Polarization-Time Coding", OPTICAL AMPLIFIERS AND THEIR APPLICATIONS/COHERENT OPTICAL TECHNOLOGIES AND APPLICATIONS, Washington, D.C., (20060101), doi:10.1364/COTA.2006.CThC7, ISBN 978-1-55-752809-4, XP055128174 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/COTA.2006.CThC7 | International search | [A]US7197690 (SHEN BA-ZHONG [US], et al); | [A]US2005271160 (EROZ MUSTAFA [US], et al); | [A]WO2007112168 (MOTOROLA INC [US], et al); | [A] - IVAN B. DJORDJEVIC ET AL., "Using LDPC-Coded modulation and coherent detection for ultra highspeed optical transmission", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, (200711), vol. 25, no. 11, pages 3619 - 3625, XP011194801 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JLT.2007.906791 | [XP] - IVAN B. DJORDJEVIC ET AL., "PMD compensation in multilevel coded-modulation schemes with coherent detection using Alamouti-type polarization-time coding", Proceedings of IEEE/LEOS Summer Topical Meetings, MC2.3, 23072008, (20080721), pages 103 - 104, XP031298846 | by applicant | - B. DJORDJEVIC; H. G. BATSHON; M. CVIJETIC; L. XU; T. WANG, "PMD compensation by LDPC-coded turbo equalization", IEEE PHOTON. TECHNOL. LETT., (20070801), vol. 19, no. 15, pages 1163 - 1165 | - L. L. MINKOV; 1. B. DJORDJEVIC; H. G. BATSHON; L. XU; T. WANG; M. CVIJETIC; F. KUEPPERS, "Demonstration of PMD compensation by LDPC-coded turbo equalization and channel capacity loss characterization due to PMD and quantization", IEEE PHOTON. TECHNOL. LETT., (20071115), vol. 19, no. 22, pages 1852 - 1854 | - M. JäGER; T. RANKL; J. SPEIDEL; H. BüLOW; F. BUCHALI, "Perfonnance of Turbo Equalizers for Optical PMD Channels", J. LIGHTWAVE TECHNOL., (200603), vol. 24, pages 1226 - 1236 | - B. DJORDJEVIC, "PMD compensation in fiber-optic communication systems with direct detection using LDPC-coded OFDM", OPT. EXPRESS, (20070402), vol. 15, no. 7, pages 3692 - 3701 | - W. SHIEH; X. YI; Y. MA; Y. TANG, "Theoretical and experimental study on PMD-supported transmission using polarization diversity in coherent optical OFDM systems", OPT. EXPRESS, (20070724), vol. 15, no. 16, pages 9936 - 9947 |