EP2232510 - A SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PREVENTING, PROTECTING OLTC FROM FIRE AND/OR TRANSFORMER FROM EXPLOSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CTR Manufacturing Industries Limited Nagar Road Pune 411 014 Maharashtra / IN | [2010/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAKCHAURE, Vijaykumar, Kisanrao Fire System Division Nagar Road 411 014 Pune Maharashtra / IN | [2012/26] |
Former [2010/39] | 01 /
WAKCHAURE, Vijaykumar, Kisanrao Fire System Division Nagar Road 411 014 Pune Maharashtra / IN | Representative(s) | Held, Stephan, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | Held, Stephan, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR CHEMIE Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/39] | Held, Stephan, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09721621.2 | 01.01.2009 | [2010/39] | WO2009IN00003 | Priority number, date | INMU00102008 | 01.01.2008 Original published format: IN MU00102008 | [2010/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009116059 | Date: | 24.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2232510 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2232510 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/14 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
H01F27/14 (EP,US);
H01F2027/404 (EP,US);
H01F29/04 (EP,US);
H02H7/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/39] | Title | German: | VORSORGESYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN ZUM OLTC-FEUERSCHUTZ UND/ODER ZUM EXPLOSIONSSCHUTZ EINES UMWANDLERS | [2010/39] | English: | A SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PREVENTING, PROTECTING OLTC FROM FIRE AND/OR TRANSFORMER FROM EXPLOSION | [2010/39] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉVENTION, DE PROTECTION D UN OLTC CONTRE LE FEU ET/OU D UN TRANSFORMATEUR CONTRE L EXPLOSION | [2010/39] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 06.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 27.06.2012 | MK | 27.06.2012 | MT | 27.06.2012 | NO | 27.09.2012 | LU | 01.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | HR | 27.06.2012 | |
MK | 27.06.2012 | ||
MT | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | HR | 27.06.2012 | |
MT | 27.06.2012 | ||
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | HR | 27.06.2012 | |
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2012/50] | HR | 27.06.2012 | |
NO | 27.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | NO | 27.09.2012 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9712379 (MAGNIER PHILIPPE [FR]) [DA] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US6052060 (BUTLER DAVID MCMAHAN [US], et al) [A] 1,3,4,10 * column 1, lines 5-9 * * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 11 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP1085635 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1,10 * paragraphs [0007] , [0063] , [0066]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2006250683 (BALAN TODD-MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1,10 * paragraphs [0027] , [0029]; figure 3 *; | [A]EP1786083 (UNION FENOSA DISTRIBUCION S A [ES]) [A] 1,10* paragraph [0014] *; | [A]WO2007057916 (CTR MFG IND LTD [IN], et al) [A] 1,10 * page 1, lines 1-5 * * page 4, paragraphs 4,5 * * page 4, paragraph LAST - page 6, line 6 * * claims 1-4 * * figure 1 * |