EP2254171 - ORGANIC PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | [2010/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UETANI, Yasunori 2-13-1-2-301 Umezono Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0045 / JP | [2010/47] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/47] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09720999.3 | 05.03.2009 | [2010/47] | WO2009JP54704 | Priority number, date | JP20080062265 | 12.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008062265 | [2010/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009113599 | Date: | 17.09.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2254171 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.09.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/00, H01L51/42 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
H10K85/655 (EP,US);
H10K30/30 (EP,US);
H10K85/6576 (EP,US);
H10K30/50 (EP);
H10K85/113 (EP,US);
H10K85/115 (EP,US);
H10K85/151 (EP,US);
H10K85/654 (EP,US);
H10K85/6572 (EP,US);
Y02E10/549 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/47] | H01L51/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/47] | Title | German: | ORGANISCHE PHOTOELEKTRISCHE UMWANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2010/47] | English: | ORGANIC PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION DEVICE | [2010/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONVERSION PHOTOELECTRIQUE ORGANIQUE | [2010/47] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2010 | Translation filed | 08.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 08.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/47] | 15.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/26] | 24.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005022865 (ROBESON LLOYD MAHLON [US], et al); | [X]US2007144579 (JUNG BYUNG-JUN [KR], et al); | [XP]WO2008104301 (BAYER TECHNOLOGY SERVICES GMBH [DE], et al); | [E]WO2009058811 (KONARKA TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al); | International search | [A]JP2001151870 (KOKUSAI KIBAN ZAIRYO KENKYUSHO, et al); | [A]JP2004107625 (SHARP KK, et al); | [X]JP2005259436 (UNIV KYUSHU, et al); | [A]WO2005117157 (SHARP KK [JP], et al); | [A]JP2006019357 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [A]JP2006063334 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [X]JP2007051289 (MERCK PATENT GMBH) |