EP2256194 - FLOCCULENT YEAST AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaguchi University 1677-1, Yoshida Yamaguchi-shi Yamaguchi 753-8511 / JP | [2010/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKADA, Rinji c/o Yamaguchi University 16-1 Tokiwadai 2-chome Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8611 / JP | 02 /
NONKLANG, Sanom c/o Shohei FUJIMOTO Laboratory Yamaguchi University 16-1 Tokiwadai 2-chome Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8611 / JP | 03 /
HOSHIDA, Hisashi c/o Yamaguchi University 16-1 Tokiwadai 2-chome Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8611 / JP | 04 /
ABDEL-BANAT, Babiker Mohamed Ahmed c/o Yamaguchi University 16-1 Tokiwadai 2-chome Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8611 / JP | [2011/09] |
Former [2010/48] | 01 /
AKADA, Rinji c/o Yamaguchi University 16-1 Tokiwadai 2-chome Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8611 / JP | ||
02 /
NONKLANG, Sanom c/o Yamaguchi University 16-1 Tokiwadai 2-chome Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8611 / JP | |||
03 /
HOSHIDA, Hisashi c/o Yamaguchi University 16-1 Tokiwadai 2-chome Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8611 / JP | |||
04 /
ABDEL-BANAT, Babiker Mohamed Ahmed c/o Yamaguchi University 16-1 Tokiwadai 2-chome Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-8611 / JP | Representative(s) | MacLean, Martin Robert Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/48] | MacLean, Martin Robert Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09721406.8 | 18.03.2009 | [2010/48] | WO2009JP01214 | Priority number, date | JP20080069329 | 18.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008069329 | JP20080187206 | 18.07.2008 Original published format: JP 2008187206 | [2010/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009116286 | Date: | 24.09.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2256194 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.09.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/09, C12N1/19, C12N15/81 | [2012/08] | CPC: |
C07K14/395 (EP,US);
C12N15/81 (EP,US);
C12N15/815 (EP,US);
C12P7/06 (EP,US);
Y02E50/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/48] | C12N15/09, C12N1/19 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/48] | Title | German: | FLOCKIGE HEFE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2010/48] | English: | FLOCCULENT YEAST AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2010/48] | French: | LEVURE FLOCULANTE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2010/48] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2010 | Translation filed | 10.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 10.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 10.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/48] | 01.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/50] | 23.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004005491 (SALINBAR S A [UY], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * * claim 6 *; | [A] - ALMEIDA CATARINA ET AL, "Acquisition of flocculation phenotype by Kluyveromyces marxianus when overexpressing GAP1 gene encoding an isoform of glyceraldehyde-3-phosphate dehydrogenase.", JOURNAL OF MICROBIOLOGICAL METHODS, (200311), vol. 55, no. 2, ISSN 0167-7012, pages 433 - 440, XP002642303 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [T] - NONKLANG SANOM ET AL, "Construction of Flocculent Kluyveromyces marxianus Strains Suitable for High-Temperature Ethanol Fermentation", BIOSCIENCE BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOCHEMISTRY, (200905), vol. 73, no. 5, ISSN 0916-8451, pages 1090 - 1095, XP002642304 [T] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1271/BBB.80853 | [T] - ABDEL-BANAT BABIKER M A ET AL, "High-temperature fermentation: how can processes for ethanol production at high temperatures become superior to the traditional process using mesophilic yeast?", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (201001), vol. 85, no. 4, pages 861 - 867, XP002642305 [T] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/S00253-009-2248-5 | International search | [Y]JP2005532055 (SALINBAR S.A.); | [A]JPH07509372 (SAPPORO BREWERIES LTD.); | [A]JP2006174767 (UNIV KOBE, et al) | [Y] - ALMEIDA, C. ET AL., "Acquisition of flocculation phenotype by Kluyveromyces marxianus when overexpression GAP1 gene encoding an isoform of glyceraldehyde-3-phosphate dehydrogenase", J. MICROBIOL. METHODS, (2003), vol. 55, pages 433 - 440, XP002642303 | [Y] - LUNDBLAD, V. ET AL., "Manipulation of cloned yeast DNA", CURRENT PROTOCOLS IN MOL. BIOL., (1997), XP008141281 | [Y] - KURODA, S. ET AL., "Fermentable and nonfermentable carbon sources sustain constitutive levels of expression of yeast triosephosphate dehydrogenase 3 gene from distinct promoter elements", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, no. 8, pages 6153 - 6162, XP008141320 | [A] - SUZUKI, O. ET AL., "Utilization of thermotolerant and flocculent yeast for wastewater treatement", HAKKO KOGAKU KAISHI, (1991), vol. 69, no. 2, pages 83 - 87, XP002109068 | [A] - CUNHA, A. F. ET AL., "Control by sugar of Saccharomyces cerevisiae flocculation for industrial ethanol production", FEMS YEAST RES., (2006), vol. 6, pages 280 - 287, XP008141318 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1567-1364.2006.00038.x | by applicant | JPH0340959B | JP3643404B | JP2007195406 | JP2006325577 | JP2001046053 | JP2005269920 | - BIOTECHNOL LETT, (2008), vol. 30, pages 97 - 102 | - YEAST, (1993), vol. 9, pages 423 - 427 | - SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 265, pages 2077 - 2082 | - NATURE, (1997), vol. 387, pages 78 - 81 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1995), vol. 92, pages 3809 - 3813 | - NATURE, (1994), vol. 369, pages 371 - 378 | - BIOSCI. BIOTECHNOL. BIOCHEM., (2007), vol. 71, pages 1170 - 82 | - HASHIMOTO ET AL., APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (2005), vol. 71, no. 1, pages 312 - 319 | - TURGEON ET AL., PLASMID, (2004), vol. 51, pages 24 - 36 | - HASHIMOTO ET AL., APPL MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (2006), vol. 69, pages 689 - 696 | - AKADA ET AL., YEAST, (2006), vol. 23, pages 399 - 405 |