EP2253376 - METHOD of PRODUCTION OF PARTICULATE WATER ABSORBENT COMPRISING WATER-ABSORBABLE RESIN AS MAIN INGREDIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/47] | METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF PARTICULATE WATER ABSORBENT COMPRISING WATER-ABSORBABLE RESIN AS MAIN INGREDIENT | ||
[2015/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): MT | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Shokubai Co., Ltd. 1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP | [2010/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIZAKI, Kunihiko c/o Nippon Shokubai Co. Ltd. 992-1 Aza NishiokiOkihama Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1282 / JP | 02 /
MATSUMOTO, Koji c/o Nippon Shokubai Co. Ltd. 992-1 Aza NishiokiOkihama Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1282 / JP | 03 /
MITSUKAMI, Yoshiro c/o Nippon Shokubai Co. Ltd. 992-1 Aza NishiokiOkihama Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1282 / JP | [2016/01] |
Former [2010/47] | 01 /
ISHIZAKI, Kunihiko c/o Nippon Shokubai Co. Ltd. 992-1 Aza NishiokiOkihama Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1282 / JP | ||
02 /
MATSUMOTO, Koji c/o Nippon Shokubai Co. Ltd. 992-1 Aza NishiokiOkihama Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1282 / JP | |||
03 /
MITSUKAMI, Yoshiro c/o Nippon Shokubai Co. Ltd. 992-1 Aza NishiokiOkihama Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1282 / JP | Representative(s) | Mai Besier European Trademark Attorneys Patentanwälte Kreuzberger Ring 18a 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | Mai, Dörr, Besier Patentanwälte Steuerberater/Wirtschaftsprüfer Kreuzberger Ring 64 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2012/07] | Mai, Dörr, Besier Patentanwälte Steuerberater/Wirtschaftsprüfer John-F.-Kennedy-Straße 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2010/47] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner Patentanwälte John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 09720912.6 | 13.03.2009 | [2010/47] | WO2009JP54905 | Priority number, date | JP20080064408 | 13.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008064408 | JP20080088072 | 28.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008088072 | JP20080115446 | 25.04.2008 Original published format: JP 2008115446 | JP20080115751 | 25.04.2008 Original published format: JP 2008115751 | JP20080187904 | 18.07.2008 Original published format: JP 2008187904 | JP20080238918 | 18.09.2008 Original published format: JP 2008238918 | [2010/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009113673 | Date: | 17.09.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2253376 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2253376 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.09.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65G51/02, B65G53/52, C08F6/00, C08F6/02, C08F20/06, C08F220/06, C08J3/24, B01D46/00, B01D39/00, B65B1/08, B65B37/04, B01J20/26, B01J20/30, B65B1/06, B65B1/22, // C08L33/02, C08L101/14 | [2015/29] | CPC: |
B65B1/08 (EP,US);
B01J20/26 (EP,US);
B01J20/267 (EP,US);
B01J20/30 (EP,US);
B29B7/002 (EP);
B29B7/726 (EP);
B29B7/748 (EP);
B29B7/82 (EP);
B29B7/885 (EP);
B29B9/02 (EP,US);
B29B9/12 (EP);
B29B9/16 (EP,US);
B65B1/06 (EP,US);
B65B1/22 (EP,US);
B65B37/04 (EP,US);
C08F20/06 (US);
C08J3/245 (US);
B01J2220/68 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2012/50] | B65G51/02, B65G53/52, C08F6/00, C08F6/02, C08F20/06, C08F220/06, C08J3/24, B01D46/00, B01D39/00, B65B1/08, B65B37/04, // C08L33/02, C08L101/14 | ||
Former IPC [2010/47] | B01J20/30, B01J20/26, C08J3/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/01] |
Former [2010/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES TEILCHENFÖRMIGEN WASSERABSORPTIONSMITTELS MIT WASSERABSORBIERBAREM HARZ ALS HAUPTBESTANDTEIL | [2010/47] | English: | METHOD of PRODUCTION OF PARTICULATE WATER ABSORBENT COMPRISING WATER-ABSORBABLE RESIN AS MAIN INGREDIENT | [2015/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN AGENT HYDROABSORBANT PARTICULAIRE COMPRENANT UNE RÉSINE HYDROABSORBABLE EN TANT QU'INGRÉDIENT PRINCIPAL | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/47] | METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF PARTICULATE WATER ABSORBENT COMPRISING WATER-ABSORBABLE RESIN AS MAIN INGREDIENT | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2010 | Translation filed | 08.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 08.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/47] | 03.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.03.2009 | AT | 06.01.2016 | CY | 06.01.2016 | CZ | 06.01.2016 | DK | 06.01.2016 | EE | 06.01.2016 | ES | 06.01.2016 | FI | 06.01.2016 | HR | 06.01.2016 | IT | 06.01.2016 | LT | 06.01.2016 | LV | 06.01.2016 | MC | 06.01.2016 | MK | 06.01.2016 | NL | 06.01.2016 | PL | 06.01.2016 | RO | 06.01.2016 | SE | 06.01.2016 | SI | 06.01.2016 | SK | 06.01.2016 | TR | 06.01.2016 | IE | 13.03.2016 | LU | 13.03.2016 | CH | 31.03.2016 | FR | 31.03.2016 | LI | 31.03.2016 | MT | 31.03.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | GB | 06.04.2016 | NO | 06.04.2016 | GR | 07.04.2016 | IS | 06.05.2016 | PT | 06.05.2016 | [2018/31] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 13.03.2009 | |
AT | 06.01.2016 | ||
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
MT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
TR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 13.03.2016 | ||
LU | 13.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
GB | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 13.03.2009 | |
AT | 06.01.2016 | ||
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
MT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 13.03.2016 | ||
LU | 13.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
GB | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 13.03.2016 | ||
LU | 13.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
GB | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 13.03.2016 | ||
LU | 13.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
GB | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 13.03.2016 | ||
LU | 13.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
GB | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/08] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 13.03.2016 | ||
LU | 13.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
GB | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 13.03.2016 | ||
LU | 13.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
LU | 13.03.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
LU | 13.03.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
LU | 13.03.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 06.01.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004110006 (ISHIZAKI KUNIHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1* paragraphs [0138] - [0139] * | International search | [A]JPH10101735 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND); | [X]JPH11246625 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND); | [Y]JP2005081204 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND) | by applicant | US4893999 | US4973632 | US4985518 | JPH09235378 | US5849405 | US6071976 | US6164455 | US6241928 | US6378453 | US6710141 | US6727345 | US6817557 | US6867269 | US2005113252 | US2005215734 | US6987151 | US2006024755 | WO2006074816 | US2006204755 | WO2007023097 | US7193006 | US7201941 | US2007149760 | WO2007104657 | WO2007104673 | WO2007104676 | US7282262 | US7347330 | WO2008037672 | WO2008037673 | WO2008037675 | WO2008123477 | WO2009001954 |