EP2250022 - DEVICE FOR REFILLING AN INK CARTRIDGE FOR AN INK-JET PRINTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2011 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pelikan Hardcopy Production AG Leestrasse 1 8132 Egg / CH | [2010/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEINER, Roland Blessmülistrasse 6 CH-8733 Eschenbach / CH | 02 /
SULSER, Daniel Binzhaldenstrasse 46 CH-8636 Wald / CH | 03 /
KRETSCHMER, Joachim Neuhusstrasse 27B CH-8630 Rüti / CH | 04 /
BUTTY, René Walderstrasse 41b CH-8340 Hinwil / CH | 05 /
RAHIMI, Migjen Bahnhofstrasse 228 B 8623 Wetzikon / CH | 06 /
HUBER, André Landstrasse 5 CH-5430 Wettingen / CH | [2010/52] |
Former [2010/46] | 01 /
STEINER, Roland Blessmülistrasse 6 CH-8733 Eschenbach / CH | ||
02 /
SULSER, Daniel Binzhaldenstrasse 46 CH-8636 Wald / CH | |||
03 /
KRETSCHMER, Joachim Neuhusstrasse 27B CH-8630 Rüti / CH | |||
04 /
BUTTY, René Walderstrasse 41b CH-8340 Hinwil / CH | |||
05 /
RAHIMI, Migjen Haberweidstrasse 2 CH-8610 Uster / CH | |||
06 /
HUBER, André Landstrasse 5 CH-5430 Wettingen / CH | Representative(s) | Zech, Stefan Markus, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/46] | Zech, Stefan Markus, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09721030.6 | 09.02.2009 | [2010/46] | WO2009EP00889 | Priority number, date | DE20081010961 | 25.02.2008 Original published format: DE102008010961 | [2010/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009112132 | Date: | 17.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2250022 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175 | [2010/46] | CPC: |
B41J2/17506 (EP);
B41J2/17546 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR WIEDERBEFÜLLUNG EINER TINTENPATRONE FÜR EINEN TINTENSTRAHLDRUCKER | [2010/46] | English: | DEVICE FOR REFILLING AN INK CARTRIDGE FOR AN INK-JET PRINTER | [2010/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE RECHARGER UNE CARTOUCHE D'ENCRE POUR UNE IMPRIMANTE À JET D'ENCRE | [2010/46] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/13] | 23.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/46] | 16.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005168548 (PHILLIPS QUINTIN T [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,12,14-16 * paragraphs [0033] , [0034] , [0064]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0080]; figure 9 * * paragraph [0081]; figure 10 *; | [X]EP0985537 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,6,12,14-16 * paragraphs [0042] - [0044]; figure 9 *; | [X]US6130695 (CHILDERS WINTHROP D [US] ET AL) [X] 1 * column 4, line 20 - line 52; figure 1 *; | [X]US2004257409 (CHEOK TAN KONG [SG]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0103]; figure 3 *; | [PX]US2008299321 (ISHIHARA HARUHIKO [JP]) [PX] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004091919 (OLIVETTI TECNOST [IT]; MANZONE MARIO [IT]; POMA PAOLO [IT]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 11 - page 6, line 17 * * abstract *; | [A]DE19737177 (MITSUBISHI PENCIL CO [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2007176981 (TURGEMAN SHAHAR [US]) |