EP2265533 - CONVEYOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kone Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | [2010/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAHKONEN, Pekka Marjamäenkatu 18 05820 Hyvinkää / FI | [2019/50] |
Former [2010/52] | 01 /
JAHKONEN, Pekka Marjamäenkatu 18 FIN-05820 Hyvinkää / FI | Representative(s) | K & H Bonapat Patentanwälte Koch · von Behren & Partner mbB Donnersbergerstraße 22A 80634 München / DE | [2019/50] |
Former [2013/07] | K & H Bonapat Patentanwälte Wotanstraße 64 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/52] | Graf Glück Habersack Kritzenberger Patentanwälte Wotanstraße 64 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09720798.9 | 19.02.2009 | [2010/52] | WO2009FI00027 | Priority number, date | FI20080000209 | 14.03.2008 Original published format: FI 20080209 | [2010/52] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009112629 | Date: | 17.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2265533 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2265533 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 17.09.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B66B25/00, H02P4/00 | [2010/52] | CPC: |
H02P4/00 (EP,FI,US);
B66B25/003 (FI);
B66B25/00 (EP,US);
H02P27/02 (FI)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/50] |
Former [2010/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 08.10.2010 | BA | 08.10.2010 | RS | 08.10.2010 | Title | German: | FÖRDERSYSTEM | [2010/52] | English: | CONVEYOR SYSTEM | [2010/52] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TAPIS DE TRANSPORT | [2010/52] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/52] | 06.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.02.2009 | AT | 11.12.2019 | CY | 11.12.2019 | CZ | 11.12.2019 | DK | 11.12.2019 | EE | 11.12.2019 | FI | 11.12.2019 | HR | 11.12.2019 | IT | 11.12.2019 | LT | 11.12.2019 | LV | 11.12.2019 | MC | 11.12.2019 | MK | 11.12.2019 | MT | 11.12.2019 | NL | 11.12.2019 | PL | 11.12.2019 | RO | 11.12.2019 | SE | 11.12.2019 | SI | 11.12.2019 | SK | 11.12.2019 | TR | 11.12.2019 | IE | 19.02.2020 | LU | 19.02.2020 | BE | 29.02.2020 | CH | 29.02.2020 | LI | 29.02.2020 | BG | 11.03.2020 | NO | 11.03.2020 | GR | 12.03.2020 | IS | 11.04.2020 | PT | 06.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 19.02.2009 | |
AT | 11.12.2019 | ||
CY | 11.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
IT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
MT | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
PL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
TR | 11.12.2019 | ||
IE | 19.02.2020 | ||
LU | 19.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
IT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
PL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
TR | 11.12.2019 | ||
IE | 19.02.2020 | ||
LU | 19.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
IT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
PL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
IE | 19.02.2020 | ||
LU | 19.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AT | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
PL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
IE | 19.02.2020 | ||
LU | 19.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AT | 11.12.2019 | |
CZ | 11.12.2019 | ||
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
PL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SI | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
LU | 19.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 11.12.2019 | |
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
MC | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
LU | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | CZ | 11.12.2019 | |
DK | 11.12.2019 | ||
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
LU | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | CZ | 11.12.2019 | |
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
IS | 11.04.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 11.12.2019 | |
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
SK | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 11.12.2019 | |
EE | 11.12.2019 | ||
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 11.12.2019 | |
FI | 11.12.2019 | ||
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
RO | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | FI | 11.12.2019 | |
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
NL | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | FI | 11.12.2019 | |
HR | 11.12.2019 | ||
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 11.12.2019 | |
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
LV | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
GR | 12.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 11.12.2019 | |
LT | 11.12.2019 | ||
SE | 11.12.2019 | ||
BG | 11.03.2020 | ||
NO | 11.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 11.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003000801 (SPANNHAKE STEFAN [DE], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0001]; figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0047] *; | [Y]JP2003335492 (HITACHI BUILDING SYS CO LTD) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1,2,3 *; | [A]JP2004262634 (FUJITEC KK) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0011]; figure 1 * | International search | [A]GB2245385 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]US2002189905 (SPANNHAKE STEFAN [DE], et al); | [A]US4748394 (WATANABE EIKI [JP]); | [A]US2231521 (CURRY HERMAN H); | [A]WO9425386 (O & K ROLLTREPPEN GMBH [DE], et al); | [A]EP1394097 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [A]JPS605796 (HITACHI LTD) | Examination | JP3372126B | by applicant | US4748394 | US2003000801 | JP2003335492 | JP3372126B |